Wierengo v. Akal Security, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wierengo
Defendant: Akal Security, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00199
Filed: February 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Judge Janet T. Neff
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Akal Security, Inc against Kathleen Wierengo ; signed by EDMI Judge Robert H. Cleland (EDMI Judge Robert H. Cleland, lgw)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ; signed by EDMI Judge Robert H. Cleland (EDMI Judge Robert H. Cleland, lgw)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Kathleen Wierengo why case should not be dismissed as to defendants Michael Ferstl and Maxine Robinson for lack of prosecution. Response due by 4/6/2011; signed by EDMI Judge Robert H. Cleland (EDMI Judge Robert H. Cleland, lgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wierengo v. Akal Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wierengo
Represented By: H. Rhett Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akal Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?