Cyber Solutions International, LLC v. Priva Security Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cyber Solutions International, LLC
Defendant: Priva Security Corporation, Priva Technologies, Inc., PRO Marketing Sales, Inc. and William Sibert
Case Number: 1:2013cv00867
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyber Solutions International, LLC v. Priva Security Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyber Solutions International, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Bejin
Represented By: Charles A. Bieneman
Represented By: Daniel G. Kielczewski
Represented By: John VanOphem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priva Security Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priva Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO Marketing Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Anne L. Buckleitner
Represented By: Thomas J. Gezon
Represented By: Barry C Kane
Represented By: Lucas J. McCarthy
Represented By: Erik Hodne Olson
Represented By: John A. Smietanka
Represented By: Steven Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?