Tullos #137990 et al v. Balk et al
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Tullos #137990 and Darrell Stricker #31943
Defendant: Bradley Balk and St. Joseph County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv00883
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: St. Joseph
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $25.00 by Tullos, total amount paid by Tullos $80.00; total amount paid by Sticker $0.00; total amount paid to date $55.00 receipt number GR062625; total amount paid to date $80.00 (mkc)
September 13, 2018 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $25.00 by Tullos, receipt number GR062562; total amount paid by Tullos $55.00; total amount paid by Sticker $0.00; total amount paid to date $55.00 Modified text on 9/19/2018 (mkc).
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Deficiency Order #4 and Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner #5 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Darrell Stricker #31943 returned to the Court marked return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward; not remailed to plaintiff; court does not have an updated address (pjw)
September 6, 2018 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $30.00 paid by Tullos, receipt number GR062461; total amount paid by Tullos $30.00; total amount paid by Sticker $0.00; total amount paid to date $30.00 (mkc) Modified text on 9/19/2018 (mkc).
August 21, 2018 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Twin County Community Probation Center at 520 South Main St Three Rivers, MI 49093 (pjw)
August 21, 2018 Copy of Deficiency Order #4 and Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Darrell Stricker #31943 and Douglas F. Tullos #47995 (pjw)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff Douglas F. Tullos may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff Tullos to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff Darrell Stricker has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 9/17/2018 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Douglas F. Tullos #137990 to 520 S Main Street, Three Rivers MI 49093 (jlb)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit filed by Douglas F. Tullos #137990 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw) Modified text on 8/9/2018 (pjw).
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Douglas F. Tullos #137990, Darrell Stricker #31943 (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tullos #137990 et al v. Balk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Tullos #137990
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Stricker #31943
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Balk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?