Hall et al v. Gerber Products Company et al

Plaintiff: Jalynne M. Hall, Ryan G Hall and Ryan G. Hall
Defendant: Nestle USA, INC, d/b/a Nestle Nutrition USA, Gerber Products Company and Nestle USA, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00934
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Newaygo
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that defendants Gerber Products Company and Nestle USA, Inc file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Nestle USA, Inc (Cohen, Daniel) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (anm).
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Gerber Products Company (Cohen, Daniel) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (anm).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise plead in response to complaint to 10/12/2018; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE to attorney Benjamin Anchill regarding recent filing #7 (clw)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Date for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendants Gerber Products Company, Nestle USA, Inc (Anchill, Benjamin)
September 4, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Benjamin A. Anchill on behalf of defendants Gerber Products Company, Nestle USA, Inc (Anchill, Benjamin)
September 4, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel G. Cohen on behalf of defendants Gerber Products Company, Nestle USA, Inc (Cohen, Daniel)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Gerber Products Company served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018 (Smith, Glenn)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Nestle USA, Inc served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018 (Smith, Glenn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Gerber Products Company, Nestle USA, Inc (clw)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Smith, Glenn)
August 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Johnson James on behalf of plaintiffs Jalynne M. Hall, Ryan G. Hall (James, Daniel)
August 20, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Jalynne M. Hall, Ryan G. Hall in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4213314 (Smith, Glenn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jalynne M. Hall, Ryan G. Hall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34) (Smith, Glenn)
August 17, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Glenn L. Smith on behalf of plaintiffs Jalynne M. Hall, Ryan G Hall (Smith, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Gerber Products Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, INC, d/b/a Nestle Nutrition USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Products Company
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Represented By: Daniel G. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Represented By: Daniel G. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalynne M. Hall
Represented By: Glenn L. Smith
Represented By: Daniel Johnson James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan G Hall
Represented By: Glenn L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan G. Hall
Represented By: Glenn L. Smith
Represented By: Daniel Johnson James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?