Industrial Quick Search, Inc. et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Industrial Quick Search, Inc. and Michael Meiresonne
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00770
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Janet T. Neff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2014 131 Featured Case ORDER granting joint motion to stay 130 ; this matter is stayed and administratively closed until resolution of the petition for IPR, and further order of the Court; all future hearing dates and other deadlines are vacated, except for the depositions of third parties Michael Aronoff and Barry Aronoff; the pending motions 92 , 124 , 127 are dismissed without prejudice to re-file once the stay has been lifted; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 28, 2014 130 JOINT MOTION to stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review of The Patent-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne; (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
August 27, 2014 129 NOTICE to attorney Joseph Gavin regarding recent filing 128 , 127 (mrs)
August 27, 2014 128 BRIEF in support of MOTION to amend/correct Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answers and Invalidity Contentions 127 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration)(Gavin, Joseph)
August 27, 2014 127 MOTION to amend/correct Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Their Answers and Invalidity Contentions by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph)
August 22, 2014 126 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory Nos. 12-15 124 : motion hearing is set for 9/19/2014 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
August 21, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel 124 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 21, 2014 125 BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory Nos. 12-15 124 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gavin, Joseph)
August 21, 2014 124 MOTION to compel Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory Nos. 12-15 by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph)
August 5, 2014 123 RESPONSE TO 120 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Jotanovic, Mark)
July 25, 2014 122 Featured Case ORDER accepting PROPOSED ORDER 121 and granting 97 Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 10; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
July 24, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED ORDER regarding motion to compel 121 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 24, 2014 121 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 97) by defendant Google, Inc. (Gavin, Joseph) Modified text, see Order 122 accepting on 7/28/2014 (mrs). Modified text on 7/29/2014 (cmi).
July 21, 2014 120 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment that Claims 16, 17, 19 & 20 of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are Invalid as Indefinite 92 by defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(mrs)
July 21, 2014 119 Featured Case ORDER granting 114 motion for leave to file; Plaintiffs' response, if any, shall be filed no later than 8/5/2014 and shall not exceed three pages; no further briefing on this matter will be permitted absent good cause; the Clerk shall accept the proposed Supplemental Authority for filing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 17, 2014 117 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel held July 14, 2014 before Honorable Ellen Carmody; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 10/15/2014 ; redaction request due 8/7/2014 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
July 17, 2014 116 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held June 23, 2014 before Honorable Janet T. Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 10/15/2014 ; redaction request due 8/7/2014 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
July 17, 2014 115 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing held June 23, 2014 before Honorable Janet T. Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 10/15/2014 ; redaction request due 8/7/2014 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
July 16, 2014 114 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file a Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment with Exhibit 1 Proposed Document with Exhibit 1; and Exhibit 2 Proposed Order by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 7/16/2014 (mrs).
July 14, 2014 113 MINUTES of motion hearing re 111 Google's Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 10 held before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; granted, parties to submit proposed stipulated order within 10 days; (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
July 11, 2014 118 REPLY to response to motion 97 to compel a full and complete response to interrogatory #10 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sasha Mayergoyz, # 2 Exhibit 11 - Affirmatin in Support - Andrew Lavoott Bluestone, # 3 Exhibit 12 - Affidavit of Michael Meiresonne)(mrs)
July 11, 2014 112 Featured Case ORDER granting 111 Defendant Google's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 10 (Dkt. 111); the proposed reply brief is accepted for filing; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
July 10, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 10 111 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 9, 2014 111 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief to Response to Google's Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 10 by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph)
July 3, 2014 110 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to compel A FULL AND COMPLETE RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORY NO. 10 97 filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark Jotanovic Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - 2d Amended Complaint from Thomas Publ. v. Industrial Quick Search, # 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Christopher M. Terryn from Thomas Publ. v. Industrial Quick Search, # 4 Exhibit C - Screenshot from Archive of Industrial Quick Search website dated 10-18-2000)(Jotanovic, Mark)
July 1, 2014 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. on Google, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 1 (Gavin, Joseph)
June 27, 2014 108 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER granting STIPULATION 105 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
June 23, 2014 107 AMENDED MINUTES of Markman hearing and Motion hearing re 92 motion for summary judgment held before Judge Janet T. Neff; Order to issue; this entry amends entry 106 ; (Court Reporter: Kathy Anderson) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 23, 2014 106 MINUTES of Markman hearing and Motion hearing re 92 motion for summary judgment held before Judge Janet T. Neff; Order to issue; (Court Reporter: Kathy Anderson) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 23, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 105 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 20, 2014 105 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Protective Order by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
June 20, 2014 104 RESPONSE in support of MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment that Claims 16, 17, 19 & 20 of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are Invalid as Indefinite 92 filed by Google, Inc. (Gavin, Joseph)
June 18, 2014 103 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Compel a Full and Complete Response to Interrogatory No. 10 97 : motion hearing is set for 7/14/2014 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
June 16, 2014 102 EXHIBIT re 100 Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt.#92) by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J - Google Affiliate Agreement June 2000, # 2 Exhibit K - Newtons Telcom Dictionary Website, # 3 Proposed Order)(LeRoy, John)
June 16, 2014 101 EXHIBIT re 100 Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt #92) by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F Google 2001, # 2 Exhibit G - Oracle JSP, # 3 Exhibit H - Newtons Telecom Dictionary, # 4 Exhibit I - 096 File History (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit I - 096 File History (Part 2 of 2))(LeRoy, John)
June 16, 2014 100 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for summary judgment that Claims 16, 17, 19 & 20 of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are Invalid as Indefinite 92 filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 8,156,096, # 2 Exhibit B - Lycos Website, # 3 Exhibit C Skyhook Wireless, Inc. v. Google, Inc., # 4 Exhibit D Google, Inc. v. Traffic Information, LLC, # 5 Exhibit E Google website Fact or Fiction)(LeRoy, John) Modified text on 6/17/2014 (mrs).
June 16, 2014 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. on Google, Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement & Google, Inc.'s Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 7) (Gavin, Joseph)
June 16, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel a full and complete response to interrogatory no. 10 97 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 14, 2014 98 BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel a full and complete response to interrogatory No. 10 97 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declration of Sasha Mayergoyz)(Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 6/16/2014 (mrs).
June 14, 2014 97 MOTION to compel a full and complete response to interrogatory No. 10 by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 6/16/2014 (mrs).
June 12, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
June 11, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 95 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 11, 2014 95 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by defendant Google, Inc. (Vicari, Matthew)
June 11, 2014 94 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number 92 : motion hearing is set for 6/23/2014 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 10, 2014 93 BRIEF in support of MOTION for summary judgment that Claims 16, 17, 19 & 20 of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are Invalid as Indefinite 92 filed by Google, Inc.(Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 6/17/2014 (mrs).
June 10, 2014 92 MOTION for summary judgment that Claims 16, 17, 19 & 20 of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are Invalid as Indefinite by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 6/17/2014 (mrs).
June 10, 2014 91 EXHIBIT Joint Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Regarding Motion for Summary Judgment that Claims 16, 17, 19 & 20 of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are Invalid as Indefinite by defendant Google, Inc. (Gavin, Joseph)
June 10, 2014 90 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Compel held June 6, 2014 before Honorable Janet T. Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 9/8/2014 ; redaction request due 7/1/2014 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
June 10, 2014 89 TRANSCRIPT of Premotion Conference Proceedings held June 5, 2014 before Honorable Janet T. Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 9/8/2014 ; redaction request due 7/1/2014 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
June 6, 2014 88 MINUTES of motion hearing re 43 Joint Motion for Protective Order, granted in part, denied in part, parties to submit proposed amended stipulated protective order within 14 days; and 47 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, granted in part, denied in part, parties to submit proposed stipulated order within 7 days; held before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
June 6, 2014 87 Featured Case ORDER regarding pre-motion conference: Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion and Brief shall be filed by June 10, 2014, response shall be filed by June 16, 2014, and any reply filed by June 20, 2014; the deadline for fact discovery is extended to September 26, 2014; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 5, 2014 86 MINUTES of informal conference and pre-motion conference re 62 held before Judge Janet T. Neff; Order to issue; (Court Reporter: Kathy Anderson) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 30, 2014 85 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. on Subpoenas to testify at the depositions of Ryan Norman and Nathan Hibma (Gavin, Joseph)
May 29, 2014 84 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Combined Joint Motion for Protective Order 43 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 47 : motion hearing is set for 6/6/2014 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
May 27, 2014 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. on Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories and Google, Inc.'s Fourth Set of Requests for Production (Gavin, Joseph)
May 8, 2014 82 ADDENDUM Summarizing Plaintiffs' Anticipated Summary Judgment Arguments per 28 by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne; (Lewry, Thomas) Modified text on 5/8/2014 (mrs).
May 8, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Israel A. Mayergoyz on behalf of defendant Google, Inc. (Mayergoyz, Israel)
May 8, 2014 81 Featured Case ORDER denying joint motion to change venue 34 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 8, 2014 80 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re 34 motion to transfer venue; Order to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 5, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER granting PROPOSED STIPULATED ORDER 78 ; the pre-motion conference and the informal conference scheduled for May 16, 2014 are adjourned to June 5, 2014 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 2, 2014 78 PROPOSED ORDER regarding stipulated Order Adjourning Pre-Motion Conference and Informal Conference by defendant Google, Inc. (Vicari, Matthew)
May 1, 2014 77 MARKMAN BRIEF on claim construction issues submitted for filing by defendants AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent), # 2 Exhibit B (Microsoft Computer Dictionary), # 3 Exhibit C (Addendum Summarizing Summary Judgment Arguments), # 4 Exhibit D (Proposed Order), # 5 Declaration)(Gavin, Joseph)
May 1, 2014 76 MARKMAN BRIEF on claim construction issues submitted for filing by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - USPN 8,156,096, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Definition of Website from Googles Search Engine, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Definition of Home Page from Googles Search Engine, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Definition of Side from Googles Search Engine)(LeRoy, John)
April 29, 2014 75 LETTER from attorney William G. Abbatt for plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne regarding New Authority in Regard to Google's Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 34) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment In re Groupon, Inc., ___ U.S. ___ (Fed. Cir. 2014-118, 4/23/14))(Abbatt, William)
April 28, 2014 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of (1) Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Google's 1st Interrogatories (No. 10); (2) Second Supplement to Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1); and (3) Corrected 3rd Interrogatories to Google (No. 7) (Jotanovic, Mark) Modified text on 4/29/2014 (ald).
April 25, 2014 73 NOTICE Jointly proposed briefing schedule for defendant's summary judgment alleging that the asserted claims of U.S. Patent 8,156,096 are invalid as indefinite by defendant Google, Inc. (Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 4/28/2014 (bd).
April 23, 2014 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Second Supplemental Response to Google, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 2) (Jotanovic, Mark)
April 22, 2014 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Plaintiffs Supplemental Responses to Google, Inc.s 1st Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5, 7 & 9) (Jotanovic, Mark)
April 21, 2014 70 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Joint Comprehensive Claim Construction Statement by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Jotanovic, Mark)
April 21, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number 62 : pre-motion conference is set for 5/16/2014 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 16, 2014 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. of Google, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production (Gavin, Joseph)
April 8, 2014 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Google, Inc. on Defendants' Proposed Claim Constructions (Gavin, Joseph)
April 8, 2014 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. on Google, Inc.'s Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 6) (Gavin, Joseph)
April 8, 2014 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Plaintiffs' Responses to Google, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production and Plaintiffs' Proposed Constructions (LeRoy, John)
April 3, 2014 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Discovery (Jotanovic, Mark)
April 2, 2014 63 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Google, Inc. 62 ; filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
April 1, 2014 62 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Google, Inc. (Gavin, Joseph)
April 1, 2014 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne for Service of Plaintiffs' Responses to Google 1st Interrogatories (Jotanovic, Mark)
April 1, 2014 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. Google, Inc.'s Certificate of Service for Discovery (Gavin, Joseph)
March 20, 2014 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne for Service of Plaintiff's Proposed List of Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Jotanovic, Mark)
March 10, 2014 58 REPLY to response to motion 47 to compel filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18)(mrs) Modified text on 3/13/2014 (kvt).
March 10, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
March 9, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for leave to file reply brief in support of motion to compel 56 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 7, 2014 56 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne; (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel)(Jotanovic, Mark)
March 7, 2014 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne for Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Plaintiffs (Jotanovic, Mark)
March 7, 2014 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne for Plaintiffs Interrogatory No. 6 (LeRoy, John)
March 3, 2014 53 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to compel 47 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Krista S. Schwartz (with attachments))(Gavin, Joseph)
February 24, 2014 52 NOTICE of Limitation of Prior Art by defendants AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2))(Gavin, Joseph) Modified text on 2/25/2014 (mrs).
February 18, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel 47 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 14, 2014 51 Additional EXHIBIT re 48 16-17 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiffs Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 17 - Order in Peformance Pricing v. Google Dkt. #194)(LeRoy, John)
February 14, 2014 50 Additional EXHIBIT re 48 11-15 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 - Lanier 12-19-13 e-mail to LeRoy, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Google 2-9-11 hearing transcrip, # 3 Exhibit 13 - Northern District Indiana Local Rules, # 4 Exhibit 14 - Northern District of Ohio Local-Patent-Rule-2.2, # 5 Exhibit 15 - Form 10-K)(LeRoy, John)
February 14, 2014 49 Additional EXHIBIT re 48 6-10 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 - Schwartz 1-20-14 Letter to LeRoy, # 2 Exhibit 7 - LeRoy 2-7-14 ltr to Schwartz re supplemental response to ROGs, # 3 Exhibit 8 - Google's First Suppl Resp to Plaintiffs' Rogs 1, 3 and 4, # 4 Exhibit 9 - Google's Supplemental Response to Rog 5, # 5 Exhibit 10 - Leroy 12-19-13 email to Lanier)(LeRoy, John)
February 14, 2014 48 BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel 47 filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs 1st Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Google's Objs & Responses to 1st Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit 3 - LeRoy 12-28-13 Ltr to Schwartz re ROGs & RFPs, # 4 Exhibit 4 - LeRoy 14-01-20 Ltr to Schwartz re discovery process, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Schwartz 1-12-14 email to LeRoy)(LeRoy, John)
February 14, 2014 47 MOTION to compel by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne; (LeRoy, John)
February 13, 2014 Featured Case (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING COMBINED JOINT MOTION for protective order 43 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 12, 2014 46 EXHIBIT re 43 Cover Sheet for Exhibits P - S by defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P, # 2 Exhibit Q, # 3 Exhibit R, # 4 Exhibit S)(Gavin, Joseph)
February 12, 2014 45 EXHIBIT re 43 Cover Sheet for Exhibits K - O by defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O)(Gavin, Joseph)
February 12, 2014 44 EXHIBIT re 43 Cover Sheet Exhibits F - J by defendant Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J)(Gavin, Joseph)
February 12, 2014 43 JOINT MOTION for protective order Combined Joint Motion and Brief for Protective Order by defendant Google, Inc.; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Gavin, Joseph)
February 11, 2014 42 DECLARATION re 39 (CORRECTED) in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
February 11, 2014 41 NOTICE to attorney John S. LeRoy regarding recent filing 40 (mrs)
February 10, 2014 40 DECLARATION re 39 in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
February 10, 2014 39 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to change venue 34 filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Google Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Silber CNET page, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Google's Ann Arbor Office, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - References Considered by Examiner)(LeRoy, John)
January 31, 2014 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Christopher H. Rohrs (Jotanovic, Mark)
January 31, 2014 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Plaintiff'fs Corrected Interrogatory 2 to Google (Jotanovic, Mark)
January 31, 2014 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of Plaintiff's 1st Requests for Production of Documents and 1st Interrogatories to Google (Jotanovic, Mark)
January 23, 2014 35 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to change venue 34 filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Abeer Dubey, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Louis Marikas, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Krista S. Schwartz)(Gavin, Joseph)
January 23, 2014 34 JOINT MOTION to change venue by defendant Google, Inc.; (Gavin, Joseph)
January 14, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tharan Gregory Lanier on behalf of defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Lanier, Tharan)
January 14, 2014 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Krista Sue Schwartz on behalf of defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Schwartz, Krista)
December 20, 2013 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Jotanovic, Mark)
November 21, 2013 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. for AVG Technologies USA, Inc.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Baghdassarian, Mark) Modified text on 11/21/2013 (bd).
November 21, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark A. Baghdassarian on behalf of defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Baghdassarian, Mark)
November 20, 2013 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne of 26(a) Disclosures and Notice of Asserted Claims (Jotanovic, Mark)
November 20, 2013 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Google, Inc. of 26(a) disclosures (Gavin, Joseph)
November 12, 2013 29 TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16 Proceedings held November 6, 2013 before Honorable Janet T. Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 2/10/2014 ; redaction request due 12/3/2013 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
November 8, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER: the parties' claim construction briefs shall each include an addendum summarizing anticipated summary judgment arguments in relation to the claim construction issues (the addendum will not count in the 20-page limit for the brief); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 7, 2013 27 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: informal conference set for 5/16/2014 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; Markman hearing set for 6/23/2014 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 6, 2013 26 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Janet T. Neff; Case Management Order to issue; (Court Reporter: Kathy Anderson) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 5, 2013 25 Additional EXHIBIT re 24 Joint Position Statement for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F - SimpleAir, Inc. v. Google)(LeRoy, John)
November 5, 2013 24 NOTICE re 23 Filing of Joint Position Statement for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Texas Model Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Delaware Standard, # 3 Exhibit C - Lexington v. Google, # 4 Exhibit D - View 360 Solutions v. Google, # 5 Exhibit E - E-contact Technologies v. Google)(LeRoy, John)
October 31, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Henry S. Emrich on behalf of plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Emrich, Henry)
October 30, 2013 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT of the Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Dates, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Stipulated Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Defs Stipulated Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' ESI Agreement, # 5 Exhibit E - Defs ESI Agreement)(Lewry, Thomas)
October 30, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Krista Sue Schwartz on behalf of defendant Google, Inc. (Schwartz, Krista)
October 30, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tharan Gregory Lanier on behalf of defendant Google, Inc. (Lanier, Tharan)
October 11, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/6/2013 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; status report due by 10/30/2013; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 11, 2013 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 10 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by AVG Technologies USA, Inc.(Pinsky, H.)
October 11, 2013 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AVG Technologies USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AVG Technologies Holding B.V., Corporate Parent AVG Technologies N.V. for AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Pinsky, H.)
September 13, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting STIPULATION 18 ; Defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. has until October 11, 2013 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 12, 2013 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for AVG Technologies to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
September 12, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of H. Rhett Pinsky on behalf of defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (Pinsky, H.)
September 11, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice STIPULATED PROPOSED ORDER 15 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 11, 2013 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant Google Inc.'s Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 re: no parent corporation by Google, Inc. (Vicari, Matthew) Modified text on 9/12/2013 (dfw).
September 10, 2013 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for AVG Technologies to Answer or Otherwise Plead by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
September 9, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph J. Gavin on behalf of defendant Google, Inc. (Gavin, Joseph)
September 9, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew L Vicari on behalf of defendant Google, Inc. (Vicari, Matthew)
September 9, 2013 14 ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Google, Inc.(Vicari, Matthew)
August 23, 2013 13 PROOF OF SERVICE on behalf of AVG Technologies USA, Inc. served on 8/21/2013, answer due 9/11/2013 (LeRoy, John) Modified text on 8/26/2013 (dfw).
August 23, 2013 12 PROOF OF SERVICE on behalf of Google, Inc. served on 8/21/2013, answer due 9/11/2013 (LeRoy, John) Modified text on 8/26/2013 (dfw).
August 19, 2013 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc. (pjw)
August 16, 2013 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against AVG Technologies USA, Inc. filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USPN 8,156,096, # 2 Summons AVG Technologies USA, Inc.)(LeRoy, John)
August 7, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER 8 ; Defendant shall have until September 9, 2013 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 6, 2013 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension Of Time For Google To Answer Or Otherwise Plead by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
July 31, 2013 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED on behalf of Google, Inc. served on 7/19/2013, answer due 8/9/2013 (LeRoy, John) Modified text on 8/2/2013 (dfw).
July 24, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William G. Abbatt on behalf of plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Abbatt, William)
July 23, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas A. Lewry on behalf of plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Lewry, Thomas)
July 23, 2013 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark A. Jotanovic on behalf of plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Jotanovic, Mark)
July 18, 2013 6 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a PATENT ACTION (dfw)
July 18, 2013 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Google, Inc. (dfw)
July 18, 2013 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Janet T. Neff (dfw)
July 17, 2013 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
July 17, 2013 2 NOTICE re 1 Report on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (LeRoy, John)
July 17, 2013 FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiffs Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-2628825 (LeRoy, John)
July 17, 2013 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Google, Inc. filed by Industrial Quick Search, Inc., Michael Meiresonne (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USPN 8,156,096, # 2 Summons)(LeRoy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Quick Search, Inc. et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Quick Search, Inc.
Represented By: William G. Abbatt
Represented By: Mark A. Jotanovic
Represented By: John S. LeRoy
Represented By: Thomas A. Lewry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Meiresonne
Represented By: William G. Abbatt
Represented By: Mark A. Jotanovic
Represented By: John S. LeRoy
Represented By: Thomas A. Lewry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?