Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC v. F45 Training Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC
Defendant: F45 Training Incorporated, Adam Gilchrist, Robert Deutsch, Marc Marano, Luke Armstrong and Nick Abrahams
Case Number: 5:2022cv10168
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Nick Abrahams, Marc Marano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Harrell, Michelle)
March 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle C. Harrell on behalf of Nick Abrahams, Marc Marano. (Harrell, Michelle)
March 25, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Luke Armstrong, Adam Gilchrist. (Harrell, Michelle)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by F45 Training Incorporated. (Harrell, Michelle)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Luke Armstrong, Adam Gilchrist. (Harrell, Michelle)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by F45 Training Incorporated. (Harrell, Michelle)
March 21, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle C. Harrell on behalf of Luke Armstrong, F45 Training Incorporated, Adam Gilchrist. (Harrell, Michelle)
March 11, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Extension of Time for Defendants, F45, Gilchrist, and Armstrong's Answer by Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC (August, Gary)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants F45 Training, Inc., Adam Gilchrist, and Luke Armstron to Answer #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 3/21/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Deutsch served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (August, Gary)
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Marc Marano served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (August, Gary)
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nick Abrahams served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (August, Gary)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Adam Gilchrist served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (August, Gary)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Luke Armstrong served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (August, Gary)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. F45 Training Incorporated served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (August, Gary)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Robert Deutsch served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (August, Gary)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Marc Marano served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (August, Gary)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Stern on behalf of Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC. (Stern, Ari)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin J Twigg appearing on behalf of Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC (Twigg, Justin)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
January 27, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8770483 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: New Castle. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit) (August, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC v. F45 Training Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Functional HIIT Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Gary K. August
Represented By: Ari Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F45 Training Incorporated
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gilchrist
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Marano
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Armstrong
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Abrahams
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?