Green v. The Steelstone Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Ashley Tiara Green
Defendant: The Steelstone Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv11596
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jonathan JC Grey
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Steelstone Group, LLC served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Kress, Adam)
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Tiara Green against The Steelstone Group, LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Owner's Manual) (Kress, Adam)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Vacating #4 Order to Show Cause; and Granting Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is to refile the second-amended complaint (ECF No. 5-1) as a separate pleading. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ashley Tiara Green (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint) (Kress, Adam)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 8/4/2022, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Tiara Green against The Steelstone Group, LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Kress, Adam)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *The Steelstone Group, LLC* (TTho)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ashley Tiara Green against The Steelstone Group, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8979328 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland, MI - County Where Action Arose: Oakland, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Brooklyn, NY. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Owner's Manual) (Kress, Adam)
July 14, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. The Steelstone Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Tiara Green
Represented By: Adam John Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Steelstone Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?