Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C. et al v. Health Net Federal Services, LLC

Plaintiff: EBSC, Inc. and Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C.
Defendant: Health Net Federal Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00852
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
0 Judge: Phillip J Green
1 Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting STIPULATION #8 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Health Net Federal Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Centene Corporation for Health Net Federal Services, LLC (DeJong, Robert)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER For Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendant Health Net Federal Services, LLC (DeJong, Robert)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/25/2018 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/18/2018; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Health Net Federal Services, LLC served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018 (DeJong, Robert)
August 22, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert L. DeJong on behalf of defendant Health Net Federal Services, LLC (DeJong, Robert)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Health Net Federal Services, LLC (mlc)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EBSC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Sky Vision, LLC for EBSC, Inc. (Gutwald, Timothy) Modified text on 8/2/2018 (jlg)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Sky Vision, LLC for Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C. (Gutwald, Timothy) Modified text on 8/2/2018 (jlg)
August 2, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs EBSC, Inc., Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4198732 (Gutwald, Timothy) Modified text on 8/2/2018 (jlg)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Health Net Federal Services, LLC filed by Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C., EBSC, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons) (Gutwald, Timothy) Modified text on 8/2/2018 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C. et al v. Health Net Federal Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net Federal Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBSC, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy C. Gutwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Rapids Ophthalmology, P.C.
Represented By: Timothy C. Gutwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?