Ward v. Brotzke et al
Plaintiff: Jamal R Ward
Defendant: Charles Brotzke, Aaron Thompson and Bailey Rumschlag
Case Number: 5:2023cv10096
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) in Lieu of an Answer Plaintiff's Response In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Partial Dismissal In Lieu Of an Answer Pursuant to Fed R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Jamal R Ward. (Dworetsky, David)
February 21, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) in Lieu of an Answer. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Courtroom 672. (LHos)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: #9 MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by Charles Brotzke, Aaron Thompson, Bailey Rumschlag. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 14, 2023 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) in Lieu of an Answer by All Defendants. (Paddison, Gregory)
February 2, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. served on 01-15-2023. (Dworetsky, David)
February 2, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. served on 01-15-2023. (Dworetsky, David)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Answer #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 2/21/2023, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
January 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory B. Paddison on behalf of Bailey Rumschlag. (Paddison, Gregory)
January 12, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Bailey Rumschlag* (DPer)
January 12, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Aaron Thompson* (DPer)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Charles Brotzke* (DPer)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Trial By Jury filed by Jamal R Ward against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9194162 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Dworetsky, David)
January 12, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Brotzke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal R Ward
Represented By: David A. Dworetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Brotzke
Represented By: Gregory B. Paddison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Thompson
Represented By: Gregory B. Paddison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey Rumschlag
Represented By: Gregory B. Paddison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?