Vaughn v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vaughn
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv11964
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT and REFERENCE to a United States Magistrate Judge to Conduct All Proceedings. Case referred to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (SSch)
August 15, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 8/16/2019 is Cancelled. (WBar)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by All Plaintiffs . (Kutinsky, Adam)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial re #9 Discovery Plan - Rule 26f by All Plaintiffs (Kutinsky, Adam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Fathallah, Jason)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury by Jennifer Vaughn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kutinsky, Adam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Kutinsky on behalf of Jennifer Vaughn. (Kutinsky, Adam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Kutinsky on behalf of Jennifer Vaughn. (Kutinsky, Adam)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN; Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2019 01:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company against Jennifer Vaughn by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2 - Ex A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2 - Ex A - Policy) (Fathallah, Jason)
July 2, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company (Fathallah, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company from Circuit Court for the County of Wayne, case number 19-008365-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7306087 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings) (Fathallah, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Fathallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vaughn
Represented By: Adam B. Kutinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?