Arnold v. Kellogg Company
Plaintiff: Sonya Arnold
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv01157
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff; this action is terminated; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, kw)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STAYING CASE ; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 7/30/2010; ; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that defendant Kellogg Company file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Arnold
Represented By: Scott E. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?