WG Plus de Mexico Sociedad de Responsibilidad Limitada de Capital Variable v. Tri-Mer Corporation
Plaintiff: WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable
Defendant: Tri-Mer Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv12415
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable. (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Lannen on behalf of WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable. (Lannen, Patrick)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Hengeveld on behalf of WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable. (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tri-Mer Corporation (McKay, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Tri-Mer Corporation against WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable by Tri-Mer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DOCUMENTS CREATING WHIRL/WET DUSTER PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT) (McKay, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy H. McKay on behalf of Tri-Mer Corporation. (McKay, Timothy)
August 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Northern District of Georgia. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Georgia Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00027. Modified on 8/16/2019 (VLun).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DENYING #9 Motion to Dismiss, GRANTING #9 Motion to Transfer Case, and DENYING AS MOOT 17 Motion to Exclude. The Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk is directed to transfer this action and to close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 08/14/2019. (usw) [Transferred from gand on 8/16/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8526129) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exh A, #3 Exh B, #4 Exh C, #5 Exh D, #6 Exh E, #7 Exh F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00027.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WG Plus de Mexico Sociedad de Responsibilidad Limitada de Capital Variable v. Tri-Mer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Mer Corporation
Represented By: Timothy H. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WG Plus De Mexico Sociedad De Responsibilidad Limitada De Capital Variable
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Hengeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?