Milhouse et al v. Snyder et al
Plaintiff: Willie Stacker, R. D., Russell Lavern, Shameka Gaddy, Dominique L. Person, Annie Redman, Lonnie Davis, R. O., Tamera T. Keys, Thomas King, Hudie Langston, Sabrina Lee, T. K., Ernestine Stocker, Ralph Pea, James O Roby, Brytani Nicks, M. S., Arian McKnight, Alayah Berry, J. T., Dennis Clark, V. D., Rayna Bauer, Jason Keys, Luke Palacios, K. S., Cheryl Adkins, Cynthia Russell, Jaytoya Johnson, Lashunda Greenlee, Fred Wells, VanAya W. Keys, Anastaysha Miller, Angela Mcclendon-Mayes, Prennicea Horten, X. S., Diane Farner, Betty Rogers, Angela Malone, J. K., Johnnie Sharp, Shelia Hopkins, Dennis Redmond, Stephanie Thomas, Ernest Hackney, Donald Palacios, Isaiah Meniefield, Reginald Allen, Akeia Stevenson, Dardenio Laval Lawson, I. L., Nathaniel Hopkins, Sharon Harvey Woodward, Paula V. Pruitt, Kennesha Ferguson, Alean E Gibbs, D. R. W., Angela Crochran, Shirley Knox, Darveal Hamilton, Robin Mabry, Judson Anderson, John Gillen, D. G., Asha Bonds, Willie McBride, Beverly Davis, B. W., Glenda Barfield, Lela Lovelace, G. O., Angelo Blair, Amanda LaRock, Mary Harris, Cathy Smothers, Wilbert Campbell, Ettis White, E. T., K. W., Diante L Lyles, C. S., Joseph C. Johnson, Gary Grierson, Aushaya Munerlyn, D. H., C. A., Sheila Hopkins, Amber Brown, Roscoe Johnson, Jr., Victoria Adams, Darrell Robertson, E. C., Rick Schenck, Rodney McKnight, Judy Turnbow, Janice Adams, Shalita Savage, Matthew J. Garrett, Roscoe Johnson, James W. Cocking, Dorsey Bone, Christopher Rye, S. C., M. N., Ada Ulmer, David Peters, maurice Wright, Nile Hawthorne, C. H., E. S., M. O., Freeman Simpson, Thadrick Keys, Kristine Sallay, Janet Houston, P. M., T. C., Patricia Lundy, James Clenton Jackson Junior, Michael Williams, Lillie Hayman, Erica Davis, Jeyanath Jeyaratnam, Kimara Johnson, Harrell Milhouse, M. M., Ronald L. Bell, Robert Persails, James Quarles, William Echols Sr., Sherron Lusane, Antoinette Barfield, Kenya Simmons, Kelvin Pruitt, Gerald Jenkins, Jonathon Tremain, Latonya Addison, Mary Anne Dobson, Lonnie Johnson, Toveka Owens, I. S., A. T., Benjamin Williams, Donny Redmond, Gale DeLeon, Artrice Walton, Leon Spencer, Phil Ott, Jimmy Norton, Creolla Ivy, David Brazil, J. S., Christie Hawkins, Z. B., Ziara Lee, Marlon Miller, T. D., Renzellous Brown, Brenda Briggs, Dorothy M Jones, Lowell Brewton, Jamie M. Davis, D. I., David Sallay, Darnique Davis, J. C., Shawntia Knox, Sheryl Waegenaere, Jack Metcalf, Lee Taylor, Edith Cox, Char S Pippins, Sheana Owens, C. G., Joy Norton, Delmer Collier, Andrew Sowa, Ruby Patrick, Robin Simmons, Shawn Jones, Rontario Simmons, Marlo Meniefield, Berlesa Berry, Timothy E Boyd, P. S., Tammy Williams, Shawn D Penegar, W. E., A. D., Q. S. and A. O.
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel, Daugherty Johnson, Governor Richard D. Snyder, Michael Glasgow, Michael Prysby, Gerald Ambrose, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Howard Croft, Andy Dillon, Veolia North America, Inc., Patrick Cook, The City of Flint, a municipal corporation, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C., Rowe Professional Services Company, f/k/a Rowe Engineering, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC, Darnell Earley, Leo A. Daly Company, Adam Rosenthal, Stephen Busch, Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC and Flint, City of
Case Number: 5:2020cv10449
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
2 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 11/30/2022, ( Status Conference set for 12/21/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 26, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 10/26/2022, ( Status Conference set for 11/30/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
September 14, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 9/14/2022, ( Status Conference set for 10/26/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
May 3, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 5/3/2022 (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
April 27, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 5/3/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
April 25, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/27/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PROTOCOL. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IMPLEMENTING PARTIAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) AND 58(a). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 23, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 2/23/2022 is Cancelled (WBar)
January 26, 2022 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 2/23/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
December 22, 2021 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 12/22/2021, ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 27, 2021 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 10/27/2021 (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
October 8, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alannah Buford-Kamerman by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
September 29, 2021 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
August 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 8/25/2021, ( Status Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 7/27/2021, ( Status Conference set for 8/25/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
June 28, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 7/27/2021 03:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
May 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 5/26/2021, ( Status Conference set for 6/30/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
April 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 4/7/2021, ( Status Conference set for 5/26/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
March 4, 2021 Filing 60 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. identifying Other Affiliate Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc for Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 59 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Leo A. Daly for Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 58 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Leo A. Daly Company identifying Other Affiliate Lockwood Andrews Newnam Inc. for Leo A. Daly Company. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Leo A. Daly Company. (Erickson, Philip)
February 24, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 2/24/2021, ( Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
February 19, 2021 Filing 54 STIPULATION re #38 MOTION to Dismiss by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Erickson, Philip)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #54 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying as moot #32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #52 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 8, 2021 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary by Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Devine, Alaina)
February 3, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE by Gerald Ambrose, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, Flint, City of, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty Johnson of withdrawal of #30 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kim, William)
January 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 1/13/2021, ( Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
December 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 12/2/2020, ( Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
November 25, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman on behalf of Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Buford-Kamerman, Alannah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY to Response re #38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #48 Stipulation filed by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
November 17, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION re #46 Response to Motion by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
October 30, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION re #46 Response to Motion by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
October 28, 2020 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Next Status Conference adjourned to 12/2/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
October 21, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 1, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Flint, City of. (Klein, Sheldon)
September 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 9/30/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court Grants the Stipulation to Extend Time for City Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #43 ). SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Sandusky, K)
September 16, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint filed by Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)[REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #31 MOTION TO DISMISS SHORT FORM COMPLAINT] Modified on 9/16/2020 (DPer).
September 16, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION re #30 MOTION to Dismiss to Extend Time for City Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gerald Ambrose, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, Flint, City of, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty Johnson (Klein, Sheldon)
September 3, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 26, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 8/26/2020, ( Status Conference set for 9/30/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #40 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
August 24, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint by Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC (Devine, Alaina)
August 19, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
July 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 7/29/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
July 15, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Erickson, Philip)
July 10, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Crump on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Crump, Benjamin)
June 26, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION re #32 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion by All Plaintiffs (Lanciotti, Patrick)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #36 Stipulation re: #32 MOTION to Dismiss; Response due by 8/19/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #35 Stipulation; and #33 MOTION for Extension of Time, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
June 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 6/24/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 7/29/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
June 24, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #30 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter)
June 11, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Santino Mateo on behalf of Darnell Earley. (Mateo, T.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
June 4, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion by Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby, Bradley Wurfel. (Barbieri, Charles)
May 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 5/20/2020, ( Next Video Status Conference set for 6/24/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
May 19, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint by Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart) (Devine, Alaina)
May 18, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Flint, City of. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Klein, Sheldon)
April 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC. (Campbell, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Alaina N. Devine on behalf of Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
April 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia North America, LLC. (Campbell, James)
April 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Erickson on behalf of Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
April 17, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Grashoff, Jr on behalf of Stephen Busch. (Grashoff, Philip)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista A. Jackson on behalf of Stephen Busch. (Jackson, Krista)
April 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video/Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/15/2020, ( Video Status Conference set for 5/20/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE FOR APRIL 15, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE (WBar)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Prysby waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Patrick Cook waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison M. Collins appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Collins, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Barbieri appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Barbieri, Charles)
March 31, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Pattwell appearing on behalf of Bradley Wurfel (Pattwell, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Governor Richard D. Snyder waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Andy Dillon waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Stephen Busch waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Bradley Wurfel waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Clare on behalf of Bradley Wurfel. (Clare, Christopher)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Kuhl on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard D. Snyder. (Kuhl, Richard)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Gambill on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard D. Snyder. (Gambill, Nathan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Bettenhausen on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard D. Snyder. (Bettenhausen, Margaret)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Young Kim appearing on behalf of Flint, City of (Kim, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gerald Ambrose waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Howard Croft waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Darnell Earley waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Flint, City of waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Michael Glasgow waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Daugherty Johnson waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Gerald Ambrose (Wolf, Barry)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Berg on behalf of Flint, City of. (Berg, Frederick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon H. Klein on behalf of Flint, City of. (Klein, Sheldon)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander S. Rusek on behalf of Howard Croft. (Rusek, Alexander)
March 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 3/11/2020, ( In-Person Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DAll)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (NAhm)
February 25, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7610525 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Lansing. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 16 cv 10444, Judge Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milhouse et al v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel
Represented By: Michael J. Pattwell
Represented By: Christopher B. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Richard D. Snyder
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Prysby
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ambrose
Represented By: Barry A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Croft
Represented By: Alexander S. Rusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Dillon
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia North America, Inc.
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cook
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Flint, a municipal corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe Professional Services Company, f/k/a Rowe Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia North America, LLC
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Earley
Represented By: T. Santino Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo A. Daly Company
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Busch
Represented By: Krista A. Jackson
Represented By: Philip A. Grashoff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint, City of
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: William Young Kim
Represented By: Sheldon H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Stacker
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. D.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Lavern
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Gaddy
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique L. Person
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Redman
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Davis
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. O.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamera T. Keys
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas King
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudie Langston
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Lee
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. K.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Stocker
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Pea
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O Roby
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brytani Nicks
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arian McKnight
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alayah Berry
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. T.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Clark
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. D.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayna Bauer
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Keys
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Palacios
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Adkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Russell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaytoya Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashunda Greenlee
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Wells
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VanAya W. Keys
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastaysha Miller
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mcclendon-Mayes
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prennicea Horten
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Farner
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Rogers
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Malone
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. K.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Sharp
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Hopkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Redmond
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Thomas
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Hackney
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Palacios
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Meniefield
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Allen
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akeia Stevenson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dardenio Laval Lawson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. L.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Hopkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Harvey Woodward
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula V. Pruitt
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennesha Ferguson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alean E Gibbs
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. R. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Crochran
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Knox
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darveal Hamilton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Mabry
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judson Anderson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gillen
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. G.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asha Bonds
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie McBride
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Davis
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Barfield
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Lovelace
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. O.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Blair
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda LaRock
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Harris
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Smothers
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Campbell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ettis White
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. T.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diante L Lyles
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Grierson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aushaya Munerlyn
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. H.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. A.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hopkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roscoe Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Adams
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Robertson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Schenck
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney McKnight
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Turnbow
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Adams
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalita Savage
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Garrett
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roscoe Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Cocking
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorsey Bone
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Rye
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. N.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Ulmer
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Peters
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: maurice Wright
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nile Hawthorne
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. H.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. O.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freeman Simpson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thadrick Keys
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Sallay
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Houston
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. M.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lundy
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clenton Jackson Junior
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Hayman
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Davis
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeyanath Jeyaratnam
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimara Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrell Milhouse
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Bell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Persails
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Quarles
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Echols Sr.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherron Lusane
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Barfield
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Simmons
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Pruitt
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Jenkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Tremain
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Addison
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Dobson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toveka Owens
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. T.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Williams
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Redmond
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale DeLeon
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artrice Walton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Spencer
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Ott
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Norton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creolla Ivy
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brazil
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Hawkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziara Lee
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Miller
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. D.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renzellous Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Briggs
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy M Jones
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell Brewton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie M. Davis
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. I.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sallay
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnique Davis
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawntia Knox
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Waegenaere
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Metcalf
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Taylor
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Cox
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Char S Pippins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheana Owens
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. G.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Norton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmer Collier
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sowa
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Patrick
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Simmons
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Jones
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rontario Simmons
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlo Meniefield
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berlesa Berry
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy E Boyd
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Williams
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn D Penegar
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. E.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. D.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. O.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Benjamin Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?