Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc. v. ACS Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc.
Defendant: ACS Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv11979
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(B)(2) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Rule 12(B)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by ACS Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: ACSs PRY6A Quote with Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit B: 12.20.2018 Email from MTU employee Lisa Nagel, FW: Purchase Order/ 4861095055, #4 Exhibit C: Rolls-Royce OpenCorporates Information, #5 Exhibit D: Declaration of Dan V. Knox) (Turco, Michael)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Turco on behalf of ACS Manufacturing, Inc.. (Turco, Michael)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 10/20/2021, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extension of Date for ACS Manufacturing, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by ACS Manufacturing, Inc. (Turco, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ACS Manufacturing, Inc. served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Abdallah, Mahde)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *ACS Manufacturing, Inc.* (DAll)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc. (Abdallah, Mahde)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mahde Y. Abdallah on behalf of Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc.. (Abdallah, Mahde)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Exhibits filed by Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc. against ACS Manufacturing, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8591573 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Grayson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 25, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc. v. ACS Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolls-Royce Solutions Amercia Inc.
Represented By: Mahde Y. Abdallah
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?