McLean #275421 v. McKee
Petitioner: Ronald J. McLean #275421, Jr.
Respondent: Kenneth McKee
Case Number: 1:2012cv01401
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Ionia
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Maloney
Presiding Judge: Joseph G. Scoville
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing without prejudice unexhausted claims of petitioner for lack of exhaustion of state court remedies; remaining exhausted claims are stayed and the case is administratively closed until petitioner files a timely motion to amend the habeas petition to include any subsequently exhausted claims; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, kw)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: Petitioner must show case within 28 days of the date of this order; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, kw)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING IFP: petitioner to pay the entire fee of $5.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; filing fee to be submitted by 2/8/2013; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, kw) Modified text on 1/11/2013; replaces 4 (bd).
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING IFP: petitioner to pay the entire fee of $5.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; (filing fee to be submitted by 2/7/2013) signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, kw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLean #275421 v. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald J. McLean #275421, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?