Ningbo Xinghuo Mould Co., Ltd
Plaintiff: Ningbo Xinghuo Mould Co., Ltd
Defendant: Westool Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv12467
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Westool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - October 28, 2020 LARA Search Results) (Borell, John)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 10/28/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Westool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Borell, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ningbo Xinghuo Mould Co., Ltd served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Newman, Max)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Westool Corporation* (DPer)
September 15, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ningbo Xinghuo Mould Co., Ltd against All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Paid - Rec. No. AMIEDC - 8035353; $400.00. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of Country - County Where Action Arose: Monroe - County of 1st Defendant: Monroe. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Newman, Max) Modified on 9/15/2020 (DPer).
September 15, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Westool Corporation. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Newman, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ningbo Xinghuo Mould Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ningbo Xinghuo Mould Co., Ltd
Represented By: Max J. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westool Corporation
Represented By: John A. Borell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?