Smith #267009 v. Weers et al.
Plaintiff: Derrick Lee Smith #267009
Defendant: Unknown Weers
Case Number: 1:2015cv00042
Filed: January 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Branch
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Carmody
Presiding Judge: Janet T. Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 121 ; Defendants' motion for summary judgment 101 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 110 is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file sworn affidavit and documents 124 is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion to stay all proceedings 129 is DENIED as moot; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION; Order to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/15/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith #267009 v. Weers et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Lee Smith #267009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Weers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?