Visner v. Michigan State Police et al
Plaintiff: Theodore J. Visner
Defendant: LEIN Director, Michigan State Police, Michigan Intelligience Operations Center, MIOC Commander and Michigan State Police Commander
Case Number: 5:2019cv11466
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Notice to Supply Addresses by Theodore J. Visner. (SSch)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to Provide Correct Address for Defendant(s) mailed to Theodore J. Visner, 526348, PARNALL CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 1780 E. PARNALL, JACKSON, MI 49201 (ATee)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Theodore J. Visner Pris. No. 526348 at Parnall Correctional Facility, 1780 E. Parnall, Jackson, MI 49201. (SBur)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE to Court by Theodore J. Visner (KCas)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Deficiency Corrected re #5 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only). (DAll)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $4.58 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (AFla)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to provide service copies. Correction due by 6/28/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (KBro)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Mediation Program (KBro)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Theodore J. Visner. (KBro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #1 Prisoner Trust Account Statement) (DAll).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Theodore J. Visner against All Defendants (KBro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visner v. Michigan State Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEIN Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Intelligience Operations Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIOC Commander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State Police Commander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore J. Visner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?