Hodges v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kim Hodges
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2012cv00413
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Joseph G. Scoville
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 21 , granting in part and denying in part motion for attorney fees 19 ; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) Modified text on 8/14/2014 per chambers (pjw).
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 16 ; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the matter be remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hodges
Represented By: Thomas A. Geelhoed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?