Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores v. Drug Enforcement Administration et al
Plaintiff: Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration, MAURICE HAGGEN and The United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv11954
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION FOR HEARING TO QUASH WARRANT AND OBTAIN RETURN OF FUNDS SEIZED filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, The United States of America. (Darling, Bradley)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley Darling appearing on behalf of Drug Enforcement Administration, The United States of America (Darling, Bradley)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Drug Enforcement Administration, The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of intent to forfeit, #2 Exhibit B - Seized Asset Claim Form) (Darling, Bradley)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Adjourning Date for Government to Respond to Plaintiff's #8 Motion. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #8 MOTION FOR HEARING TO QUASH WARRANT. (SBur)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR HEARING TO QUASH WARRANT AND OBTAIN RETURN OF FUNDS SEIZED by Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores. (Adams, Anthony)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Adams, Anthony)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED by Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warrant to Seize Property, #2 Exhibit Application, #3 Exhibit Approval, #4 Exhibit Receipt, #5 Exhibit Title Transfer, #6 Exhibit Dealer Section Card, #7 Exhibit IRS Form 830, #8 Exhibit Copy of Check, #9 Exhibit Title, #10 Exhibit Delivery Acceptance) (Adams, Anthony) Modified on 7/2/2019 (DWor). [WRONG EVENT SELECTED - DOCUMENT ENTITLED "FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT"]
July 2, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DWor)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *The United States of America* (DWor)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *MAURICE HAGGEN* (DWor)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Drug Enforcement Administration* (DWor)
July 1, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration, The United States of America, MAURICE HAGGEN. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Adams, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores against Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7305062 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: MACOMB - County Where Action Arose: MACOMB - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Adams, Anthony) Modified on 7/2/2019 (DWor). [COMPLAINT FILED AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores v. Drug Enforcement Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Benz of St. Clair Shores
Represented By: Anthony Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Bradley Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURICE HAGGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Bradley Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?