Rayos #311171 v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Rayos #311171
Defendant: Erica Huss, Kristoffer Nevins, Lloyd E. Thurby, John F. Kelly, Shawn Ryske, Unknown Kerr, Unknown Sanders, Unknown Guiles and Amy J. Scott
Case Number: 1:2015cv01153
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Marquette
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 JUDGMENT ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 235 ; denying 184 and 202 motions for partial summary judgment; granting in part 196 motion for summary judgment; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 216 and dismissing claims against Lloyd Thurlby; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 153 ; denying motion for injunctive relief 125 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER MODIFYING and ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 112 ; defendants' motion for summary judgment 87 is granted in part; dismissing defendants Kelley, Ryske and Scott; dismissing all claims against defendants in their official capacities; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 86 ; denying motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 56 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the MI Department of Corrections to furnish the US Marshal with the last known addresses of defendants Unknown Sanders and Unknown Nevins for purposes of effectuating service; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING PARTIAL DISMISSAL and PARTIAL SERVICE;and denying 4 motion to appoint counsel; within 14 days, plaintiff shall file a copy of this order and sufficient additional copies of the complaint for service upon the remaining defendants; upon receipt of the copies, the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the remaining defendants; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayos #311171 v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Rayos #311171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristoffer Nevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E. Thurby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Ryske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Guiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy J. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?