Tullos #137990 v. Canteen Services et al
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Tullos #137990
Defendant: Bradley Balk, Unknown Party and Canteen Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00800
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: St. Joseph
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Douglas F. Tullos #137990 regarding filing fee (ns)
August 20, 2018 Certified Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #7 , Opinion (Screening) #5 , Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Douglas F. Tullos #137990 (ems)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Douglas F. Tullos #137990 to address updated per #3 (clw)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Douglas F. Tullos #137990 to 520 S Main Street, Three Rivers MI 49093 (jlb)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (ns)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Bradley Balk, Canteen Services, Unknown Party filed by Douglas F. Tullos #137990 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tullos #137990 v. Canteen Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Tullos #137990
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Balk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canteen Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?