Stern-Hamilton v. Mason County District Library et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Sally Stern-Hamilton
Defendant: Mason County District Library, Robert Dickson and Marilyn Bannon
Case Number: 1:2011cv00717
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Jonker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER 32 dismissing case with prejudice ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 5, 2012 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Rule 41 Stipulation and Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice by defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library (Klaus, Kathleen)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER requiring closing documents to be submitted by 3/6/2012 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 6, 2012 Filing 30 REPORT of facilitative mediation held 1/23/2012; mediation is complete; case is settled, (Muth, Jon)
December 19, 2011 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 7231 as to plaintiff James W. Boyd(lep)
December 19, 2011 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 18429 as to defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library(lep)
December 14, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Jon R Muth ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 12/21/2011 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 12/21/2011(lep)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that this matter shall be submitted to Voluntary Facilitative Mediation ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: settlement conference set for 10/2/2012 at 2:00 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Hugh W. Brenneman Jr.; final pretrial conference set for 10/22/2012 at 3:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 11/6/2012 at 8:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 29, 2011 Filing 26 SELECTION of John R. Muth as facilitative mediator by plaintiff James W. Boyd(Blanchard, David)
November 29, 2011 Remark: James W. Boyd's role is changed to plaintiff per entry 25 (elc)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER granting 21 motion to substitute party; denying 22 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 31, 2011 Filing 24 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (see entry 22 to view document) filed by James W. Boyd, Sally Stern-Hamilton (Blanchard, David)
October 31, 2011 Filing 23 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to substitute party of Bankruptcy Trustee as Plaintiff/Real Party-in-Interest 21 filed by Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library (Attachments: # 1 Index Description of Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit A - Opinion in Roberts v Hamer, et al.)(Klaus, Kathleen)
October 17, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library(Klaus, Kathleen) Modified text on 10/17/2011 (elc).
October 17, 2011 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (see entry 22 to view document) by defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library; (elc)
October 14, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION and brief in support to substitute party of Bankruptcy Trustee as Plaintiff/Real Party-in-Interest by interested party James W Boyd; (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit A - Bankuptcy Order, # 3 Exhibit B - Knight v. New Farmers Nat'l Bank, # 4 Exhibit C - Piper v Dollar General Corp, # 5 Exhibit D - Charboneau v. Jordan, # 6 Exhibit E - Rodriquez v Mustang Manufacturing Co, # 7 Exhibit F - Dare v Citibank)(Blanchard, David) Modified to add text on 10/17/2011 (elc).
October 14, 2011 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW regarding MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 22 (subject matter jurisdiction over case to allow a rule 17 substitution of trustee as real party in interest) by defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rankin-Unpublished Decision)(Klaus, Kathleen) Modified text on 10/17/2011 (elc).
October 14, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David M. Blanchard on behalf of interested party James W Boyd ; party James W Boyd added (Blanchard, David)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting case schedule; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 15, 2011 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses by Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library(Klaus, Kathleen)
September 14, 2011 Filing 18 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil)
September 12, 2011 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses by Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library(Klaus, Kathleen)
September 7, 2011 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Blanchard, David)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 13 motion to dismiss; Defendant shall file its answer to the Complaint not later than 9/13/2011; the Rule 16 Conference will proceed as scheduled on 9/14/2011 at 4:00 PM; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 31, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION and memorandum in support to dismiss Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library; (Attachments: # 1 Index Description of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-Voluntary Petition, # 3 Exhibit B-Discharge, # 4 Exhibit C-Docket, # 5 Exhibit D-Maxwell case, # 6 Exhibit E-Rankin case)(Klaus, Kathleen) Modified to add text on 9/1/2011 (elc).
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER 11 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 18, 2011 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library (Klaus, Kathleen) Modified text on 8/19/2011 (ald).
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving STIPULATION 8 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (kvt)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (DISREGARD) ORDER approving STIPULATION 8 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil) Modified text on 8/1/2011; no document attached (kvt).
August 1, 2011 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library (Klaus, Kathleen)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/14/2011 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 9/8/2011 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil)
July 27, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kathleen H. Klaus on behalf of defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library (Klaus, Kathleen)
July 25, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Marilyn Bannon served on 7/19/2011, answer due 8/9/2011 (Blanchard, David)
July 25, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Robert Dickson served on 7/19/2011, answer due 8/9/2011 (Blanchard, David)
July 25, 2011 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Mason County District Library served on 7/19/2011, answer due 8/9/2011 (Blanchard, David)
July 13, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE that this electronically-filed case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker (ald)
July 13, 2011 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Blanchard, David)
July 13, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Sally Stern-Hamilton(Blanchard, David)
July 13, 2011 FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Sally Stern-Hamilton in the amount of $350, receipt number 0646-1988534 (Blanchard, David)
July 13, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Edward A. Macey on behalf of plaintiff Sally Stern-Hamilton (Macey, Edward)
July 13, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Marilyn Bannon, Robert Dickson, Mason County District Library and returned to attorney for plaintiff (ald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stern-Hamilton v. Mason County District Library et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Stern-Hamilton
Represented By: David M. Blanchard
Represented By: Edward A. Macey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County District Library
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dickson
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Bannon
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?