McIntee #216588 v. Wolfenbarger
Petitioner: Daniel Eugene McIntee #216588
Respondent: Hugh Wolfenbarger
Case Number: 1:2009cv00873
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Montcalm
Presiding Judge: Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney
Presiding Judge: Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING IFP: petitioner to pay the entire appeal fee of $505.00 within 28 days or the appeal may be dismissed by the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; order lifting stay; the Clerk of the court shall reopen the case for further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 12 motion to transfer case to ; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER dismissing without prejudice unexhausted claims of petitioner for lack of exhaustion of state court remedies; remaining exhausted claims are stayed and the case is administratively closed until petitioner files a timely motion to amend the habeas petition to include any subsequently exhausted claims ; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntee #216588 v. Wolfenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Eugene McIntee #216588
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hugh Wolfenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?