North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC
Defendant: United States of America, acting through The United States Army Corps of Engineers and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00782
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Allegan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to stay case #11 filed by United States of America (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to stay case #11 filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Order Staying Case) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION to stay case by defendant United States of America; (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 7, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas R. TerMaat on behalf of plaintiff North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC (TerMaat, Thomas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #8 regarding Service by plaintiff North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC for Summons and Complaint for United States Army Corps of Engineers (Genovich, Laura) Modified text on 7/30/2018 (slk).
July 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #8 regarding Service by plaintiff North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC for Summons and Complaint for Attorney General of the United States (Genovich, Laura) Modified text on 7/30/2018 (slk).
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed on United States of America, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, United States of America complete on 7/19/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 (Genovich, Laura)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (amended only to correct case caption) by North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC (Genovich, Laura) Modified text on 7/19/2018 (mg).
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC (Genovich, Laura)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Genovich, Laura)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
July 17, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States of America please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United Sates and its agencies, corporations, officers, or employees. (mg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Genovich, Laura)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Quiet Title to Real Property against United States of America filed by North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Legal Description - Covenant Deed), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Easements and Restrictive Covenants), #3 Exhibit C (Quit Claim Deed)) (Genovich, Laura) Modified text on 7/17/2018 (jlg)
July 16, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4183315 (Genovich, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, acting through The United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Shores of Saugatuck, LLC
Represented By: Laura J. Genovich
Represented By: Thomas R. TerMaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?