Coleman-Weathersbee v. Michigan State University Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Tiffany K Coleman-Weathersbee
Defendant: Michigan State University Federal Credit Union and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 5:2019cv11674
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. (Response due by 8/26/2019) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia J. Scott on behalf of Michigan State University Federal Credit Union. (Scott, Patricia)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Chernich on behalf of Michigan State University Federal Credit Union. (Chernich, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Richter on behalf of Michigan State University Federal Credit Union. (Richter, Stuart)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. (Response due by 8/5/2019) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan State University Federal Credit Union served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Goodman, Philip)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan State University Federal Credit Union* (SKra)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tiffany K Coleman-Weathersbee against Michigan State University Federal Credit Union with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7272271 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Goodman, Philip)
June 6, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Philip J. Goodman re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
June 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 6, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Tiffany K Coleman-Weathersbee, Defendant Does 1 through 100. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Goodman, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman-Weathersbee v. Michigan State University Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Scott A. Chernich
Represented By: Patricia J. Scott
Represented By: Stuart M. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany K Coleman-Weathersbee
Represented By: Philip J. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?