Narra v. Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Joseph Narra
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 5:2019cv13496
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status/Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy***PLEASE USE CALL-IN INFORMATION: 888.363.4734; Access Code: 2541474 *** (WBar)
January 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2020; Follow-up Telephone Status/Scheduling Conference to be set. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy Mark Kaufmann appearing on behalf of Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest (Kaufmann, Timothy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Brownell, Donald)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Brownell, Donald)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Joseph Narra. (Lorelli, Vincent)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
November 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by All Defendants against Joseph Narra by All Defendants. (Brownell, Donald)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group for Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest against Joseph Narra by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald) Modified on 11/26/2019 (SOso). [DOCUMENT IS NOT AN ANSWER, IT IS A STATEMENT OF DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS BY CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST].
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest and Certificate of Compliance from Wayne Circuit, case number 19-014717-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7502137 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Macomb County Circuit Court, 15-003987-NI, Judge Edward Servitto] (Brownell, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narra v. Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Narra
Represented By: Vincent R. Lorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Timothy Mark Kaufmann
Represented By: Donald C. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?