Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC v. Unidentified Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel, The Featured Case
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC
Defendant: Unidentified, Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel believed to be the Griffin, lost in Lake Michigan, her tackle, apparel, appurtenances, cargo, etc., The
Intervenor: Michigan Department of Environmental Quality and Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries
Claimant: Republic of France
Case Number: 1:2004cv00375
Filed: June 7, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTES of status conference by telephone held before Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Court Reporter: Kevin Gaugier) (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING INTERVENORS' REQUEST TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Docket No. 169) and scheduling TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE for 10/15/2009 at 2:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell;(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 167 motion to adjourn hearing on Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATED MOTION to adjourn Hearing on Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Reinwasser, Louis)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 motion to adjourn hearing. The hearing on Intervenors' motion for summary judgment (docket #133) is rescheduled for October 15, 2009 at 1:15 p.m. ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATED MOTION to adjourn Hearing on Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Reinwasser, Louis)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING regarding document number 133 : motion hearing is set for 6/25/2009 at 1:15 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell;(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION to adjourn hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Reinwasser, Louis)
March 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 BRIEF by claimant Republic of France 160 (document named as response to interventors' objection to answer and claim of France) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment)(Robol, Richard) Modified text on 3/30/2009 and create association (gjf).
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order REPLY to response to motion 133 (taken from document 161 ) filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (gjf)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY BRIEF by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Wayne Lusardi - Part 1, # 2 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Wayne Lusardi - Part 2)(Reinwasser, Louis) Modified text on 3/5/2009 (gjf).
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 OBJECTION To Claim 142 And Answer 149 Of Republic Of France by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Reinwasser, Louis) Modified on 3/5/2009 to create association (gjf, ).
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number 133 : motion hearing is set for 4/7/2009 at 1:15 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell;(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 SEALED document filed by plaintiff (gjf)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SEALED document - Declaration of Stephen R. Bilicki (attachment 4 to document 146 ) (gjf)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEALED document - Declaration of Kenneth Vrana (attachment 3 to document 146 ) (gjf)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SEALED document - Declaration of Jeffrey D. Morris (attachment 2 to document 146 ) (gjf) Modified text on 2/19/2009 (gjf).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SEALED document filed by plaintiff (gjf) Modified text on 2/18/2009 (gjf). Modified text on 2/20/2009 to correct filer (gjf).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for summary judgment 133 (document named as Corrected Brief) filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified text on 2/18/2009 (gjf).
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 motion for extension of time to file response/reply ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 UNOPPOSED MOTION AND BRIEF for extension of time to file reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reinwasser, Louis) Modified text on 2/13/2009 (gjf).
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE re: 146 by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Robol, Richard) Modified on 2/11/2009 to create association (gjf, ).
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 124 by Republic of France(Robol, Richard)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 145 motion for leave to file ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Filing of Affidavit of Michel Chanoux by claimant Republic of France (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment)(Robol, Richard)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for summary judgment 133 filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven J. Libert, # 2 SEALED Declaration of Jeffrey D. Morris, # 3 SEALED Declaration of Kenneth Vrana, # 4 SEALED Declaration of Stephen R. Bilicki, # 5 Declaration of Richard Gross, # 6 Curriculum Vitae for Richard Gross, # 7 Rebuttal Declaration of Stephen R. Bilicki)(Robol, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2009 (gjf).
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file matter under seal by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Robol, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2009 (gjf).
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries of Responses to Plaintiff's Supplemental Interrogatories (address correction) (Reinwasser, Louis)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries of Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Interrogatories (Reinwasser, Louis)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 CLAIM of Republic of France (Robol, Richard)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING 140 motion for extension of time to February 4, 2009, for Plaintiff to file its response to the Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
January 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to intervenor's motion for summary judgment by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Robol, Richard) Modified text on 1/20/2009 (gjf).
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries of Intervenors' Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents (Reinwasser, Louis)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 (CORRECTED)AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Summary Judgment 133 filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibits A and B)(Reinwasser, Louis) Modified text on 12/30/2008 (mkc).
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 SEALED document (elc)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PROOF OF MAILING by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 133 Affidavit of Wayne Lusardi filed under seal (Reinwasser, Louis)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Summary Judgment 133 filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exs A & B)(Reinwasser, Louis)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 BRIEF in support of MOTION for summary judgment 133 filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reinwasser, Louis)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 (WITHDRAWN) MOTION for summary judgment by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Reinwasser, Louis) Modified on 10/8/2009 per document 169 (gjf).
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Consent to filing of claim and answer by the Republic of France by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified text on 12/22/2008 (gjf).
December 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STATUS REPORT on discovery and motions submitted for filing by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - supplemental interrogatories to claimants, # 2 Attachment - supplemental requests for production of documents to claimants)(Robol, Richard) Modified text on 12/15/2008 (gjf).
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SUPPLEMENT re 128 Joint Status Report by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Reinwasser, Louis)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE cancelling status conference on 11/7/08(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified text on 11/6/2008 (gjf).
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER setting status conference: status conference set for 11/7/2008 at 2:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Remark: Phone call from Cindy at Attorney Louis B. Reinwasser's office stating he is now with the Michigan Attorney General's Office (see 126 substitution of counsel). His e-mail address and mailing information have been updated. (kw)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION adding attorney Louis B. Reinwasser in the place of James R. Piggush (Reinwasser, Louis)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 VERIFICATION STATEMENT re 114 Intervenors' Certification of Receipt by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James) Modified text on 8/20/2008 (gjf).
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ANSWER to second amended complaint 124 filed by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James) Modified text on 8/14/2008 to create association (gjf).
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CLAIM Intervenors' statement of rights and interest by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 116 plaintiff's motion to appoint substitute custodian; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC of advertisement-notice of arrest/motion served at the Grand Rapids Press via USM process receipt and return (gjf)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC of warrant for arrest of vessel via USM process receipt and return (gjf)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC of advertisement-notice of arrest/motion served at the Marquette Mining Journal via USM process receipt and return (gjf)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE TO 116 Petitioner's Request for Entry of Substitute Custodian Order filed by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James) Modified on 7/3/2008 to create association (gjf, ).
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order MOTION to appoint custodian (document named as notice of proposed substitute custodianship order and readiness to proceed with arrest) taken from document 116 by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (gjf)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE re 114 by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Robol, Richard)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REGARDING ARREST WARRANT AND DISCLOSURE OF INFORMATION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MANDATE of USCA re appeal 109 (mrs)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT of USCA re appeal 109 ; the judgment of the district court is reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings (elc)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 SLIP OPINION of USCA re appeal 109 ; the judgment of the district court is reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings (elc)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument re: Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss held May 10, 2005 before Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Court Reporter: Gaugier, Kevin (616) 456-6133)
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order CASE NUMBER 06-2584 assigned by Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals to appeal 109 (kad, )
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order APPEAL FEE PAID re 109 by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC in the amount of $455, receipt number 928450 (Robol, Richard)
December 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEAL re 108 with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified on 12/7/2006 to add text (gjf).
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 104 motion for TRO, denying 105 motion for extension of time; Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to motion re 104 motion for arrest, temporary restraining order and for delay filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James) Modified on 8/29/2006 to correct text (elc). Modified on 8/29/2006 to correct text (gjf).
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for extension of time for filing and service of precise location of artifacts with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Robol, Richard) Modified on 8/28/2006 to add text (gjf).
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support; # 2 Declaration in support of Steven J. Libert) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 8/28/2006 to add text (gjf).
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 DECLARATION , Second Supplementary, by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard)
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause 98 with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Supplementary Declaration) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 8/4/2006 to add text and description of attachment (gjf).
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 BRIEF by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 98 Order to Show Cause with proof of service (Piggush, James) Modified on 8/4/2006 to add text (gjf).
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 8/3/2006 why the Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's order directing that Plaintiff provide the precise location of Defendant to the State; Plaintiff and Intervenor must file briefs, within 14 days of the entry of this order, addressing why the Complaint should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's order; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell. (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
July 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of Wayne R. Lusardi in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 95 ; submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (gjf, )
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 95 reply in support of renewed motion to dismiss (Piggush, James)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to response to motion re 76 Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Attachment The Beaver MAGAZINE# 2 Attachment Affidavit of Wayne R. Lusardi) (Piggush, James)
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Additional Authority with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified on 7/7/2006 to add text (gjf, ).
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE in opposition re 76 Plaintiff's Corrected Memorandum in Opposition to 3rd Motion to Dismiss with certificate of service filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal declaration of Stephen R. Bilicki; # 2 Rebuttal declaration of Steven J. Libert) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 6/28/2006 to add text and description of attachments (gjf, ).
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE in opposition re 76 Third Request to Dismiss or Deny Complaint filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal declaration of Stephen R. Bilicki; # 2 Rebuttal declaration of Steven J. Libert) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 6/27/2006 to add description to attachments (gjf, ).
June 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 motion for extension of time to file; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
June 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 90 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Enlargement of Time# 2 Proposed Order) (Robol, Richard)
May 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Copy of Order 89 sent via U.S. Mail to Attorney Boer (gjf, )
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to the Intervenors' renewed motion to dismiss on/before 6/22/2006; Intervenors may file a reply to Plaintiff's response on/before 7/6/2006; Parties will be notified if the Court intends to hold oral argument on the motion; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
May 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letter dated February 13, 2006) (Robol, Richard)
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries pos status report to case manager 051806 (Piggush, James)
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries status report case manager 051806 (Piggush, James)
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard)
May 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries POS Intervenors' Status Report (Piggush, James)
May 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries Intervenors' Status Report to case manager (Piggush, James)
April 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard)
February 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard)
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Copy of Letter to Counsel 80 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer & Robol (gjf)
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER to counsel from case manager (gjf) Modified on 2/2/2006 to add text (gjf).
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P. Graf in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 77 ; submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (gjf, )
November 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 76 renewed motion to dismiss and brief in support (Piggush, James)
November 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 77 BRIEF in support of 76 renewed motion to dismiss filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tom Graf) (Piggush, James)
November 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to dismiss (renewed) by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Piggush, James)
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Proposed Order 75 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer & Robol (gjf)
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER 73 holding this matter in abeyance for 30 days from the date of this order; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries proposed order - abeyance (Piggush, James)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROPOSED ORDER regarding abeyance by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct 71 sent via U.S. Mail to attys Richard Thomas Robol and Roger W. Boer (cr, )
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unidentified Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel, The filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC(gjf)
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTES of status conference held before Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Court Reporter Kevin Gaugier) (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 60 plf's motion to file second amended complaint; intervenors are granted 28 days in which to move, answer, or otherwise plead thereto; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville; hearing re: Pltf's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint 60 ; Order to issue (Court Reporter Digital) (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, dmh)
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File 69 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer & Robol (gjf)
October 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 66 plf's motion for leave to file a reply brief; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT in support re 60 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE in support re 60 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with certificate of service filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified on 10/20/2005 to add text (gjf).
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for leave to file Response in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Robol, Richard) Modified on 10/20/2005 to add text (gjf).
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice of Motion Hearing 64 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding plf's renewed motion to file second amended complaint 60 : motion hearing is set for 10/20/2005 at 03:30 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville; (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
October 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of Wayne Lusardi in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 62 ; submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (gjf, )
October 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 62 reply to amended motion to file second amended complaint (Piggush, James)
October 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to motion re 60 amended motion to file 2nd amended complaint filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Affidavit of Wayne Lusardi# 2 Exhibit email communications) (Piggush, James)
October 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CHANGE OF ADDRESS with certificate of service by Richard Thomas Robol counsel for plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified on 10/4/2005 to add text (gjf).
September 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED MOTION to amend/correct Complaint by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Steve Libert in Support# 2 Attachment Brief in Support# 3 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint) (Robol, Richard)
September 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Rescheduling Hearing 59 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
September 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 10/7/05: status conference set for 10/20/2005 at 2:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell; (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to discovery request by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Part 1# 2 Attachment Part 2# 3 Attachment Part 3# 4 Attachment Part 4# 5 Attachment Part 5) (gjf, )
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Brief in Support# 2 Exhibit A Second Amended Complaint) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 9/22/2005 to add text (gjf).
September 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Service of Documents with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified on 9/19/2005 to add text (gjf).
August 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Strike 55 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
August 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 45 motion to amend/correct, denying 52 motion to strike; and scheduling a status conference before Hon. Robert Holmes Bell on Friday, October 7, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. at the Ford Federal Building, Courtroom 601, 110 Michigan Ave. NW, Grand Rapids, Michigan; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
August 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries of Motion to Strike and Brief in Support (Piggush, James)
August 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 BRIEF in support of 52 Motion to Strike filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James)
August 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to strike by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries; (Piggush, James)
August 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Filing U.S. State Dept. Communication with certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Attachment U.S. State Dept. Communication) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 8/17/2005 to add text (gjf).
August 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in support re 45 Motion to Amend Protective Order with certificate of service filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Robol, Richard) Modified on 8/15/2005 to add text (gjf).
August 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries CORRECTED AS TO EXHIBIT 1 ONLY - INTERVENORS' REPLY TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Piggush, James)
August 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE to motion re 45 CORRECTED AS TO EXHIBIT ONLY filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Request to Produce) (Piggush, James)
August 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries for Intervenors' Reply to Motion for Protective Order (Piggush, James)
August 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 (DISREGARD) RESPONSE to motion re 45 filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Intervenors' Request to Produce to Plaintiff) (Piggush, James) Modified on 8/8/2005 (ATTY WILL BE REFILING CORRECTION) (elc, ).
July 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to amend/correct Protective Order w/certificate of service by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Brief in Support# 2 Exhibit Inserts of Protective Order# 3 Affidavit Rebuttal Aff in Support of Motion) (Robol, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2005 to add text (gjf).
July 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Memorandum Opinion 43 and Order on Motion for Protective Order 44 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
July 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 40 motion for protective order; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
July 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re motion for protective order; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 41 Intervening Defendants Reply to Motion for Protective Order (Piggush, James)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE to motion re 40 protective order filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 request to produce# 2 Exhibit 2 response to request to produce# 3 Exhibit 3 e-mails# 4 Exhibit 4 order concerning docs filed under seal) (Piggush, James)
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order BRIEF in support of 40 motion for protective order (AS TAKEN FROM DOCUMENT #40) filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (mrs, )
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for protective order by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support# 2 Proposed Order) (Robol, Richard)
May 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Order 39 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 15 To the extent that Intervenors' motion requests a more definite statement, the motion is DENIED. This denial is predicated upon Plaintiff's compliance with Intervenors' request for documents and exhibits and the precise location of Defendant. It is anticipated that the Defendant's precise location will be filed under seal with this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenors will file a response within 30 days of receiving the requested information and location. All motions will be held in abeyance pending Intervenors' response; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES of motion hearing re 15 held before Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Court Reporter Kevin Gaugier) (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
May 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of John Robert Halsey in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 33 ; submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Vita) (gjf, )
May 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of James Edward Bruseth in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 33 ; submitted for filing by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Curriculum Vita) (gjf, )
May 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries Intervenors' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss; and Intervenors' Response to Request for Arrest Warrant (Piggush, James)
May 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE TO Request for Arrest Warrant filed by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Piggush, James)
May 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to response to motion re 15 to dismiss filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Halsey# 2 Exhibit Libert Letter# 3 Affidavit Bruseth Affidavit# 4 Exhibit Discovery Response (p 22)) (Piggush, James)
April 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries Intervenors' responses to Second Request for Admissions (Piggush, James)
April 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries Proof of Service Intervenors' Request to Produce (Piggush, James)
March 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries Intervenors' Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration's Discovery Requests (Piggush, James)
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order 28 and Order 29 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER re 15 ; hearing on Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss scheduled for 5/10/2005 at 1:00 pm; Intervenors shall have to and including 5/2/2005 in which to file reply briefs; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting STIPULATION 24 suspending proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
February 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries stip and proposed order suspending proceedings (Piggush, James)
February 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER suspending proceedings by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Piggush, James) Modified on 2/9/2005 to show this document replaces #23 above (ldm)
February 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION to suspend proceedings by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Piggush, James) Modified on 2/9/2005 to show this document is REPLACED BY #24 BELOW -- signatures missing (ldm)
February 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to Seal Document 22 sent via U.S. Mail to atty Boer (mrs, )
February 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re 20 Sealed Portion of Affidavit of Steven Libert by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (skr, )
February 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re 20 Sealed Portion of Affidavit of Scott J. Demel by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (skr, )
February 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 motion to seal document; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
January 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT 20 Portions of Affidavits by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC; (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Brief in Support# 2 Proposed Order) (Robol, Richard)
January 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to motion re 15 to Dismiss by Intervenors filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Scott Demel# 2 Affidavit Steven Libert# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4) (Robol, Richard)
January 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries discovery documents (Piggush, James)
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order 18 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer (gjf)
December 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting STIPULATION 17 to extend deadlines; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
December 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to extend deadlines by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Piggush, James)
November 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to Intervene 14 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Histed (gjf)
November 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BRIEF in support of 15 filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments:, # 1 Affidavit of Thomas Graf, # 2 Exhibit A) (gjf, )
November 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss by intervenor parties Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries ; (Attachments:, # 1 Affidavit of Wayne Lusardi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order of Dismissal) (gjf, )
November 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 8 motion to intervene; The Clerk shall accept for filing the proposed motion to dismiss submitted with the motion to intervene; Plaintiff will have 30 days from entry of this order in which to file a response to the motion to dismiss; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
October 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to motion re 8 w/cert of svc filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (gjf, )
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by movants Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries re 10 , 11 (elc, )
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P. Graf in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 9 ; submitted for filing by movants Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit A) (elc, )
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORIGINAL PAPER AFFIDAVIT of Wayne Lusardi in reference to the affidavit submitted electronically and assigned document number 9 ; submitted for filing by movants Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries (Attachments:, # 1 Exhibit A) (elc, )
October 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF in support of 8 Motion to Intervene filed by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, michigan department of history, arts and libraries (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene# 2 Proposed Document Motion to Dismiss# 3 Proposed Document Affidavit of Wayne Lusardi# 4 Proposed Document Lusardi Exhibit A# 5 Proposed Document Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 6 Proposed Document Order of Dismissal# 7 Proposed Document Affidavit of Thomas Graf# 8 Proposed Document Graf Exhibit A) (Piggush, James)
October 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to intervene (Piggush, James)
September 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER regarding warrant for arrest by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments:, # 1 Attachment A) (elc, )
September 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unidentified Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel, The filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (elc, )
June 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian and Order on Motion for Hearing 5 sent via U.S. Mail to Atty Boer & Robol (gjf)
June 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 2 motion to appoint custodian, denying 3 motion for hearing; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
June 16, 2004 Opinion or Order ATTORNEY Richard T. Robol ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (jal, )
June 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Richard T. Robol; attorney admission deadline set for 8/6/2004 (cmi, )
June 7, 2004 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: in the amount of $150.00, receipt number 343918; for filing fee (cmi, )
June 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for hearing in camera and supporting brief by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC ; (cmi, )
June 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to appoint custodian (substitute custodian) by plaintiff Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC ; (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (cmi, )
June 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Unidentified Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel, The filed by Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Warrant for Arrest# 2 Proposed Document Notice of Complaint and Arrest) (cmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC v. Unidentified Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Exploration Group LLC
Represented By: Richard Thomas Robol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Michigan Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By: Louis B. Reinwasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Michigan Department of History, Arts and Libraries
Represented By: Louis B. Reinwasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified, Wrecked and (For Salvage-Right Purposes), Abandoned Sailing Vessel believed to be the Griffin, lost in Lake Michigan, her tackle, apparel, appurtenances, cargo, etc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Republic of France
Represented By: Richard Thomas Robol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?