Arent v. Rocket Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Owen Arent
Defendant: Rocket Companies, Inc., Jay D. Farner, Julie R. Booth, Robert Dean Walters and Daniel Gilbert
Petitioner: Richard Batson and Carl Shupe
Case Number: 5:2021cv11618
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Morganroth, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A. Malkina on behalf of All Defendants. (Malkina, Julia)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas Scott on behalf of All Defendants. (Scott, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Leigh Nelles on behalf of All Defendants. (Nelles, Sharon)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B Morganroth on behalf of All Defendants. (Morganroth, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Motion to Appoint Carl Shupe as Lead Plaintiff and, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carl Shupe. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Certification, #3 Exhibit B - Carle Shupe Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment, #5 Exhibit D - Loss Analysis, #6 Exhibit E - Notice, #7 Exhibit F - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume) (Allen, James)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases of Related Actions, MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appoint as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Richard Batson. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of pendency of class action published in Business Wire on June 29, 2021, #3 Exhibit B - Richard D. Batsons Certification, #4 Exhibit C - Richard D. Batsons estimated losses, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Richard D. Batson, #6 Exhibit E - Robbins Gellers Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit F - The Miller Law Firms Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit G - Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: E. Powell Miller appearing on behalf of Richard Batson (Miller, E.)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Service of Complaint and Responsive Pleading Deadlines, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Hood, II on behalf of Owen Arent. (Hood, Joseph)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (KBro)
July 14, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Owen Arent re #1 Complaint,,, Civil Cover Sheet (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Owen Arent against Julie R. Booth, Jay D. Farner, Daniel Gilbert, Rocket Companies, Inc., Robert Dean Walters with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8536128 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 5:21-cv-11528-JEL-APP, Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A) (Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arent v. Rocket Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Arent
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph A. Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocket Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B Morganroth
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott
Represented By: Julia A. Malkina
Represented By: Sharon Leigh Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay D. Farner
Represented By: Jeffrey B Morganroth
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott
Represented By: Julia A. Malkina
Represented By: Sharon Leigh Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie R. Booth
Represented By: Jeffrey B Morganroth
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott
Represented By: Julia A. Malkina
Represented By: Sharon Leigh Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dean Walters
Represented By: Jeffrey B Morganroth
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott
Represented By: Julia A. Malkina
Represented By: Sharon Leigh Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gilbert
Represented By: Jeffrey B Morganroth
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott
Represented By: Julia A. Malkina
Represented By: Sharon Leigh Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Batson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Shupe
Represented By: James P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?