Marchbanks et al v. SNYDER et al
Plaintiff: Mary P. Alexander, Keyanna Tims, J. B., John Billings, Jessica Hodge, Nathaniel Jamerson, Tameka Waters, Estella Garner, Michael Knight, James Eskridge, Yolanda Jenkins, Alexis Freeman, Vincer Johnson, Mark Bontumasi, Yvonne Marie Whittington, Rosetta Spencer, Cody Carpenter, Sherri Eichelberger, Lalania Davis, Gloria Jones, Michael Marchbanks, Bruce McLilly, Duane Washington, Alexandria Washington, S. M., Patrice Boss, Alice Gibson, Artie Dantzler, Robert E. Little, Melita Bowman-Murphy, T. M., Tyree Thomas, David Benton, Dorothy Jackson, Cedric Crawford, Rene Turner, Norma Menta, Damian Johnson, Sidney Booth, Jeanette Wiley, Lamaash Johnson, Edna Devaughn, Beonyce Brown, Frances Terry, Jerry Welch, Mary Wash, C. W., Charles Hunter, Roy McQueen, Martino VanPalt, Janice M. Jones, Jack McGaugh, Betty Looney, Darrin Laury, Malinda Jones, S. C., A. J., Brandon Emir Hatcher, Hicks Lane Derastine, Lorraine Holiday, James McGinnis, Thomas Kelley, J. W., Nitisha Smith, Lula Mae Warren, Larry Allen, Wanda Wright, Gerald Junior Dukes, Tynisha Reed, Veronica McCree, Tresha Copeland, Linda Helms, Z. T., Jeffrey Wilson, Angela Teague, Kathryn Webb, Brenda Fuller, Joyce Wilsonbah, Albert Strong, William Glober Jr., Janice Lewis, David Lott, Sandra Cabine, David Brooks, William Jones, Kelso Iyanla, Carolin Brown, Dennis Brown, Janeish Fells, Gail Lusane, L. B., Jamie Griffis, R. M., M. B., Renee Triplett, Ferlesia Milton, Monquise Jones, Larry Talton, J. W. M., Latrice Lucas, Tiffani Brown, Clarence Williams Jr., Robert Greer, Larry Fillmore, I. M., Clark D. Fenton, Scott Hedrick, Joyce Murdock, Angele Johnson, Jeanine Fisher, Delois Williams, Ella Bonner, Loretta Matthews, Harry Wynn, Jesse Kirksey, Shirley M. Marrah, Fred Taylor, Monique Wells, Mark Lindsay, Shirley White, Darilyn Townsend, Joyce Beard, Josephine Lee, Rodney Benton, Eric Weststrock, Harry Williams, Ronald Urquhart, Vince Johnson, Maryanne Stanley, Kevin Bosh, Constance Eichelberger, Kinish Grady, Lurline Isom, Aaron James, Ophelia Tillis, Rosa Hussey, Debra D Conner, Irene Johnson, Mary Kennedy- Jacob, Martha Sykes, Dan Ignash, Rosalita Williams, Autumn Chandler, Era Woods, Jonnie Brock, Quentin Lefear, Lionel Keener, Ray Lee, J. T., Gail Joanne Brim, Cora Causey, Alexander Khobeir, Ericsha Bowling, T. C., Diane Tasley, Gail Barron, Bernadette Haynes, Patricia Taylor, Diane Williams, Juanelle Buyck, Mary Yioda, Pearlie Traylor, S. T., Corey Lockett, Edwauna Smartt, Chris Crain, Kathryn M. Blake, Barbara Fair, Margret Tuggle, Henry Hodo, Darryl Bray Jr., Lorita Mitchell, T. B., L. L., Brianna Tims, Marsilous Hoskins, Shalawanda Johnson, Brenda Winters, Joyce Turner, Rose Bradford, Frank Greer, Pauline Allen, Clementine Cooke, Patricia Warner, I. W., Ebony Kw Campbell, Sonny Clay, Jeffrey Buyck, Albert Johnson, Janet Fielder, Donna Carpenter, Deborah Harris, David Eichelberger, Catherine McLilly, D. B., Cina Bosh, Mable Miller, M. W., John Galloway, Laura Watson and S. B.
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel, Leo A. Daly Company, Howard Croft, Adam Rosenthal, Michael Glasgow, Andy Dillon, Daugherty Johnson, Patrick Cook, RICHARD D. SNYDER, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C., The City of Flint, a municipal corporation, Gerald Ambrose, Michael Prysby, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Darnell Earley, Rowe Professional Services Company, f/k/a Rowe Engineering, Inc., Stephen Busch, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC and Flint, City of
Case Number: 5:2020cv10322
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
2 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER consolidating cases for discovery purposes only. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (DPer)
November 30, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 11/30/2022, ( Status Conference set for 12/21/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 26, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 10/26/2022, ( Status Conference set for 11/30/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
September 14, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 9/14/2022, ( Status Conference set for 10/26/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
May 3, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 5/3/2022 (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
April 27, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 5/3/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
April 25, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/27/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PROTOCOL. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 23, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by James M. Campbell on behalf of Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Campbell, James)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IMPLEMENTING PARTIAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) AND 58(a). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 23, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 2/23/2022 is Cancelled (WBar)
January 26, 2022 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 2/23/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
December 22, 2021 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 12/22/2021, ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 27, 2021 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 10/27/2021 (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
October 8, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alannah Buford-Kamerman by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
September 29, 2021 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
August 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 8/25/2021, ( Status Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 7/27/2021, ( Status Conference set for 8/25/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
June 28, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 7/27/2021 03:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
May 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 5/26/2021, ( Status Conference set for 6/30/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
April 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 4/7/2021, ( Status Conference set for 5/26/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
March 5, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC (Devine, Alaina)
March 5, 2021 Filing 63 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Environment S.A. for Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
March 5, 2021 Filing 62 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Veolia North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Environment S.A. for Veolia North America, Inc.. (Devine, Alaina)
March 5, 2021 Filing 61 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Veolia North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Environmental S.A. for Veolia North America, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
March 5, 2021 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
March 5, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Veolia North America, Inc.. (Devine, Alaina)
March 5, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Veolia North America, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
March 3, 2021 Filing 57 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. identifying Other Affiliate Lockwood Andrews Newnam Inc. for Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 3, 2021 Filing 56 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Leo A Daly Company for Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 3, 2021 Filing 55 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leo A. Daly Company identifying Other Affiliate Lockwood Andrews Newnam Inc. for Leo A. Daly Company. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Leo A. Daly Company. (Erickson, Philip)
February 24, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 2/24/2021, ( Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
February 19, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION re #35 MOTION to Dismiss by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Erickson, Philip)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #51 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying as moot #31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #49 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 8, 2021 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary by Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Devine, Alaina)
February 3, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE by Gerald Ambrose, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, Flint, City of, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty Johnson of withdrawal of #29 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kim, William)
January 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 1/13/2021, ( Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
December 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 12/2/2020, ( Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
November 25, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman on behalf of Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Buford-Kamerman, Alannah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY to Response re #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #45 Stipulation filed by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
November 17, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION re #43 Response to Motion by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
October 30, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION re #43 Response to Motion by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
October 28, 2020 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Next Status Conference adjourned to 12/2/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
October 21, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 1, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Flint, City of. (Klein, Sheldon)
September 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 9/30/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court Grants the Stipulation to Extend Time for City Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #40 ). SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Sandusky, K)
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 [DOCUMENT TITLED: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANTS VEOLIA NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VEOLIA NORTH AMERICA, INC., AND VEOLIA WATER NORTH AMERICA OPERATING SERVICES, LLC TO DISMISS THE SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT] RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint filed by Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Devine, Alaina) Modified on 9/16/2020 (LGra).
September 16, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION re #29 MOTION to Dismiss to Extend Time for City Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gerald Ambrose, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, Flint, City of, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty Johnson (Klein, Sheldon)
September 3, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 26, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 8/26/2020, ( Status Conference set for 9/30/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #38 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
August 24, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint by Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC (Devine, Alaina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #36 Stipulation, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
August 6, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION re #35 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter)
July 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 7/29/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
July 15, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Erickson, Philip)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #34 Stipulation; and #32 MOTION for Extension of Time, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
June 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 6/24/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 7/29/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
June 24, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION re #29 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter)
June 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Santino Mateo on behalf of Darnell Earley. (Mateo, T.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
June 4, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion by Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby, Bradley Wurfel. (Barbieri, Charles)
May 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 5/20/2020, ( Next Video Status Conference set for 6/24/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint by Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart) (Devine, Alaina)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Flint, City of. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Klein, Sheldon)
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Alaina N. Devine on behalf of Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
April 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Campbell, James)
April 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Erickson on behalf of Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
April 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Grashoff, Jr on behalf of Stephen Busch. (Grashoff, Philip)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista A. Jackson on behalf of Stephen Busch. (Jackson, Krista)
April 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video/Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/15/2020, ( Video Status Conference set for 5/20/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE FOR APRIL 15, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE (WBar)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Prysby waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Patrick Cook waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison M. Collins appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Collins, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Barbieri appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Barbieri, Charles)
March 31, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Pattwell appearing on behalf of Bradley Wurfel (Pattwell, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. RICHARD D. SNYDER waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Andy Dillon waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Stephen Busch waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Bradley Wurfel waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Clare on behalf of Bradley Wurfel. (Clare, Christopher)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Kuhl on behalf of Andy Dillon, RICHARD D. SNYDER. (Kuhl, Richard)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Gambill on behalf of Andy Dillon, RICHARD D. SNYDER. (Gambill, Nathan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Bettenhausen on behalf of Andy Dillon, RICHARD D. SNYDER. (Bettenhausen, Margaret)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Young Kim appearing on behalf of Flint, City of (Kim, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gerald Ambrose waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Howard Croft waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Darnell Earley waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Flint, City of waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Michael Glasgow waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Daugherty Johnson waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Gerald Ambrose (Wolf, Barry)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Berg on behalf of Flint, City of. (Berg, Frederick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon H. Klein on behalf of Flint, City of. (Klein, Sheldon)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander S. Rusek on behalf of Howard Croft. (Rusek, Alexander)
March 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 3/11/2020, ( In-Person Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (SSch)
February 10, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7593593 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Lansing. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 16-cv-10444, Judge Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lanciotti, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchbanks et al v. SNYDER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary P. Alexander
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyanna Tims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Billings
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hodge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Jamerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Waters
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Garner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Knight
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eskridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Jenkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Freeman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincer Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bontumasi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Marie Whittington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosetta Spencer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Carpenter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Eichelberger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lalania Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marchbanks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce McLilly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. M.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Boss
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artie Dantzler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Little
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melita Bowman-Murphy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. M.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyree Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Benton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Crawford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Turner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Menta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Booth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Wiley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamaash Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Devaughn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beonyce Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Terry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Welch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wash
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. W.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hunter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy McQueen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martino VanPalt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice M. Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack McGaugh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Looney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Laury
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. J.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Emir Hatcher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hicks Lane Derastine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Holiday
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGinnis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kelley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. W.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitisha Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Mae Warren
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Allen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Junior Dukes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tynisha Reed
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica McCree
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tresha Copeland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Helms
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. T.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Teague
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Webb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Fuller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Wilsonbah
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Strong
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Glober Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Lewis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Cabine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brooks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelso Iyanla
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolin Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeish Fells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Lusane
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. B.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Griffis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. M.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. B.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Triplett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferlesia Milton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monquise Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Talton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. W. M.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrice Lucas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffani Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Williams Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Greer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Fillmore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. M.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark D. Fenton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hedrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Murdock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angele Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Fisher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delois Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Bonner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Matthews
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Wynn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Kirksey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley M. Marrah
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Wells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lindsay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley White
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darilyn Townsend
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Beard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Lee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Benton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Weststrock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Urquhart
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryanne Stanley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bosh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Eichelberger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinish Grady
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lurline Isom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ophelia Tillis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Hussey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra D Conner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kennedy- Jacob
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Sykes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Ignash
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalita Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Chandler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Era Woods
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonnie Brock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quentin Lefear
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Keener
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Lee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. T.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Joanne Brim
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Causey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Khobeir
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericsha Bowling
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. C.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Tasley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Barron
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Haynes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Williams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanelle Buyck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Yioda
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearlie Traylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. T.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Lockett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwauna Smartt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Crain
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn M. Blake
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Fair
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margret Tuggle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Hodo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Bray Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorita Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. B.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. L.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Tims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsilous Hoskins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalawanda Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Winters
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Turner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Bradford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Greer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Allen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clementine Cooke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Warner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. W.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Kw Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Clay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Buyck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Fielder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Carpenter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eichelberger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine McLilly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cina Bosh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mable Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. W.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Galloway
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Watson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel
Represented By: Michael J. Pattwell
Represented By: Christopher B. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo A. Daly Company
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Croft
Represented By: Alexander S. Rusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Dillon
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cook
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D. SNYDER
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Flint, a municipal corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ambrose
Represented By: Barry A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Prysby
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia North America, Inc.
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia North America, LLC
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Earley
Represented By: T. Santino Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe Professional Services Company, f/k/a Rowe Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Busch
Represented By: Philip A. Grashoff, Jr.
Represented By: Krista A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint, City of
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: William Young Kim
Represented By: Sheldon H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?