Hertel, Jr. v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Hertel, Jr.
Defendant: Bank of America NA, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Orlans Associates, P.C., Trott & Trott, P.C., Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00757
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Ingham
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the Federal Housing Finance Agency's motion to intervene. Note: The docket erroneously marked this motion as resolved by the Court's December 12, 2011 order. The present order now grants FHFA's motion to intervene (see Footnote 1); signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hertel, Jr. v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hertel, Jr.
Represented By: Brian P. Parker
Represented By: Daniel P. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Brian Clark Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Brian Clark Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Boettcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Brian Clark Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlans Associates, P.C.
Represented By: I. W. Winsten
Represented By: John D. Pirich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott & Trott, P.C.
Represented By: Joseph Aviv
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Brock Allen Swartzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Foley
Represented By: Clyde M. Metzger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?