Denhollander et al v. Michigan State University et al
Plaintiff: Denhollander, Lindsey Schuett, Melissa Vigogne, Jane A17 Doe, Madeleine Jones, Stephanie Robinson, Amanda McGeachie, Kassie Powell, Jane A31 Doe, Katherine Black, Jane A108 Doe, Lindsay Woolever, Jane A38 Doe, Amy Labadie, Jennifer Hayes, Ashley Erickson, M.P., Jane A62 Doe, C.C., Kara Johnson, Jane A89 Doe, Anna Ludes, Jane A53 Doe, Jane A33 Doe, Jane A7 Doe, Jane A32 Doe, Jane A110 Doe, Jane A97 Doe, Amanda Barterian, Lynlee Phillips, Jane A10 Doe, Jane A100 Doe, Jane A92 Doe, L.B., Jane A45 Doe, Jane A51 Doe, Jane Q. Doe, Alison Chauvette, Anna Dayton, Christie Achenbach, Jane A66 Doe, Emily Morales, Jane A55 Doe, Jane A50 Doe, Margaret Nichols, Jane A106 Doe, Marion Siebert, Gwen Anderson, Nicole Soos, Jane A64 Doe, Hannah Morrow, Taryn Akemi Look, Jaime Doski, Whitney Burns, Jane A90 Doe, Jane A103 Doe, Jane A59 Doe, Brittney Schumann, Selena Brennan, Jane A29 Doe, Sterling Riethman, Chandler Lynn, Olivia Cowan, Kathryn Middleton, K.J., Jane A70 Doe, Jane A98 Doe, Bethany Bauman, Jane A99 Doe, Alexis Moore, Jane Z. Doe, Jane A2 Doe, Samantha Ursch, Vanasia Bradley, Tiffany Dutton, Megan Halicek, Jane A21 Doe, Jane A73 Doe, Jennifer Rood Bedford, Jane A74 Doe, Brianne Randall, Rebecca Mark, Marie Anderson, Jane A95 Doe, Jane A30 Doe, Jessica Howard, Katelyn Skrabis, Danielle Moore, Jane A91 Doe, Jane A102 Doe, Kaylee Lorincz, Jane B. Doe, Jenelle Moule, Jane A71 Doe, Jane A107 Doe, Katherine Mahon, Alexandra Romano, Jane A78 Doe, Jane A93 Doe, Amanda Cormier, Jane A12 Doe, Jane A105 Doe, Jane A109 Doe, Chelsea Williams, Jane A43 Doe, Jane A63 Doe, Charla Burill, Jane A48 Doe, Helena Weick, Jane A39 Doe, Emily Goetz, Kyle Stephens, Rachael Denhollander and Jane A65 Doe
Defendant: Michigan State University, Jeffrey R. Kovan, USA Gymnastics, Inc., Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Kathie Klages, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel and William D. Strampel
Petitioner: Chloe Alysse Myers
Intervenor Plaintiff: Jane KMSU Doe, Jane Y. Doe, Jane JMSU Doe, Jane H.T. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane BMSU Doe, Jane A.P. Doe, Jane L.K. Doe, Jane H.B. Doe, Jane J.S. Doe, Jane FMSU Doe, Jane W.N. Doe, Jane S.M. Doe, Jane GMSU Doe, Jane HMSU Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane IMSU Doe, Jane H.H. Doe, Jane R.L. Doe, Jane DMSU Doe, Jane L.A. Doe, Jane EMSU Doe, Jane B.A. Doe, Jane ALF-1 Doe, John AMSU Doe, Jane LMSU Doe and Jane CMSU Doe
Case Number: 1:2017cv00029
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Ellen S Carmody
2 Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 1433 RESPONSE TO FIRST MOTION to supplement to briefing(1034 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-SJB, 1045 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-SJB, 1040 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-SJB, 1276 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-SJB, 1200 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-SJB, 286 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-SJB, 1375 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-SJB, 1046 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-SJB, 1041 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-SJB, 1033 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-SJB, 1037 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-SJB, 1027 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-SJB, 1026 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-SJB, 1193 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-SJB, 1046 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-SJB, 1055 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-SJB, 1165 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-SJB, 1031 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-SJB, 1116 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-SJB, 1200 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-SJB, 1419 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB, 1040 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-SJB, 1050 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-SJB, 1086 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-SJB, 1093 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-SJB, 643 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-SJB, 1364 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-SJB, 1040 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-SJB, 865 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-SJB, 1026 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-SJB, 1047 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-SJB, 1037 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-SJB, 1122 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-SJB, 1030 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-SJB, 785 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-SJB, 1027 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-SJB, 1031 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-SJB, 1045 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-SJB, 1158 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-SJB, 1029 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-SJB, 1046 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-SJB, 1101 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-SJB, 1362 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-SJB, 1044 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-SJB, 642 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-SJB, 1292 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-SJB, 288 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-SJB, 1201 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-SJB, 644 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-SJB, 643 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-SJB, 1035 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-SJB, 1023 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-SJB, 1030 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-SJB, 1046 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-SJB, 645 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-SJB, 1040 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-SJB, 1163 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-SJB, 237 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-SJB, 1030 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-SJB, 1027 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-SJB, 1037 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-SJB, 1027 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-SJB, 1355 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-SJB, 1038 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-SJB, 1043 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-SJB, 1030 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-SJB, 1029 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-SJB, 642 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-SJB, 1118 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-SJB, 643 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-SJB, 787 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-SJB, 1030 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-SJB, 986 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-SJB, 1034 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-SJB, 642 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-SJB, 1132 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-SJB, 1189 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-SJB, 1031 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-SJB, 1031 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-SJB, 1026 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-SJB, 1060 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-SJB, 1033 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-SJB, 1374 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-SJB, 1141 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-SJB, 1035 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-SJB, 1038 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-SJB, 1362 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-SJB, 493 in 1:19-cv-00070-GJQ-SJB, 1038 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-SJB, 1030 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-SJB, 1028 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-SJB, 1035 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-SJB, 1043 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-SJB, 1044 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-SJB, 1044 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-SJB, 1034 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-SJB, 1041 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-SJB, 1126 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-SJB, 1041 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-SJB, 642 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-SJB, 1038 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-SJB, 1027 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-SJB, 1048 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-SJB) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Currently Pending Consolidated Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - AOGC v. MSU Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1432 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(892 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-SJB, 801 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-SJB, 803 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-SJB, 932 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-SJB, 811 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-SJB, 1149 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-SJB, 760 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-SJB, 1148 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-SJB, 60 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-SJB, 829 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-SJB, 896 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-SJB, 808 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-SJB, 815 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-SJB, 975 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-SJB, 807 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-SJB, 1136 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-SJB, 11 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-SJB, 808 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-SJB, 822 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-SJB, 1138 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-SJB, 809 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-SJB, 875 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-SJB, 819 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-SJB, 417 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-SJB, 817 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-SJB, 638 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-SJB, 1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB, 937 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-SJB, 801 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-SJB, 797 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-SJB, 867 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-SJB, 906 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-SJB, 808 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-SJB, 801 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-SJB, 1129 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-SJB, 860 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-SJB, 820 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-SJB, 966 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-SJB, 915 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-SJB, 811 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-SJB, 963 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-SJB, 974 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-SJB, 822 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-SJB, 811 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-SJB, 559 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-SJB, 890 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-SJB, 803 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-SJB, 804 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-SJB, 1136 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-SJB, 799 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-SJB, 417 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-SJB, 816 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-SJB, 418 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-SJB, 939 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-SJB, 807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-SJB, 820 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-SJB, 804 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-SJB, 267 in 1:19-cv-00070-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-SJB, 809 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-SJB, 62 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-SJB, 820 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-SJB, 974 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-SJB, 417 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-SJB, 804 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-SJB, 561 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-SJB, 809 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-SJB, 834 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-SJB, 1050 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-SJB, 1066 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-SJB, 419 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-SJB, 815 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-SJB, 819 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-SJB, 817 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-SJB, 900 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-SJB) filed by Erika Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Cheryl Thomas, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Dr. Sanford Koltonow); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1431 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(892 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-SJB, 801 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-SJB, 803 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-SJB, 932 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-SJB, 811 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-SJB, 1149 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-SJB, 760 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-SJB, 1148 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-SJB, 60 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-SJB, 829 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-SJB, 896 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-SJB, 808 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-SJB, 815 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-SJB, 975 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-SJB, 807 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-SJB, 1136 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-SJB, 11 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-SJB, 808 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-SJB, 822 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-SJB, 1138 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-SJB, 809 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-SJB, 875 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-SJB, 819 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-SJB, 417 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-SJB, 817 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-SJB, 638 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-SJB, 1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB, 937 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-SJB, 801 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-SJB, 797 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-SJB, 867 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-SJB, 906 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-SJB, 808 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-SJB, 801 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-SJB, 1129 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-SJB, 860 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-SJB, 820 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-SJB, 966 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-SJB, 814 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-SJB, 915 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-SJB, 811 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-SJB, 963 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-SJB, 974 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-SJB, 822 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-SJB, 811 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-SJB, 559 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-SJB, 890 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-SJB, 803 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-SJB, 804 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-SJB, 1136 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-SJB, 799 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-SJB, 417 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-SJB, 816 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-SJB, 418 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-SJB, 939 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-SJB, 807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-SJB, 820 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-SJB, 804 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-SJB, 800 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-SJB, 267 in 1:19-cv-00070-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-SJB, 809 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-SJB, 62 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-SJB, 820 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-SJB, 974 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-SJB, 417 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-SJB, 805 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-SJB, 812 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-SJB, 416 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-SJB, 804 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-SJB, 561 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-SJB, 818 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-SJB, 809 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-SJB, 834 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-SJB, 1050 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-SJB, 1066 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-SJB, 419 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-SJB, 815 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-SJB, 819 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-SJB, 802 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-SJB, 817 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-SJB, 900 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-SJB) Response in Opposition to MSU Defendants' Joint Side Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Angela Stewart filed by Angela Stewart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jackson High School Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jackson High School 1996 Yearbook, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pictures of Angela Stewart on Jackson High School's Softball Team, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Stacy Hotchkin, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pictures of 1996 Atlanta Summer Olympics Items from Defendant Nassar, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pictures of Defendant Nassar Wearing 1996 Atlanta Summer Olympics Shirt); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1430 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants(1428 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by John F1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Waun, Thomas)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1429 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Order Granting Minor Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Against the MSU Defendants by plaintiff John F1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Waun, Thomas)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1428 MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants by plaintiff John F1 Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Waun, Thomas)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1427 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel and Destiny Teac(1426 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB, 1382 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-SJB) filed by Julia Epple; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1426 MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiff Julia Epple; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 ORDER granting (1407) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 ORDER granting (1405) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 ORDER granting (1403) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER granting (1380) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 ORDER striking RESPONSE in opposition #1418 filed by Plaintiff Angela Stewart; striking RESPONSE in opposition #1420 filed by Plaintiff Erika Davis; Plaintiffs Stewart and Davis may file another brief by 3/10/2020; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1420 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Erika Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Cheryl Thomas, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Dr. Sanford Koltonow); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1419 FIRST MOTION to supplement to briefing by plaintiff Meaghan Williams; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Local Rule 7.1(d) Certificate, #2 Exhibit - Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Michigan Court of Claims Protective Order, #4 Exhibit B - Part 01 - FOIA_000001-000036, #5 Exhibit B - Part 02 - FOIA_000037-000049, #6 Exhibit B - Part 03 - FOIA_000050-000067, #7 Exhibit B - Part 04 - FOIA_000068-000100, #8 Exhibit B - Part 05 - FOIA_000101-000121, #9 Exhibit B - Part 06 - FOIA_000122-000137, #10 Exhibit B - Part 07 - FOIA_000138-000150, #11 Exhibit B - Part 08 - FOIA_000151-000163, #12 Exhibit B - Part 09 - FOIA_000164-000179, #13 Exhibit B - Part 10 - FOIA_000180-000224, #14 Exhibit C - MSU Sports Medicine & Performance Organizational Chart, #15 Exhibit D - Dr. Kovan December 20, 2019 Deposition Transcript, #16 Exhibit E - MIOSHA and MSU Bloodborne Pathogen Protocols); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Fraser, Joseph)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1418 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-SJB) Response in Opposition to MSU Defendants' Joint Side Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Angela Stewart filed by Angela Stewart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jackson High School Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jackson High School 1996 Yearbook, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pictures of Angela Stewart on Jackson High School's Softball Team, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Stacy Hotchkin, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pictures of 1996 Atlanta Summer Olympics Items from Defendant Nassar, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pictures of Defendant Nassar Wearing 1996 Atlanta Summer Olympics Shirt); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1417 MOTION to dismiss Michigan State University, the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiffs A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Ellis, Tiffany)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1416 PROPOSED ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal by plaintiff Tristan Brown ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Zoglio, David)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 ORDER granting (1399) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 ORDER granting (1398) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER granting (1396) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 ORDER granting (1387) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 ORDER granting (1383) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 ORDER granting (1381) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 ORDER granting (1378) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1408 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollack, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and Kathi Klages(1407 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane KJTM Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Hilliard, Robert)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1407 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-806) Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollack, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and Kathi Klages by plaintiff Jane KJTM Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Hilliard, Robert) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (mg).
February 7, 2020 Filing 1406 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and Kathie Klages(1405 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane MKG Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Hilliard, Robert)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1405 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1045) Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and Kathie Klages by plaintiff Jane MKG Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Hilliard, Robert) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (mg).
February 5, 2020 Filing 1404 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (108 in 1:19-cv-00903-GJQ-SJB) filed by Nathalie Trottier; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1403 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-915) by plaintiff Nathalie Trottier; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (mg).
January 29, 2020 Filing 1402 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Michigan State University; Board of Trustees of MSU; William Strampel; Jeffrey Kovan; Douglas Dietzel; Gary Stollak; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk; and Kathie Klages(1399 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane O. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1401 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Michigan State University; Board of Trustees of MSU; William Strampel; Jeffrey Kovan; Douglas Dietzel; Gary Stollak; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages(1398 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane L1. Doe, Jane D. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1400 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Bethany Kaufmann ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Frazho, Antoinette)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1399 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:19-cv-579) Michigan State University; Board of Trustees of MSU; William Strampel; Jeffrey Kovan; Douglas Dietzel; Gary Stollak; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk; and Kathie Klages by plaintiff Jane O. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (mg).
January 24, 2020 Filing 1398 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Michigan State University; Board of Trustees of MSU; William Strampel; Jeffrey Kovan; Douglas Dietzel; Gary Stollak; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages by plaintiffs Jane L1. Doe, Jane D. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (mg).
January 24, 2020 Filing 1397 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Defendants Michigan State University, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathy Klages, William D. Strampel, D.O. and Jeffrey Kovan, D.O.(1396 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane KRA Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Freid, Debra)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1396 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-993) Defendants Michigan State University, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathy Klages, William D. Strampel, D.O. and Jeffrey Kovan, D.O. by plaintiff Jane KRA Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Freid, Debra) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (mg).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1384) to adjourn deadline to respond to complaint in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 ORDER granting (1370) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER granting (1360) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER granting (1351) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 ORDER granting (1349) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 ORDER granting (1347) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 ORDER granting (1342) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (jas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1388 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss #1387 filed by Jane BR1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (mg).
January 21, 2020 Filing 1387 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1169) by plaintiff Jane BR1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (mg).
January 17, 2020 Filing 1386 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus) #1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB (re: 1:18-cv-1047) filed by Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (mg).
January 17, 2020 Filing 1385 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus) #1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB(re: 1:18-cv-1046) filed by Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (mg).
January 17, 2020 Filing 1384 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:19-cv-903) to Adjourn Deadline to Respond to Complaint by defendants Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Michigan State University, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (mg).
January 14, 2020 Filing 1383 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Dominique Corbin; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (mg).
January 7, 2020 Filing 1382 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss as to defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk(1381 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (mg).
January 7, 2020 Filing 1381 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1038) as to defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order of Dismissal); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (mg).
January 6, 2020 Filing 1380 FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1005) voluntarily by plaintiff Tristan Brown; (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of concurrence, #2 proof of service); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Zoglio, David) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (mg).
January 3, 2020 Filing 1379 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel and Destiny Teac(1378 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1378 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1047) With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiffs Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (mg).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 ORDER granting (1331) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 (DISREGARD) ORDER granting (1331) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/2/2020; disregarded under the directive of chambers, this entry replaced by #1377 (mg).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 ORDER granting (1329) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 ORDER granting (1327) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 ORDER granting (1326) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORDER granting (1325) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1371 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss #1370 filed by Chloe Alysse Myers; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Day, Devin) Modified text on 12/23/2019 (mg).
December 23, 2019 Filing 1370 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-886) by plaintiff Chloe Alysse Myers; (Attachments: #1 Attachment); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Day, Devin) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (mg).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 ORDER granting (1324) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 ORDER granting (1323) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 ORDER granting (1322) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1366 REPLY to response #1304 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB by MSU Defendants' in Support of Their Joint Omnibus Motion to Dismiss #1304 , filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, et al (re 1:18-cv-806, 1:18-cv-831, 1:18-cv-944, 1:18-cv-987, 1:18-cv-993, 1:18-cv-1010, 1:18-cv-1038, 1:18-cv-1042, 1:18-cv-1045, 1:18-cv-1046, 1:18-cv-1047, 1:18-cv-1056, 1:18-cv-1057, 1:18-cv-1058, 1:18-cv-1060) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waived and Conceded Arguments, #2 Exhibit 2 - COC Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ingham County Cases, #4 Exhibit 4 - Scheduling Orders); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 12/20/2019 (mg).
December 20, 2019 Filing 1365 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-913) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (mg).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1346) to withdraw Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1345) to withdraw Plaintiff's Corrected First Amended Complaint in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1344) to withdraw Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Complaint in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1361 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William Strampel(1360 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1360 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-987) With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William Strampel and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiffs Jane L.B. Doe, et. al. ; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (mg).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 ORDER granting (1298) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 ORDER granting #1313 motion for voluntary dismissal in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 ORDER granting (1310) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 ORDER granting (1307) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER granting (1301) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 (DISREGARD) ORDER granting (1298) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 12/26/2019; this entry replaced by #1359 (mg).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 ORDER granting MOTION (1297) for voluntary dismissal in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1352 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with prejudice of claims(1351 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Kelly L. Buchanan; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Rosen, Mary)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1351 MOTION to dismiss with prejudice of claims (re 1:18-cv-1012) by plaintiff Kelly L. Buchanan; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Rosen, Mary) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (mg).
December 17, 2019 Filing 1350 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (54 in 1:19-cv-00903-GJQ-SJB) filed by Alexis Espinosa; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Arndt, Stephanie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1349 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-828) by plaintiff Alexis Espinosa; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Arndt, Stephanie) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (mg).
December 17, 2019 Filing 1348 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (52 in 1:19-cv-00903-GJQ-SJB, 1290 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-SJB) filed by Amanda Kowalski; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Arndt, Stephanie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1347 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-773) by plaintiff Amanda Kowalski; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Arndt, Stephanie) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (mg).
December 12, 2019 Filing 1346 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:19-cv-579) to Withdraw Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by plaintiff Jane O. Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (mg).
December 12, 2019 Filing 1345 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1258) to Withdraw Plaintiff's Corrected First Amended Complaint by plaintiff John N. Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (mg).
December 12, 2019 Filing 1344 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1018) to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Complaint by plaintiffs Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (mg).
December 11, 2019 Filing 1343 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily with Prejudice their Claims as to Defendants, MSU, The Board of Trustees of MSU, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Only,(47 in 1:19-cv-00903-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jessica Brutlag, Jane IL 1 Doe, Sarah Face; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1342 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-915) Voluntarily with Prejudice their Claims as to Defendants, MSU, The Board of Trustees of MSU, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Only, by plaintiffs Jessica Brutlag, Jane IL 1 Doe, Sarah Face; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (mg).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1339) extending time to file and page limitations in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 ORDER granting (1337) motion to remove next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1339 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Adjourn Deadline to Respond to Complaint and Extend Page Limitations (re 1:19-cv-903) by defendants Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Michigan State University, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1338 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to withdraw as Next Friend(42 in 1:19-cv-00903-GJQ-SJB) filed by Lisa Hutchins; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1337 MOTION to withdraw as Next Friend (re 1:18-cv-915) by plaintiff Lisa Hutchins; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (mg).
December 5, 2019 Filing 1336 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:19-cv-178) #1333 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (mg)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1335 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss MSU, MSUBOT, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages(1327 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by John N. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1334 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss MSU, MSUBOT, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages(1326 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1333 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:19-cv-178) as to Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 12/5/2019 (mg).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1332 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1331 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane Doe 24, Jane Doe 25; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1331 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:19-cv-440) by plaintiffs Jane Doe 24, Jane Doe 25; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (mg).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1330 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1329 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane Doe 22, Jane Doe 23; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1329 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:19-cv-178) by plaintiffs Jane Doe 22, Jane Doe 23; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (mg).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1328 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1325 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1327 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1258) MSU, MSUBOT, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages by plaintiff John N. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (mg).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1326 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) MSU, MSUBOT, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages by plaintiffs Jane F. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (mg).
December 3, 2019 Filing 1325 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (mg).
November 25, 2019 Filing 1324 CORRECTED MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-968) by plaintiffs Lauren Bancroft, Rachel Gunther Campbell, Meghan Gunther, Emily Jane Gwardzinski Justice; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 certificate of concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Moss, Alyssa) Modified text on 11/25/2019; this entry replaces #1315 (mg).
November 22, 2019 Filing 1323 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-982) of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, MSU Sports Medicine, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brook Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Stampel and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiff Jane AC Doe; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order proposed order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (mg).
November 21, 2019 Filing 1322 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1006) by plaintiffs Jaclyn Bowe, Joseph Kuter; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 certificate of concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Moss, Alyssa) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (mg).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 ORDER granting (1289) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 ORDER granting (1286) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 ORDER granting (1281) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 ORDER granting (1273) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 ORDER granting (1271) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 ORDER granting (1268) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 21, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (mg)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1315 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-968) by plaintiffs Lauren Bancroft, Rachel Gunther Campbell, Meghan Gunther, Emily Jane Gwardzinski Justice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (mg).
November 21, 2019 Filing 1314 NOTICE Local Rule 7.1(D) Certificate of Concurrence in Support of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Michigan State University, the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, William D. Strampel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and Kathie Klages (DOC. 1313) by plaintiff Jane MB45 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Marker, Caleb)
November 20, 2019 MOTION for order for Voluntary Dismissal (as taken from #1313 by plaintiff Jane MB45 Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (mg)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1313 MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (re 1:18-cv-1027) re Defendants Michigan State University, the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, William D. Strampel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and Kathie Klages filed by plaintiff Jane MB45 Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Marker, Caleb) Modified text on 11/21/2019 (mg).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1312 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-829) filed by plaintiffs Jane JJF Doe, Jane LAM Doe, Jane CAO Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Roumel, Nicholas) Modified text on 11/21/2019 (mg).
November 18, 2019 Filing 1311 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss claims against Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk(921 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-SJB, 1266 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane A.A.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Misch, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1310 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1025) claims against Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk by plaintiff Jane A.A.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Misch, Michael) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (mg).
November 18, 2019 Filing 1309 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1307 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Janet RA Doe, John RA Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1308 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Janet RA Doe, John RA Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1307 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1307 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-922) by plaintiffs Janet RA Doe, John RA Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 11/18/2019 (mg).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1306 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice(1298 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane H. Doe, Jane G. Doe, Jane I. Doe, John A. Doe, Lori C. Wampler; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Behm, Thomas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1305 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, (1304 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Rivers, Beth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1304 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(1138 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-SJB, 1129 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-SJB) filed by Jane Does 1-21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-SJB et al. (Rivers, Beth)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1303 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (ald)
October 28, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1301 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-999) by plaintiff Megan Marie LaDrigue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting plaintiff's Motion for voluntary dismissal with prejudice of claims as to MSU and MSU Bd of Trustees); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (mg).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1302 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Julia Epple, Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell (Merson, Jordan) in case number 1:18-cv-1047, document number 927 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1300 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and(1190 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane J. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1299 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held 10/22/2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 1/23/2020 ; redaction request due 11/15/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1298 MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-1018) by plaintiffs Jane H. Doe, Jane G. Doe, Jane I. Doe, John A. Doe, Lori C. Wampler; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (mg).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1297 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Corrected Motion and Brief for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice #1295 by plaintiff Hillary Rich ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (mg).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1296 LETTER from attorney Rebecca Sposita for plaintiff Hillary Rich regarding Disregarding ECF No. 1295-2 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1295 CORRECTED MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/29/2019; this entry replaces #1291 and #1284 (mg).
October 23, 2019 Filing 1294 LETTER from attorney Rebecca Sposita for plaintiff Hillary Rich regarding Disregarding ECF No. 1291 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1293 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1289 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kreger, Kristen)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 ORDER AMENDING SECOND WAVE SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF No. 1152): Plaintiffs to file on or before 11/6/2019; MSU Defendants to file on or before 12/20/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1291 (DISREGARDED) CORRECTED MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/22/2019; this entry replaces #1284 (mg). Modified on 10/29/2019; entry disregarded per #1294 and under the directive of chambers (mg).
October 22, 2019 Filing 1290 LETTER from attorney Rebecca Sposita for plaintiff Hillary Rich regarding Disregarding ECF No. 1284. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1289 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1039) by plaintiff Jane B. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kreger, Kristen) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (mg).
October 22, 2019 Filing 1288 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Claims as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar(902 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1287 MINUTES of status conference and oral argument on Defendant MSU's motion to strike certain Plaintiffs' amended complaints; certain Plaintiffs' motions to amend held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1286 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1023) Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Claims as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (mg).
October 21, 2019 Filing 1284 (DISREGARDED) MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/22/2019 (mg). Modified text on 10/29/2019; disregarded per #1290 and under the directive of chambers (mg).
October 17, 2019 Filing 1283 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of claims as to MSU Defendants(897 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1282 JOINT STATUS REPORT re JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints(1258 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1285 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Jeffrey R. Kovan waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed by Jane O. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:19-cv-579, document number 99 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1281 MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of claims as to MSU Defendants re [1:18-cv-1023] by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/21/2019 (mg).
October 15, 2019 Filing 1279 RESPONSE TO AMENDED MOTION to amend/correct Complaint( #1262 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sportsmedicine, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 10/22/2019 (mg).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER granting (1235) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER granting (1205) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1280 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Lawrence Gerard Nassar served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019 filed by Jane A. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:19-cv-579, document number 94 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1276 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (re 1:18-cv-1027) re United States Olympic Committee without prejudice filed by plaintiff Jane MB45 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Marker, Caleb) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (mg).
October 11, 2019 Filing 1275 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints(1258 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) JOINT RESPONSE filed by A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ellis, Tiffany)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1274 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University and The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University(1273 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Julie Hovinga; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1273 MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims (re 1:18-cv-1036) as to Defendants Michigan State University and The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University by plaintiff Julie Hovinga; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (mg).
October 10, 2019 Filing 1272 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice as to Defendants Michigan State University and the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University(1271 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane M.P. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1271 MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice re 1:18-cv-734 as to Defendants Michigan State University and the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (mg).
October 8, 2019 Filing 1270 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1268 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane R7 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1269 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R7 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1268 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1268 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-995) by plaintiff Jane R7 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (mg).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 ORDER RESCHEDULING 10/21/19 status conference to 10/22/19 at 10 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER granting (1199) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 SCHEDULING ORDER setting status conference and motion hearing: status conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; status report due by 10/17/2019; oral argument will be heard on 10/22/2019 at 10:00 AM on MSU Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints #1258 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1263 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1031) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Livingway, Elaine) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg). Modified text on 10/3/2019 (mg).
October 1, 2019 Filing 1262 AMENDED MOTION to amend/correct Complaint (re 1:18-cv-982) by plaintiffs Dominique Corbin, Jane AC Doe, Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1264 RESPONSE in opposition titled as "MSU defendants' omnibus opposition to plaintiffs' motions for leave to file amended complaints" to MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint( #1226 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint( #1244 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint( #1221 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to amend/correct Complaint( #1246 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) (filed as entries #877 in 1:18-cv-831, #874 in 1:18-cv-982, #882 in 1:18-cv-913, and #887 in 1:18-cv-987) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Van Gelder, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1261 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints( #1258 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1260 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints #1258 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1259 CORRECTED EXHIBIT 1 Regarding motion for leave to file third amended complaint #1226 by plaintiffs Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hague, Melissa) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1258 JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by defendants Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1257 JOINT STATUS REPORT in Response to Court Order issued on September 20, 2019 (ECF No. 1243) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 ORDER granting (1197) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 ORDER granting (1191) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1254 ORDER granting (1190) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 ORDER granting (1186) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1252 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to William D. Strampel; waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed by Jane O. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:19-cv-579, document number 68 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1249 NOTICE of Withdrawal As Attorney (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiffs Kylie Chester, Jane C1 Doe, Jane C12 Doe, Jane C13 Doe, Jane C14 Doe, Jane C15 Doe, Jane C16 Doe, Jane C17 Doe, Jane C19 Doe, Jane C2 Doe, Jane C20 Doe, Jane C21 Doe, Jane C22 Doe, Jane C24 Doe, Jane C26 Doe, Jane C29 Doe, Jane C31 Doe, Jane C32 Doe, Jane C33 Doe, Jane C34 Doe, Jane C35 Doe, Jane C36 Doe, Jane C38 Doe, Jane C4 Doe, Jane C5 Doe, Jane C8 Doe, Lindsey Lemke, Amanda Smith ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (mg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 1248 CORRECTED NOTICE of Withdrawal As Attorney (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 9/25/2019; this entry replaces #1247 (mg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 1247 NOTICE of Withdrawal As Attorney by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1246 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint (re 1:18-cv-982) by plaintiffs Dominique Corbin, Jane AC Doe, Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (mg).
September 24, 2019 Filing 1245 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint(1244 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Doe AA, Jane Doe BC, Jane Doe GK, Jane Doe JA, Jane Doe PJ, Jane Doe SM; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1244 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-831) by plaintiffs John Doe AA, Jane Doe BC, Jane Doe GK, Jane Doe JA, Jane Doe PJ, Jane Doe SM; (Attachments: #1 Attachment); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 9/24/2019 (mg).
September 23, 2019 Filing 1251 (WITHDRAWN) CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John N. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:18-cv-1258, document number 612 (this entry replaces #1214 in regards to 1:18-cv-1258 only) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 12/26/2019; withdrawn per #1363 (mg).
September 23, 2019 Filing 1250 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:18-cv-1018, document number 865 (this entry replaces #1214 re 18-cv-1018 only) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT regarding mediation; Joint Status Report to be filed within 10 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1242 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe (Ellis, Tiffany) in case number 1:18-cv-1016, document number 871 this entry replaces #1238 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1239 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint #1215 Certificate of Concurrence in Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jessica Brutlag, Sarah Face, Lisa Hutchins, Nathalie Trottier; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (mg).
September 18, 2019 Filing 1236 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily #1235 Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (mg).
September 18, 2019 Filing 1235 MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe (re 1:17-cv-254) ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 ORDER regarding Motions For Leave To File #1208 , #1215 , #1225 and certificates of concurrence; the Motions are DENIED without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura Bernescu on behalf of defendants MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, MSU Sports-Medicine Clinic, MSU Sportsmedicine, ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bernescu, Laura) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 1228 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint( #1226 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 1227 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint #1226 filed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 1226 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-987) by plaintiffs Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Third Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 1225 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint (re 1:18-cv-982) by plaintiffs Dominique Corbin, Jane AC Doe, Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: For future reference, amended complaints should be filed directly in member cases, all Motions in lead case 1:17-cv-29; counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1224 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint( #1221 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 841 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 1177 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1241 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kristin Nagle (Fraser, Joseph) in case number 1:18-cv-1057, document number 849 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1240 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jaclyn Bowe, Joseph Kuter (Vesprini, Dondi) in case number 1:18-cv-1006, document number 816 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1238 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe (Ellis, Tiffany) in case number 1:18-cv-1016, document number 853 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1237 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Meaghan Williams (Fraser, Joseph) in case number 1:18-cv-1056, document number 846 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1233 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alyssa Zalenski (Fraser, Joseph) in case number 1:18-cv-1058, document number 850 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1232 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lauren Bancroft, Emily Jane Gwardzinski Justice, Rachel Gunther Campbell, Meghan Gunther (Vesprini, Dondi) in case number 1:18-cv-968, document number 818 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1231 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alexis Espinosa (Arndt, Stephanie) in case number 1:18-cv-828, document number 849 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1230 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe ME (MacKenzie, Donna) in case number 1:18-cv-944, document number 815 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1229 (DISREGARD) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane LAM Doe, Jane JJF Doe, Jane CAO Doe (Roumel, Nicholas) in case number 1:18-cv-829, document number 830 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg); duplicate entry of amended complaint filed as #1222 .
September 16, 2019 Filing 1223 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1027) against Douglas Dietzel, John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA, Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Jane MB45 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Marker, Caleb) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1222 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-829) against Kathie Klages, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Nassar filed by Jane JJF Doe, Jane LAM Doe, Jane CAO Doe (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - OCR report, #3 Exhibit B - Ropes Gray report); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Roumel, Nicholas) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1221 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-913) with brief in support and certificate of service by plaintiff Jane Doe; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Second Amended Complaint & Jury Demand); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1220 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1046) against All Defendants filed by Erika Davis; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1219 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:19-cv-440) against Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State Board of Trustees, Michigan State University, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Jane Doe 24, Jane Doe 25; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pitt, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1218 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:19-cv-178) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Jane Doe 22, Jane Doe 23; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pitt, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1217 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1038) against Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Steve Penny, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, USA Gymnastics, Inc., Debra Van Horn filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pitt, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1216 AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 1:18-cv-1047) against All Defendants filed by Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1215 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-915) with certificate of service by plaintiffs Jessica Brutlag, Sarah Face, Lisa Hutchins, Nathalie Trottier; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1214 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1018 and 1:18-cv-1258) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc. filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe, John N. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2019; this entry replaces #1210 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1213 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand(re 1:18-cv-1169) against All Defendants filed by Jane BR1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1212 (WITHDRAWN) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:19-cv-579) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA, Inc. filed by Jane O. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg). Modified text on 12/26/2019; withdrawn per #1364 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1211 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 1:18-cv-886) against Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Chloe Alysse Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Day, Devin) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1210 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 1:18-cv-1018 and 1:18-cv-1258) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe, John N. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1209 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1025) against All Defendants filed by Jane A.A.K. Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Misch, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1208 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint(re 1:18-cv-831) with brief in support by plaintiffs John Doe AA, Jane Doe BC, Jane Doe GK, Jane Doe JA, Jane Doe PJ, Jane Doe SM; (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1207 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane KRA Doe (Freid, Debra) in case number 1:18-cv-993, document number 822 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1206 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe RK (MacKenzie, Donna) in case number 1:18-cv-1042, document number 813 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1205 MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Mathew Covey; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (mg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1204 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Jane Doe, (1:18-cv-984) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fairman, Melanie) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (mg).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 ORDER granting (1184) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 ORDER granting (1182) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 ORDER granting (1179) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER granting (1172) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1199 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-694) Defendants Michigan State University and Bd. of Trustees Michigan State University, only, by plaintiffs Jane C Doe (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Schwartz, Mark) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (mg).
August 27, 2019 Filing 1198 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order granting Plaintiff Megan Holley's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants MSU, Board of Trustees of MSU, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Stra(1197 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Member case 18-cv-1012 filed by Megan Holley; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rosen, Mary)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1197 MOTION for order (re 1:18-cv-1012) granting Plaintiff Megan Holley's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants MSU, Board of Trustees of MSU, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk Only by plaintiff Megan Holley; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Plaintiff Megan Holley's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal in 18-cv-1012); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rosen, Mary) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (mg).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1196 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(60 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-ESC, 808 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 809 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 638 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 808 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 811 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 816 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 813 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 805 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 810 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 812 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 561 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1195 MSU Defendants' EXHIBIT 5, Parts 1-5 to the Memorandum in Support of Joint Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Doc 1194) by defendants Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Brooke Lemmen, Lianna Haden, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 2, #2 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 3, #3 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 4, #4 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 5); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1194 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss, (808 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 638 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 808 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 811 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 813 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 810 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 60 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 809 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 816 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 805 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 812 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 561 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC) (Omnibus) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Haden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Haden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Clinic, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathie Klages, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathy Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, William D. Strampel, Douglas Dietzel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, William D. Strampel, Brooke Lemmen, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, MSU Sports-Medicine Clinic, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, William D. Strampel, Lianna Haden, Lou Anna Simon, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sportsmedicine, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathie Klages, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Jeffrey R. Kovan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pending Cases Against the MSU Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claims Asserted Against the MSU Defendants and Applicable Defenses (by Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 - Timeline of Key Events, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs with Deficient Notices, #5 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Who Failed to File Any Notice, #6 Exhibit 7 - Comparison of Allegations of Abuse, Actual Knowledge, Last Alleged Date of Tolling, and Filing of Notice, #7 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs Affirmatively Alleging Actual Knowledge of Claims, #8 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs Alleging Other Inappropriate Conduct by Nassar, #9 Exhibit 10 - Fraudulent Concealment Allegations, #10 Exhibit 11 - News Stories Related to Nassar and MSU (September 2016 January 2018), #11 Exhibit 12 - Implausible Allegations of Lack of Knowledge, #12 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiffs Alleging Title IX Standing, #13 Exhibit 14 - Plaintiffs Alleging Affordable Care Act Claims, #14 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiffs Alleging Trafficking Victims Protection Act Claims, #15 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiffs Alleging Elliott-Larsen Civil Rights Act Claims, #16 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiffs Alleging Assaults Exclusively at Non-MSU Locations, #17 Exhibit 18 - Plaintiffs Alleging That Parents/Guardians Were Present During Alleged Abuse, #18 Exhibit 19 - Plaintiffs Alleging Claims Barred by Statutes of Limitations, #19 Exhibit 20 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Douglas Dietzel, #20 Exhibit 21 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Lianna Hadden, #21 Exhibit 22 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Kathie Klages, #22 Exhibit 23 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Jeffrey Kovan, #23 Exhibit 24 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Brooke Lemmen, #24 Exhibit 25 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Kristine Moore, #25 Exhibit 26 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Lou Anna Simon, #26 Exhibit 27 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Gary Stollak, #27 Exhibit 28 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant William Strampel, #28 Exhibit 29 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Destiny Teachnor-Hauk); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1193 JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus) by defendants Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Brooke Lemmen, Lianna Haden, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1192 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss ( #1191 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane J-1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kochenderfer, Adam) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (mg).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1191 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-758) by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kochenderfer, Adam) Modified on 8/23/2019 (mg).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1190 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages by plaintiff Jane J. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (mg).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1189 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Tiffani Berra and Maria Mosher (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Service); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven) Modified text on 11/18/2019 (mg).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1188 NOTICE USAG's Written Notice re attorney Chad Antuma Pursuant to MRPC 1.10(b)(2) by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mg).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1187 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims(1186 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1186 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) by plaintiff Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mg).
August 5, 2019 Filing 1185 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Voluntary Dismissal MOTION to dismiss (1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1184 FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) by plaintiff Claire Brenton-Miller (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zoglio, David) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (mg).
August 2, 2019 Filing 1183 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants(1182 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B57NF Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1182 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349, 1:18-cv-1029) by plaintiff Jane B57NF Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (mg).
July 30, 2019 Filing 1181 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Kylie Dickman; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kylie Dickman re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1179 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1296) by plaintiff Kylie Dickman; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (mg).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER granting (1166) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ORDER granting (1162) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ORDER granting (1158) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER granting (1156) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 ORDER granting (1153) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1173 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1117 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 781 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe MJ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1172 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-978) by plaintiff Jane Doe MJ; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (mg).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER granting (1149) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER granting (1148) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ORDER granting (1141) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 ORDER granting (1139) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER granting (1134) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1166 MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe; (re 1:18-cv-1019) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1165 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-984) by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fairman, Melanie) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1164 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to dismiss ( #1166 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1163 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to dismiss #1162 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC filed by Jane NLF-2 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (mg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1162 FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-851) by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (mg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1161 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1158 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Sara Peltier; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1160 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Sara Peltier re MOTION to dismiss (1158 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1159 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held 06/13/2019 before Judge Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 9/16/2019 ; redaction request due 7/8/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1158 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:19-cv-70) by plaintiff Sara Peltier; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1157 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al(14 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane BH Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1156 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Jane BH Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1155 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1153 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1154 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1153 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1153 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiffs Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 SECOND WAVE SCHEDULING ORDER: MSU Defendants to file motion by 8/26/2019; Plaintiffs to file response by 10/23/2019; MSU Defendants to file reply by 12/6/2019; MSU Defendants may file side briefs by 1/17/2020; Plaintiff may file responses by 2/28/2020; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1151 MINUTES of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1150 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al #1148 filed by Katelin Rehberger; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (mg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1149 MOTION for order reVoluntary Dismissal (re 1:18-cv-1018) , ( responses due 7/8/2019;) by plaintiff Jane B. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 10, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1148 MOTION to dismiss re 1:18-cv-982 with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Katelin Rehberger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (mg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1147 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re: 1:18-cv-806) #1144 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1146 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1045) #1143 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1145 JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1144 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pritchett, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1143 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pritchett, Jessica)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1142 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re CONSENT MOTION to dismiss (1141 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1141 CONSENT MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1008) by plaintiff Jane NLF-3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mg).
May 30, 2019 Filing 1140 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss (1139 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane NLF-1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1139 UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-842) by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mg).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER granting (1131) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER granting (1129) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1136 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1134 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Ashley Hagaman; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ashley Hagaman re MOTION to dismiss (1134 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1134 MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Ashley Hagaman; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER granting (1112) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER granting (1105) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1131 MOTION to dismiss MSU and Board of Trustees (re 1:18-cv-779) by plaintiffs Jane D. Doe, Jane A. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane B. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing MSU and Board of Trustees); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lucas, Joseph) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (mg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1130 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1129 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane P.S. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1129 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1024) by plaintiff Jane P.S. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1128 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-999 #1125 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1127 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Megan Marie LaDrigue re APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar(199 in 1:19-cv-00070-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1126 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Jane S.M. Doe (re 1:18-cv-1026) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1125 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-999) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of app for default, #2 Affidavit supp aff in support of app for default, #3 Proposed Document proposed default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mg).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re #1123 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/13/2019 at 11:00 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; joint status report due by 6/6/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 ORDER granting (1087) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER granting (1085) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER granting (1083) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER granting (1080) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 ORDER granting (1078) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 ORDER granting (1076) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER granting (1073) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ORDER granting (1063) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1114 NOTICE from CCA regarding Petition for permission to appeal #963 , The unopposed motion for extension of time to file a response is GRANTED. The petition for permission to appeal is DENIED ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (mg).
May 2, 2019 Filing 1113 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by all MSU defendants Regarding Effect of Bankruptcy Court Orders ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (mg).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1112 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1014) by plaintiff Jane Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Little, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (mg).
April 25, 2019 Filing 1111 NOTICE Notice of Order Entered by the United States Bankruptcy Court of the Southern District of Indiana by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER CANCELLING HEARING AND FOR STATUS REPORT: 5/1/2019 hearing is ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE; Counsel to file joint report within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1109 NOTICE Notice of Orders Entered by the US Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Indiana by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1108 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-743) filed by plaintiff Alaina Elizabeth Bamfield ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Banks, Darrell) Modified text on 4/23/2019 (mg).
April 22, 2019 Filing 1107 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees Regarding Mediation and Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1106 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1105 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane K.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1105 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-732 as to MSU defendants) by plaintiff Jane K.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order ); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (mg).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS #1100 , #1101 , #1102 , #1103 in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (mg).
April 18, 2019 Filing 1103 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1037)Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1102 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1101 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1100 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (CORRECTED CAPTION) (re 1:18-cv-822) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS #1089 , #1090 , #1091 , #1092 , #1093 , #1094 , #1095 , #1096 , #1097 , #1098 staying deadline to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1098 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1022) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1097 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1096 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1095 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1123) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1094 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1124) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1093 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1092 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1;18-cv-1120) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1091 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1090 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1089 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016)Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1088 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Rachel K. Zabick re MOTION to dismiss (1087 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1087 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1133) by plaintiff Rachel K. Zabick; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1086 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R10 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1085 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1085 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1032) by plaintiff Jane R10 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1084 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R9 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1083 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1083 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv997) by plaintiff Jane R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ORDER REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1081 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R3 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1080 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1080 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiff Jane R3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1079 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R2 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1078 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1078 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiff Jane R2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (mg).
April 10, 2019 Filing 1077 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R1 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1076 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1076 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiff Jane R1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (mg).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1070), (1071), (1072) to stay deadline to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1074 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1073 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane RG Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grant, Paul)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1073 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) by plaintiff Jane RG Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grant, Paul) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (mg).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1072 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mg).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1071 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mg).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1070 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mg).
April 4, 2019 Filing 1069 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Christine Hilliard Only (re 1:18-cv-1035) filed by plaintiff Christine Hilliard ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (mg).
April 3, 2019 Filing 1068 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:19-cv-70 #1066 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1067 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1063 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1066 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:19-cv-70) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/3/2019 (mg).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1064) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1064 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1038) Allowing defendant Stephen Penny an extension to file responsive pleadings by defendant Steve Penny (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Matthai, Edith) Modified text on 4/2/2019 (mg).
April 1, 2019 Filing 1063 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) by plaintiff Jane K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (mg).
March 28, 2019 Filing 1062 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1011) filed by plaintiff Adanna Bustance Nelson ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Parsons, Grant) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (mg).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1059) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1060 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-173) filed by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (mg).
March 26, 2019 Filing 1059 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1022) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1049), (1050), (1051), (1052), (1053), (1054), (1055), (1056) and (1057) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1057 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1124) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1056 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1123) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1055 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1054 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1053 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1120) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1052 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER re (1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1051 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1050 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 1049 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 22, 2019 Filing 1048 REPLY to response to motion #979 (Plaintiffs' omnibus response in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss); filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Kathryn Geddert (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Senate Bills 871-879, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Correspondence from Hon. Maura Corrigan to MI Legislature, #4 Exhibit EX C - Enacted Senate Bill 872, #5 Exhibit EX D- List of Plaintiffs who have sued Twistars/Geddert - Not Treated by Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1046) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1046 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1037) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (mg).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 ORDER granting STIPULATION #1044 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; response time extended to 4/29/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified link on 3/19/2019 (jal).
March 18, 2019 Filing 1044 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (mg).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER granting #1041 Plaintiff Jane R9 Doe's Motion to Remove Next Friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified link on 3/19/2019 (jal).
March 15, 2019 Filing 1042 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John R9 Doe re #1041 re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend(1041 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 15, 2019 Filing 1041 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend (re 1:18-cv-997) by plaintiff John R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 13, 2019 Filing 1040 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1001) filed by plaintiff Samantha Schneider ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1038) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 12, 2019 Filing 1038 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (mg).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER GRANTING MOTION (974) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 ORDER FOR JUDGE'S COPIES: Copies to be submitted within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1030), (1032), (1033) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS (910), (940) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1033 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 1032 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 1031 MINUTES of motion hearing for approval of settlements for minor plaintiffs (910), (940), (974) held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1030 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Grant David Kelter on behalf of defendants Twistars USA Inc. and John Geddert ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kelter, Grant) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (mg).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1026) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1025) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1027 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Approval of Settlements held January 23, 2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/30/2019 ; redaction request due 3/22/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-3 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 1026 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) For Dismissal of Claims as to Defendants MSU, et al by plaintiffs Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 28, 2019 Filing 1025 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887) For Dismissal of Claims as To Defendants MSU, et al by plaintiffs Sarah Allen, Jaclyn Charters, Suma Cherukuri, Jane S8 Doe, Jane S4 Doe, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S6 Doe, Jane S5 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S7 Doe, Jane S2 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER granting Second Motion (1017) To Extend Summons in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC: Defendant Van Horn's summons extended to 4/1/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1023 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1054) filed by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1022 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) For Dismissals of Claims Against MSU, et al by plaintiffs Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1021 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887) For Dismissal of Claims Against MSU, et al by plaintiffs Sarah Allen, Jaclyn Charters, Suma Cherukuri, Jane S8 Doe, Jane S4 Doe, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S6 Doe, Jane S5 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S7 Doe, Jane S2 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1020 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #436 (re 1:18-cv-887) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(436 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Sarah Allen, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1019 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re #1017 SECOND MOTION to Extend Summons filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (997),(998), (1001), (1002), (1003), (1004), (1006) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1017 SECOND MOTION to Extend Summons (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Notification); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1005) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1015 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #669 (re 1:17-cv-254) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) filed by Amanda Thomashow et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1014 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #729 (re 1:18-cv-1041) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Makayla Thrush et al; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1013 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONto Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1349 #842 ) filed by Makayla Thrush ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1012 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1013 #604 ) filed by Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1011 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) ( re 1:17-cv-29 #667 , 1:18-cv-1055 #738 , 1:18-cv-1346 #833 ) filed by Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1010 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1047 #689 ) Supplement to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response filed by Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1009 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) (re 1:17-cv-29 #667 , 1:18-cv-1059 #694 , 1:18-cv-1352 #848 ) filed by Victoria Carlson, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Nichol, Brittany) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1008 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:17-cv-257, 1:18-cv-1052, 1:18-cv-1348) filed by Lindsey Lemke et (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Affiliation with Twistars); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Nichol, Brittany) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1007 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1314 #819 , 1:18-cv-01034 #701 ) filed by Meaghan Ashcraft, Abigail Mealy, Amanda Mealy, Sydney Wais (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1006 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-01056) by plaintiff Meaghan Williams ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1005 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings (re 1:18-cv-01022) by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1004 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-01057) by plaintiff Kristin Nagle ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1003 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-1060) by plaintiff Kelsey Morris ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1002 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 18-cv-01058) by plaintiff Alyssa Zalenski ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1001 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal of Counts XXXI and XXXIV (re 1:18-cv-1004) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1000 RESPONSE TO MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) (re 1:18-cv-640 #608 , 1:18-cv-1018 #615 , and 1:18-cv-1258 #679 ) filed by Jane B. Doe, John A. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, John N. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw). Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 999 PROPOSED ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal of all claims against Lawrence Nassar with prejudice (re 1:18-cv-01054) by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 998 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of Twistars and Geddert (re 1:18-cv-00944) by plaintiff Jane Doe ME ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 997 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of Twistars and Geddert (re 1:18-cv-00831) by plaintiff John Doe AA ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 996 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1347 #838 , 1:18-cv-222, 1:18-cv-288, 1:18-cv-349 #755 ), 1:18-cv-491 #708 , 1:18-cv-1029 #757 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Larissa Boyce et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 995 ORDER granting STIPULATION (993) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 994 SEALED EXHIBIT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe re MOTION for settlement ( #974 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order #982 dated 2/20/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 21, 2019 Filing 993 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (984-991) extending time to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 991 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 990 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 989 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 988 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1124) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 987 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1123) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 986 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 985 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 984 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER {re 1:18-cv-1120) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 983 ORDER granting STIPULATION #980 to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 982 ORDER granting #976 motion for leave to file under seal in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 19, 2019 Filing 981 NOTICE REGARDING HEARING ON MOTIONS #910 , #940 , #974 FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT: Motions shall be heard on 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Quist; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 980 PROPOSED ORDER regarding (re 1:18-cv-1054)Dismissal of all claims against Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk with prejuidice by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 979 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) ( #667 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendant Twistars USA, Inc.'s and Defendant John Geddert's Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule (12)(c) Motions to Dismiss (full list of applicable cases and Plaintiffs in Exhibit 1) filed by Rachael Denhollander et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER granting (972) motion to withdraw as attorney; in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 977 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ( #976 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 976 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 975 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement ( #974 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 974 MOTION for settlement (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 973 SEALED DOCUMENT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend (898 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 904 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 972 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019) by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER granting STIPULATION (969) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS OF ESTATE OF MEGAN SIMON AGAINST MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY WITH PREJUDICE (968) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 969 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 14, 2019 Filing 968 PROPOSED ORDER regarding (1:18-cv-1002) Dismissal of all Claims Against Michigan State University with Prejudice by defendant Michigan State University ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER granting STIPULATION (966) TO STAY DEADLINE TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 966 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1038) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER DENYING THE NICHOLS LAW FIRM MOTION (942) TO STAY in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 964 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Disqualify Counsel held January 23, 2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/13/2019 ; redaction request due 3/5/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
February 11, 2019 Filing 963 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Permission to Appeal re #938 with The Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe, interested parties The Nichols Law Firm (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition to Appeal); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (mg).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 962 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT IRA ZALTZ'S MOTION (655) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 961 ORDER granting STIPULATION (949) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 960 ORDER granting STIPULATION (948) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER granting STIPULATION (946) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER granting STIPULATION (941) REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - MOTIONS TO DIMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 957 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1031) #939 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 956 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1035) #936 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 955 REPLY to response to motion #655 in 1:17-cv-29 (273 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* filed by Ira Zaltz ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (mg).
February 6, 2019 Filing 954 THIRD NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re The anonymous owners of the unidentified gym that employed Treva Alofs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Alofs; Unidentified physical therapists, addresses unknown;Meridian Township Police Department; Paul Rambo, #9543, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Sgt. Alan Spencer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; A. Tobias #738, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Officer Andrew McCready, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; The anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on the day he treated Breanne Randall; Detective Bart Crane, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Chrissy Scaccia, case officer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Christopher Thompson, dispatcher, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator, Michigan State Police Forensic Laboratory; Anonymous counselor, address unknown; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU; Anonymous gymnastics coach, address unknown; Anonymous school counselor; Anonymous track coach; Anonymous trainer no. 1, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer no. 2, c/o MSU; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, c/o MSU; Lianna Hadden, c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel, c/o MSU; Dr. Brooke Lemmen, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer, c/o MSU; Gary Stollak, retired MSU psychologist; The Federal Bureau of Investigation; Unknown number of anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEO of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU general counsel; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan, c/o MSU; Deborah Van Horn; Anonymous individual nos. 1-5 at the Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; Peter Vidmar, USAGs former board chairman, c/o USA Gymnastics; Paul Parilla, USAGs former board member, c/o USA Gymnastics; Ron Galimore, USAGs COO, c/o USA Gymnastics; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; The anonymous trainer of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; The anonymous high school counselor of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; The anonymous medical professional, address unknown, who was present during at least one instance of alleged abuse committed on Jane A2 Doe in 2011; Any and all persons who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; The MSU trainer, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach but failed to investigate, follow up or report them to superiors, CPS or law enforcement; The MSU coach, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach but failed to investigate, follow up or report them to superiors, CPS or law enforcement; The MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A51 Doe; The trainer and or MSU medical student (address unknown) present when Plaintiff, Anna Ludes, was allegedly abused, but who failed to detect the abuse or report it; The anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; The MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A89 Doe; The physical therapist of Plaintiff Alexis Alvarado; The medical student, address unknown, present when Plaintiff Taylor Cole was allegedly abused failed to detect the abuse or report it; Rebecca Cass; Catryina Brown; the other medical professionals present, addresses unknown, when Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe was allegedly abused failed to detect the abuse or report it; The coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe, address unknown, was present for one or more instances of alleged abuse yet she failed to detect the abuse or report it; The physical therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe, address unknown, was present for one or more instances of alleged abuse yet she failed to detect the abuse or report it; The medical resident present at the time Plaintiff Cherukuri was allegedly abused by Nassar; The medical intern, address unknown, who was present when Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe, was allegedly abused; Diane Christie; The Dean of Osteopathic Medicine; Co-Defendant, USAGs, Notice of Non-Party Fault and Supplement are hereby incorporated by reference; The Notices of Non-Party Fault filed by any other co-Defendants; MSU and a number of Defendants associated with MSU have entered into a settlement; Alan Ashley, Chief of Sport Performance for the USOC; Larry Buendorf, USOCs Chief Security Officer, c/o USOC; Gary Warren, former director of the Women's Program and of the National Team Training Center for USAG, c/o USAG; Sarah Jantzi, coach for Twin City Twisters; Dr. Jay Binder, c/o USAG; Kathy Kelly, former Vice President of Womens Programs for USAG, c/o USAG; Fran Sepler, c/o USAG; Jay Abbott, Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Gregory Massa, Assistant Special Agent in Charge for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Michael Langeman, Supervisory Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Scott Himsel, legal counsel to USAG, formerly of Faegre Baker Daniels; Daniel Connolly, legal counsel to USAG, Faegre Baker Daniels;Renee Jamison, c/o USAG; Helena Shah Trivedi, c/o MSU; Kelli Bert, c/o MSU; Athletic trainer, Tony Robles; Dr. Lionel Rosen, MSU Sports Medicine, c/o MSU; and David Jager, MSU Trainer, c/o MSU. by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. and Kathryn Geddert Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 953 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-732) #928 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 952 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT (re 1:17-cv-676) by plaintiff Jane F2 Doe (re #940 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Waun, Thomas) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 951 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-1347) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 950 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-1029) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 949 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 948 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 947 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-491) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 946 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 945 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 944 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay #942 February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 943 BRIEF in support of MOTION to stay #942 February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel #938 ) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court of Claims Transcript of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 942 MOTION to stay (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019) February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel #938 by interested party The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 941 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1349) Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defs Twistars Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Makayla Thrush ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 940 MOTION for settlement (re 1:17-cv-676) by plaintiff Jane F2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order Prop Order App Stlmnt); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Waun, Thomas) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 939 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1031) as to Lawrence Nassar, D.O. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Livingway, Elaine) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER granting (454) motion to disqualify opposing counsel in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC affecting member case nos. 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019; granting motion for leave to supplement the record (919)in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; and granting Nichols's request for immediate appeal ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, pgh)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER granting #926 Plaintiff Jane K.K. Doe's Motion to Remove Next Friends in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Filing 936 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (re 1:18-cv-1035) Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default of Defendnt Lawrence Gerard Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
January 30, 2019 Filing 935 CORRECTED EXHIBIT B (re #919 by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (mg).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 934 ORDER granting STIPULATION #923 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/8/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER granting STIPULATION #918 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER granting STIPULATION #914 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 931 ORDER granting STIPULATION #913 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER granting STIPULATION #912 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER granting STIPULATION #921 to Extend Stay of Litigation Proceedings Against MSU Defendants Pending Mediation in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 29, 2019 Filing 928 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-732) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (mg).
January 29, 2019 Filing 927 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(541 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 530 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 699 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 536 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 539 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 926 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 869 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 554 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 548 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 292 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 882 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 593 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 598 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 151 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 545 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 707 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 555 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 607 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 549 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 152 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-ESC, 696 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 532 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 648 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 783 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 862 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 799 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 871 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 536 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 624 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 881 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 710 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 493 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 708 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 869 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 567 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 639 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 633 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 672 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 548 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 371 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 665 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 545 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 707 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet M.K. Doe, John K.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 926 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends (re 1:18-cv-732) by plaintiffs Janet M.K. Doe, John K.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 925 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss oral argument requested (655 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane RG Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (mla)
January 28, 2019 Filing 924 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) re 18-cv-842, 18-cv-851, 18-cv-1008, and 18-cv-1019 filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 923 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 922 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 921 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Stay of Litigation Proceedings Against MSU Defendants Pending Mediation by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
January 25, 2019 Filing 920 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 919 MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record by interested party The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; (Attachments: #1 Index Of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - December 21, 2018 report from the independent special counsel, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lisa DeStefano, DO); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 918 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 917 NOTICE Withdrawal of Attorney by plaintiffs Larissa Boyce et al (1:17-cv-222), Jane B24 Doe et al (1:17-cv-349), Jane B20 Doe et al (1:17-cv-288) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Brown, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 25, 2019 Filing 916 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Great Lakes Gymnastics, Inc (re 1:18-cv-1019) #894 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 915 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1296) #909 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 914 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 913 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 912 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 911 SEALED DOCUMENT Confidential Exhibit 1 (re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Katherine Payne re MOTION for settlement Approval #910 ; filed under seal pursuant to order #907 dated 1/23/19 Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal (529 in member case 18-cv-1044) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 910 MOTION for settlement Approval (re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Katherine Payne; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Approve Settlement, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Approve Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 909 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (re 1:18-cv-1296) Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bender, Gary) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 908 APPLICATION for entry of default (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED) (re 1:18-cv-999) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of app for default, #2 Proposed Document Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg). (Default not entered as attorney never submitted corrected affidavit) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER granting #824 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER granting #879 Plaintiff's Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 905 ORDER granting STIPULATION #893 Dismissing John Geddert as a Defendant (terming #675 Motion To Dismiss by Defendant John Geddert); signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER granting #898 motion to appoint next friend; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Filing 903 MINUTES of motion hearing re MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel #454 held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER granting motions for settlement #827 , #860 , #862 , #871 , #885 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Filing 901 MINUTES of motion hearing re Motions for Approval of Settlements for Minor Plaintiffs #827 , #860 , #862 , #871 , #885 held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Proceedings Digitally Recorded); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Filing 900 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend ( #898 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 899 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend #898 (re 1:18-cv-173) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 898 MOTION to appoint next friend (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER granting STIPULATION #890 Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER granting #889 Stipulated Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 895 AFFIDAVIT in support of Request for Entry of Default #894 re 1:18-cv-1019) filed by plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 894 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to Great Lakes Gymnastics ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 893 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissing John Geddert as a Defendant (re 1:18-cv-1024) by plaintiff Jane P.S. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 22, 2019 Filing 891 CORRECTED MOTION for order (Second Corrected) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
January 22, 2019 Filing 890 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 22, 2019 Filing 889 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiffs Kylie Chester, Jane C1 Doe, Jane C12 Doe, Jane C13 Doe, Jane C14 Doe, Jane C15 Doe, Jane C16 Doe, Jane C17 Doe, Jane C19 Doe, Jane C2 Doe, Jane C20 Doe, Jane C21 Doe, Jane C22 Doe, Jane C24 Doe, Jane C26 Doe, Jane C29 Doe, Jane C31 Doe, Jane C32 Doe, Jane C33 Doe, Jane C34 Doe, Jane C35 Doe, Jane C36 Doe, Jane C38 Doe, Jane C4 Doe, Jane C5 Doe, Jane C8 Doe, Lindsey Lemke, Amanda Smith ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 21, 2019 Filing 888 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 887 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT by plaintiff Leslie Miller re MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (104 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 886 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 885 MOTION for settlement approval by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ORDER granting STIPULATION (881) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER granting STIPULATION (878) re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 882 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18cv-1059) #832 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 881 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 880 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (104 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 879 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 878 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiffs Meaghan Ashcraft, Abigail Mealy, Amanda Mealy, Sydney Wais ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 877 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jane C38 Doe by plaintiff Jane C38 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe ( #813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order #873 dated 1/17/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 876 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jane H3 Doe by plaintiff Jane H3 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe ( #811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 872 dated 1/17/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 875 PROPOSED PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiff Larissa Boyce re CORRECTED MOTION for settlement #871 (Approval of Settlement for Minors) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 874 CORRECTED BRIEF in support of CORRECTED MOTION for settlement #871 (Approval of Settlement for Minors) filed by Larissa Boyce (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER granting #813 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER granting #811 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 871 CORRECTED MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors) by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
January 16, 2019 Filing 892 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1122) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane Doe 03 (Corey, Louis) in case number 1:18-cv-1122, document number 469 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 870 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe( #811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane H3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 869 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe( #813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane C38 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER granting STIPULATION #864 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 867 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement( #862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 866 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe re MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement(862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER granting STIPULATION #858 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 864 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1347) Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Larissa Boyce ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 863 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement( #862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 862 MOTION for settlement (re 1:17-cv-254) Motion to Approve Settlement by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 861 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors)( #860 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Larissa Boyce (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 860 MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors)(re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-288, 1:17-cv-349) by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (ECF No. 827): hearing set 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 858 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1345) Regarding briefing schedule for defendants Twistars/Gedderts motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Katherine Payne ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ORDER granting STIPULATION #856 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 856 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1346) regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars, USA Inc. and John Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (803) to voluntarily dismiss all defendants with prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (802) to voluntarily dismiss all defendants in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 853 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane NC Doe re MOTION for leave to file / Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice(802 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file / Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice(803 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) / Motions are unopposed. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 852 ORDER granting #835 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER granting (771) motion to extend time to serve summons in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 850 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending summons (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 849 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1352(848 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 848 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1352) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 847 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [Corrected] - MEMBER CASE 1351(846 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 846 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1351) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #7 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case)(Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 845 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1350(844 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 844 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1350) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case)(Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 843 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1349(842 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 842 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1349) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 841 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1348(840 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 840 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1348) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 839 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [Corrected] - MEMBER CASE 1347(285 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 794 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 712 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 464 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 612 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 466 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 512 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 466 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 579 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 795 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 444 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 407 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 521 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 206 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 207 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 622 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 469 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 838 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 446 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 775 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 66 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-ESC, 782 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 584 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 697 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 782 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 586 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 481 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 507 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 610 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 65 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 785 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 476 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 838 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1347) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #7 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 837 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend (60 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)(5 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 836 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend #835 (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit , #2 Exhibit 2- Proposed Order; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 835 MOTION to appoint next friend (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 834 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1346(833 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 833 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1346) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 832 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Blake Lertzman); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 831 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander re MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 830 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count of brief in support of MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 829 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 828 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 827 MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 826 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 825 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 824 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 823 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuat to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1345(822 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 822 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1345) Pursuat to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 821 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1314(819 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 820 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1052) #807 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 819 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1314) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #6 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 818 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1007) #806 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 817 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-993) #804 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 816 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of C24 Doe (re 1:18-cv-257) by plaintiff Jane C24 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend (318 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order #323 dated 8/6/18 (re ( #318 , #319 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 815 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of C19 Doe (re 1:18-cv-257) by plaintiff Jane C19 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend ( #318 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order #323 dated 8/6/18 (re ( #318 , #319 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 814 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe for Jane C37 Doe ( #813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane C38 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 813 MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe for Jane C37 Doe (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiff Jane C38 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Appoint Next Friend); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 812 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe for John Doe( #811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane H3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 811 MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe for John Doe (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiff Jane H3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Appoint Next Friend); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER granting STIPULATION (805) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 809 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 734(808 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 808 MOTION for order to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-734) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #79 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 13, 2019 Filing 807 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Blake Lertzman); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 806 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1007) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 805 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 804 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-993) as to Lawrence Nassar, DO (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default) filed by Jane KRA Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Freid, Debra) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 803 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-971) by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 802 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-1028) by plaintiff Jane NC Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 801 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1047) #792 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 800 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1046) #791 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS #795 , #796 , #797 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 798 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-978) #794 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 797 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 796 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 795 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 794 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-978) as to Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 793 (DISREGARD) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2019; duplicate entry of #792 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 792 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1047) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 791 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1046) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (mg).
January 3, 2019 Filing 790 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1058) #775 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 789 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1057) #773 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 788 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1056) #774 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 787 AFFIDAVIT in support #775 (re 1:18-cv-1058) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Alyssa Zalenski ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 786 AFFIDAVIT in support #774 (re 1:18-cv-1056) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Meaghan Williams ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 785 AFFIDAVIT in support #773 (re 1:18-cv-1057) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Kristin Nagle ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER MODIFYING PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF No. 526) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 783 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MSU DEFENDANTS' MOTION #454 TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL: oral argument will be heard on 1/23/2019 at 11:00 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER granting STIPULATION [ #770 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER granting STIPULATION #769 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER granting STIPULATION #767 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
December 26, 2018 Filing 776 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1001 #751 ); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 22, 2018 Filing 775 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1058) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (ems). Modified text on 1/2/2019 (mg).
December 22, 2018 Filing 774 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1056) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (ems).
December 22, 2018 Filing 773 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1057) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (ems).
December 21, 2018 Filing 782 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1258) filed by plaintiff John N. Doe in case number 1:18-cv-1258, document number 140; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 781 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by All Plaintiffs in case number 1:18-cv-1052, document number 383; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 780 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by All Plaintiffs (Mast, Megan) in case number 1:18-cv-1059, document number 381; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 772 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to serve the complaint /TO EXTEND SUMMONS(139 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 771 MOTION to serve the complaint /TO EXTEND SUMMONS by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 770 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1022) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Filing 769 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Filing 768 CHART OF ASSERTED CLAIMS by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit EX A - Chart Summarizing Claims Asserted Against Twistars/Gedderts and Cases in which such Claims have been asserted, #3 Exhibit EX B - List of Plaintiffs who claim they were abused at Twistars' facility, #4 Exhibit EX C - List of Plaintiffs who have sued Twistars/Gedderts but who were not treated by Nassar at Twistars); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 20, 2018 Filing 767 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1007) for an extension of time to file a response to Defendant Zaltz by plaintiff Jane RG Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER granting STIPULATION (763) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 765 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-829) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Roumel, Nicholas) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE: Any party opposing USAG's Motion #735 to respond on or before 12/21/2018; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 763 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Comittee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 19, 2018 Filing 762 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Addendum to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 831(761 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 19, 2018 Filing 761 MOTION(Addendum) to Dismiss Pursuant (re 1:18-cv-831) #512 to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 18, 2018 Filing 760 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1056(759 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 759 MOTIONto Dismiss (1:18-cv-1056) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 18, 2018 Filing 758 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1029(757 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 757 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1029) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 18, 2018 Filing 756 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) - MEMBER CASES 222; 288; 349(755 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 755 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER granting STIPULATION #747 to dismiss MSU Defendants with Prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER dismissing without prejudice USAG's Motions to Dismiss (153), (564) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 751 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-01001) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James)
December 17, 2018 Filing 750 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Anonymous owners of the unidentified gym that employed Treva Alofs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Alofs; Unidentified physical therapists; Meridian Township Police Department; Paul Rambo, #9543;, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Sgt. Alan Spencer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; A. Tobias #738, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Officer Andrew McCready, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on the day he treated Breanne Randall; Detective Bart Crane, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Chrissy Scaccia, case officer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Christopher Thompson, dispatcher, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator, Michigan State Police Forensic Laboratory; Anonymous counselor Jane M.B.A. Doe identified her Third Amended Complaint; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU, Hannah Administration Building; Anonymous gymnastics coach that Chelsea Markham (now deceased), told her mother, Donna Markham that she was sexually abused by Nassar at the age of 10; Anonymous school counselor told by Lindsay Schuett; Anonymous track coach told by Christine Achenbach; Anonymous trainer no. 1, c/o MSU, Hannah Administration Building told by Tiffany Thomas-Lopez in 2000Anonymous trainer no. 2, c/o MSU, Hannah Administration Building; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk;, c/o MSU; Lianna Hadden, c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel, c/o MSU; Dr. Brooke Lemmen, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer, c/o MSU, told by Jennifer Rood-Bedford in early 2000s; Gary Stollak, retired MSU psychologist, c/o MSU; The Federal Bureau of Investigation, 935 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D.C. 20535-0001; Unknown number of anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEO of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU general counsel in 2014; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan, c/o MSU; Deborah Van Horn; Anonymous individual nos. 1-5 at the Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG; Peter Vidmar, USAGs former board chairman, c/o USA Gymnastics; Paul Parilla, USAGs former board member, c/o USA Gymnastics; Ron Galimore, USAGs COO, c/o USA Gymnastics; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; Anonymous trainer of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett;, address unknown, for the reasons set forth in 1:17-cv-00029, ECF No. 202 PageID 9259-92; Anonymous high school counselor of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; Anonymous medical professional; Any and all persons who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; MSU trainer, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach; MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A51 Doe; Trainer and or MSU medical student present when Plaintiff, Anna Ludes, was allegedly abused; Anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A89 Doe; Physical therapist of Plaintiff Alexis Alvarado; Medical student, present when Plaintiff Taylor Cole was allegedly abused; Rebecca Cass; Other medical professionals present, when Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe was allegedly abused; Coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe; Physical therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe; Medical resident present at the time Plaintiff Cherukuri was allegedly abused; Medical intern, present when Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe, was allegedly abused; Diane Christie; Dean of Osteopathic Medicine in 1995, who received a report from Diane Christie; Co-Defendant, USAGs, Notice of Non-Party Fault and Supplement; Notices of Non-Party Fault filed by any other co-Defendants; MSU and a number of Defendants associated with MSU have entered into a settlement; Alan Ashley, Chief of Sport Performance for the USOC, c/o USOC; Larry Buendorf, USOCs Chief Security Officer, c/o USOC; Gary Warren, former director of the Women's Program and of the National Team Training Center for USAG, c/o USAG; Sarah Jantzi, coach for Twin City Twisters; Dr. Jay Binder, c/o USAG; Kathy Kelly, former Vice President of Womens Programs for USAG, c/o USAG; Fran Sepler, c/o USAG; Jay Abbott, Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI. Gregory Massa, Assistant Special Agent in Charge for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Michael Langeman, Supervisory Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Scott Himsel, legal counsel to USAG; Daniel Connolly, legal counsel to USAG; Renee Jamison, c/o USAG. Second Notice of Non-Party Fault by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/17/2018 (mg).
December 14, 2018 Filing 754 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1169) as to Jeffrey R. Kovan, USA Gymnastics, Inc., Kathie Klages, Douglas Dietzel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, and William D. Strampel filed by Jane BR1 Doe (Jones, Jami) in case number 1:18-cv-1169, document numbers 179, 180, 181, 183, 184, 185, 186, 187 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 747 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Michigan State University Defendants with Prejudice by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 746 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1060) #722 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 745 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1019) #687 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 744 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1008) #685 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 743 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (1:18-cv-984) #665 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 742 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1133) #661 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 741 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-968) #658 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 740 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1006) #657 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 739 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1055(738 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 14, 2018 Filing 738 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1055) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 737 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re USA Gymnastics, Inc.s Motion to Modify the Protective Order ***Expedited Consideration Requested*** filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 736 BRIEF in support Brief in Support of USA Gymnastics, Inc.s Motion to Modify the Protective Order ***Expedited Consideration Requested*** filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 735 MOTION for order USA Gymnastics, Inc.s Motion to Modify the Protective Order ***Expedited Consideration Requested*** by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 734 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1037(733 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 733 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1037) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 732 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1038(731 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 731 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1038) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 730 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1041(729 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 729 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1041) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 728 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order "Corrected" to Dismss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1039(727 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 727 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1039) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 726 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1039(725 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 725 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1039) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #721 is STRICKEN; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (714) to remove next friends in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 12, 2018 Filing 722 CORRECTED APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1060) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 12/12/2018; this entry replaces #720 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 721 (STRICKEN) STIPULATION of dismissal (re 1:17-cv-684) by plaintiff Katherine Payne ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 12/12/2018; stricken per #724 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 720 NOTICE Request for Entry of Default (re 1:18-cv-1060) Against Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar by plaintiff Kelsey Morris (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 12/12/2018; this entry replaced by #722 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 719 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL by Audrey Forbush only for defendant Gary E. Stollak ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Forbush, Audrey) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 718 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1004(717 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 717 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1004) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 716 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(342 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 344 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 345 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 154 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 343 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 486 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 488 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 397 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 429 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 83 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 573 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 588 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 419 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 661 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 82 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 438 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 671 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 329 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 357 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 498 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 320 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 714 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 413 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 651 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 352 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 414 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 388 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 423 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B47NF Doe, Jane B74NF Doe, John B51NF Doe, Taundra Faynor; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 715 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(342 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 344 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 345 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 154 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 343 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 486 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 488 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 397 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 429 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 83 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 573 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 588 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 419 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 661 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 82 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 438 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 671 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 329 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 357 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 498 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 320 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 714 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 413 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 651 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 352 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 414 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 388 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 423 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B47NF Doe, Jane B74NF Doe, John B51NF Doe, Taundra Faynor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 714 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends by plaintiffs Jane B47NF Doe, Jane B74NF Doe, John B51NF Doe, Taundra Faynor; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 713 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1016(712 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 712 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1016) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1016 by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 711 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1049(710 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 710 MOTION to Dismiss (1:18-cv-1049) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 709 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) -MEMBER CASE 491(708 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 708 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-491) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 707 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 706 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order "Corrected" to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER 998(705 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 705 MOTION for order "Corrected" to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER 998 by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 704 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1044(703 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 703 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1044) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 702 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1034(701 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 701 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1034) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 699 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-452) filed by plaintiff Amanda Hancock ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Klakulak, Matthew) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 698 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1049) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane E-1 Doe, et al (Abood, Andrew) in case number 1:18-cv-1049, document number 308 (Attachments: #1 Attachment delivery confirmation) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 695 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1059(694 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 694 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1059) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THE CASE AS TO DEFENDANT USA GYMNASTICS, INC. ONLY PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (660) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 10, 2018 Filing 692 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1060(691 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 691 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1060) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1060 by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 690 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1047(689 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 689 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1047) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text bon 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 688 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default(297 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 643 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 633 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 411 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 318 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 631 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 314 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 314 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 433 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 470 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 256 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 470 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 392 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 561 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 631 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 370 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 356 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 313 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 386 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 643 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 402 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 396 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 471 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 361 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 426 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 387 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 127 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 435 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 470 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 317 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 624 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 311 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 316 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 428 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 687 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC) Lawrence Nassar filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 687 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (1:18-cv-1019) Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 686 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default(311 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 433 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 125 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 384 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 291 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 313 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 316 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 394 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 431 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 254 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 390 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 426 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 685 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 631 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 559 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 385 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 641 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 368 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 359 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 622 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 424 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 469 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 400 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 409 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 641 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 314 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC) Lawrence Nassar filed by Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 685 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1008) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 697 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1049) as to John Geddert and Twistars USA, Inc. filed by Jane E-1 Doe, et al (Abood, Andrew) in case number 1:18-cv-1049, document number 280 and 281 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 696 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1049) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane E-1 Doe, et al (Abood, Andrew) in case number 1:18-cv-1049, document number 278 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 684 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1058](683 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 683 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1058) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 682 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1057](681 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 681 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1057) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 680 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1258](679 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 679 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1258) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 678 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1052](677 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 677 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-1052) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 676 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1024](675 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 675 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1024) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant John Geddert; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 674 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [MEMBER CASE 256](673 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 673 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-256) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 672 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [MEMBER CASE 257](671 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 671 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-257) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 670 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [ MEMBER CASE 254](669 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 669 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-254) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 668 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [MEMBER CASE 29](372 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 415 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 366 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 107 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 281 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 367 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 613 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 279 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 441 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 611 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 611 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 376 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 406 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 287 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 382 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 286 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 287 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 35 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 279 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 282 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 287 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 667 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 526 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 391 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 292 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 273 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 236 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 604 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 291 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 408 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 281 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 281 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 439 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 34 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 286 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 413 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 667 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-29) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 700 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1122) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane Doe 03 (Corey, Louis) in case number 1:18-cv-1122, document number 272 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 665 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-984) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fairman, Melanie) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 664 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default #657 by plaintiff Joseph Kuter et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 663 AFFIDAVIT IN Support of Default re #658 by plaintiffs Lauren Bancroft, Rachel Gunther Campbell, Meghan Gunther, Emily Jane Gwardzinski Justice ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 662 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-922) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 661 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1133) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bender, Gary) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 660 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 666 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-822) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane R3 Doe, Jane R2 Doe, Jane R1 Doe, Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-822, document number 295 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 658 APPLICATION for entry of default ( re 1:18-cv-968) as to Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 5, 2018 Filing 657 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1006) as to Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg). Modified text on 12/10/2018 (mg).
December 3, 2018 Filing 659 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to Great Lakes Gymnastics, Inc filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 266 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 656 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* #655 filed by Ira Zaltz; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 3, 2018 Filing 655 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* by defendant Ira Zaltz; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 3, 2018 Filing 654 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-922) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
November 30, 2018 Filing 653 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-982) #652 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 652 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-982) as to Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default of Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (mg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 651 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-397) #650 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 650 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-397) as to Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (mg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 649 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-999) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Megan Marie LaDrigue (Rieffel, Jessica) in case number 1:18-cv-999, document number 258 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 648 NOTICE Regarding Proposed Stipulation Concerning Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings and Plaintiffs' Related Responses by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting STIPULATION (619) to stay as to Defendant Shingles in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 646 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Reliance on Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1022) filed by Jane Doe AC (Houbeck, David) in case number 1:18-cv-1022, document number 255 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 645 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-00822) by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.) Modified text on 11/27/2018 (mg).
November 21, 2018 Filing 644 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Rebecca Whitehurst (Nichol, Brittany) in case number 1:18-cv-1059, document number 253 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 643 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Lindsey Lemke et. al. (Nichol, Brittany) in case number 1:18-cv-1052, document number 255 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 642 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1026 #640 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 641 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1024 #639 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 640 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1026) as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 11/21/2018 (mg).
November 20, 2018 Filing 639 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1024) as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 11/21/2018 (mg).
November 20, 2018 Filing 638 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1008 #560 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 637 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1019 #561 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 636 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1025 #566 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 635 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1038 #567 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 634 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-995 #574 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 633 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-997 #575 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 632 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1027 #580 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 631 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-831 #581 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 630 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-944 #583 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 629 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1010 #582 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 628 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-779 #588 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 627 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1042 #584 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 626 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-913 #589 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 625 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1023 #590 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 624 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1032 #598 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 623 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1002 #595 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 622 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (1:18-cv-1012 #616 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 621 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:15-cv-851 #559 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 620 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-842 #558 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 619 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1007) by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (mg).
November 19, 2018 Filing 616 APPLICATION for entry of default (1:18-cv-1012) as to Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Req for Default of Def Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rosen, Mary) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 615 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) w/corrected Exhibit A - by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/18/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting STIPULATION (599) concerning the applicability of amended confidentiality and protective order in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 16, 2018 Filing 613 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1027(612 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 612 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1027) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 611 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1025(610 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 610 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1025) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 609 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) - MEMBER CASE 640(608 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 608 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-640) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) - by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 607 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1018(219 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 235 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 352 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 378 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 606 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 311 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 347 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 234 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 244 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 235 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 380 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 321 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 249 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 345 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 231 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 233 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 480 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 231 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 212 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 275 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 233 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 234 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 46 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 606 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 605 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1013(604 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 604 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1013) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 603 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1007(602 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)