Doe et al v. Michigan State University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, John A.K. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe and Jane E.C. Doe
Defendant: Lawrence Gerard Nassar, United States Olympic Committee, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Michigan State University, Twistarsusa, Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc., Gary Stollak, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Kathie Klages, Kristine Moore, Brooke Lemmen, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, William D. Strampel, Twistars USA, Inc. and John Geddert
Case Number: 1:2018cv00987
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 142 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Resolving Objections to the Proposed Amended Confidentiality and Protective Order (Dkt. No. 366 and 407) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 29, 2018 Filing 141 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant John Geddert to File Overlength Brief [MEMBER CASE 1024] by defendant John Geddert ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Filing 140 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant Twistars to File an Overlength Brief [MEMBER CASE 1025] by defendant Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Filing 139 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief [MEMBER CASE 987] by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Filing 138 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant Twistars to File Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Filing 137 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 886](516 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 886] by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 26, 2018 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (514 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:19-cv-944) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (512 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION (re 1:18-cv-831) to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 131 ANSWER to affirmative defenses (re 1:18-cv-851) by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 130 ANSWER to affirmative defenses (re 1:18-cv-842) by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 129 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-886) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 128 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-758) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (499), (500), (501), (504) to file over-length briefs in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (457); signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 124 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars, John Geddert and Kathryn Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (495), (496) for leave to file over-length briefs; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 25, 2018 Filing 122 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-886) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Day, Devin) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 121 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1007) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 120 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-1018) Allowing Defendant Twistars to File Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 119 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:17-cv-640) Allowing Twistars to File Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 127 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1002) as to Michigan State University and USA Gymnastics filed by The Estate of Megan Simon (O'Keefe, Patrick) in case number 1:18-cv-1002, document number 103 and 104 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (495), (496) for leave to file over-length briefs in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (451); granting STIPULATION (452) in case 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (441); granting STIPULATION (442) in case 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (451); granting STIPULATION (452) in case 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (439); granting STIPULATION (440) in case 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (439); granting STIPULATION (440) in case 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (432); granting STIPULATION (433) in case 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (369); granting STIPULATION (370) in case 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (354); granting STIPULATION (355) in case 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (219); granting STIPULATION (220) in case 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (269); granting STIPULATION (270) in case 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (267); granting STIPULATION (268) in case 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (243); granting STIPULATION (244) in case 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (112); granting STIPULATION (113) in case 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (234); granting STIPULATION (235) in case 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (241); granting STIPULATION (242) in case 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (236); granting STIPULATION (237) in case 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (178); granting STIPULATION (179) in case 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (210); granting STIPULATION (211) in case 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (194); granting STIPULATION (195) in case 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (200); granting STIPULATION (201) in case 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (204); granting STIPULATION (205) in case 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (194); granting STIPULATION (195) in case 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (132); granting STIPULATION (133) in case 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (122); granting STIPULATION (123) in case 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (111); granting STIPULATION (112) in case 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (117); granting STIPULATION (118) in case 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (117); granting STIPULATION (118) in case 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (123); granting STIPULATION (124) in case 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (168); granting STIPULATION (169) in case 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (124); granting STIPULATION (125) in case 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (164); granting STIPULATION (165) in case 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (101); granting STIPULATION (102) in case 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (118); granting STIPULATION (119) in case 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (138); granting STIPULATION (139) in case 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (112); granting STIPULATION (113) in case 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (116); granting STIPULATION (117) in case 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (118); granting STIPULATION (119) in case 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (102); granting STIPULATION (103) in case 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (102); granting STIPULATION (103) in case 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (110); granting STIPULATION (111) in case 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (111); granting STIPULATION (112) in case 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (114); granting STIPULATION (115) in case 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (109); granting STIPULATION (110) in case 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (111); granting STIPULATION (112) in case 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (118); granting STIPULATION (119) in case 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (109); granting STIPULATION (110) in case 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (116); granting STIPULATION (117) in case 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (110); granting STIPULATION (111) in case 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (109); granting STIPULATION (110) in case 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (110); granting STIPULATION (111) in case 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (120); granting STIPULATION (121) in case 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (122); granting STIPULATION (123) in case 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (63); granting STIPULATION (64) in case 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT USAG'S MOTION (471) FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVER-LENGTH BRIEF AND ADDRESSING OTHER BRIEFING ISSUES in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC: Plaintiffs' counsel in lead case to file within 14 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 116 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-397) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 115 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:17-cv-256) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1008) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(493 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Member Case 1008 filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1008) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Filing 126 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (1:18-cv-999) as to Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Megan Marie LaDrigue (Rieffel, Jessica) in case number 1:18-cv-999, documents number 87, 88, 89 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting STIPULATION (478) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 100 CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT (re 1:18-cv-758) in Support of Request for Entry of Default 467 468 by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (476), (477) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 22, 2018 Filing 107 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019); as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 89 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 98 PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:18-cv-734) for Extension of time to Respond to Defendant Gedderts' Twistar Gymnastics Club USA's Motion to Dismiss by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 97 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-851) by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 96 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-842) by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 19, 2018 Filing 103 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1002); as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by The Estate of Megan Simon (O'Keefe, Patrick) in case number 1:18-cv-1002, document number 84 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 101 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses (re 1:18-cv-922) by USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-922, document number 145 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 95 RESPONSE TO JOINT MOTION for discovery (156 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 77 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 163 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 90 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief(38 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 93 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief(38 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC) Brief in Support of USAG Motion for Leave to File an Over-length Brief filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (463), (464) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER FINDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CONTRIBUTION CLAIMS (393) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 18, 2018 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle)
October 18, 2018 Filing 88 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 18-cv-758) as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (mg).
October 18, 2018 Filing 87 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-822) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mla)
October 17, 2018 Filing 86 CORRECTED AMENDED BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019(454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (mg).
October 17, 2018 Filing 85 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 17, 2018 Filing 84 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 17, 2018 Filing 83 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE to attorney Scott Robert Eldridge regarding recent filing ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 108 SUMMONS returned executed (1:18-cv-1022) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Jane Doe AC (Houbeck, David) in case number 1:18-cv-1022, document number 62 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 102 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-982); as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane AC Doe et al (Sposita, Rebecca) in case number 1:18-cv-982, document number 62 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 81 AMENDED BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019(454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019(454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Filing 77 BRIEF by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees in Support of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019 by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (mg).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss (445) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Twistars USA without prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting STIPULATION (443) dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant USAG with prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting STIPULATION (440) to withdraw and refile in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting STIPULATION (439) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting STIPULATION (438) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 69 STIPULATION of dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Twistars USA and John John Geddert by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 15, 2018 Filing 104 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to Gary Stollak filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document number 65 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 68 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint with affirmative defenses filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-915, document number 74 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 67 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal in Member Case Number 1:18-cv-01046 by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 66 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Nassar (re 18-cv-829) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 111 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1032) as to William D. Strampel filed by Jane R10 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-1032, document number 63 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 65 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing USA Gymnastics, Inc. to Withdraw Its Pending Omnibus Motion To Dismiss 223 and to Refile the Motion by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 64 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-886) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert a Two Week Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 63 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-866) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(64 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 81 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 47 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 56 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 121 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 57 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 311 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 61 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 178 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 436 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 58 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 61 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 60 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 381 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 111 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 60 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 152 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 143 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 58 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 111 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 381 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 374 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 56 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 145 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 68 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 68 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 183 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 136 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 76 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 136 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 61 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 11, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-887) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 110 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1032) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane R10 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-1032, document number 43 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting (428) motion to withdraw as attorney in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting (427) motion to withdraw as attorney; in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting STIPULATION (424) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting STIPULATION (416) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting STIPULATION (415) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting STIPULATION (414) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting (401) motion for leave to seal document in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 18-cv-1046) by plaintiff Erika Davis; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hearing); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg). Modified text on 10/17/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 18-cv-1047) by plaintiff Julia Epple; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hearing); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg). Modified text on 10/17/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 18-cv-915) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ( 425 in 17-cv-29) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss (re 18-cv-915) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting STIPULATION (406) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting STIPULATION (405) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 42 STIPULATION of dismissal (re 18-cv-1046) without prejudice as to Defendants Twistars and Geddert by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 109 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1029) as to Twistars USA, Inc, USA Gymnastics, Inc, and John Geddert filed by Larissa Boyce et al (Fraser, John) in case number 1:18-cv-1029, document numbers 29, 30, 31 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 106 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 31 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 41 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-915) Allowing Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 40 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-887) Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 39 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-944) Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to file Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 8, 2018 Filing 105 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019); as to Michigan State University and Michigan State University Board of Trustees filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 30 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 8, 2018 Filing 49 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Gedderts' Twistars Gymnastics Club USA's Motion to Dismiss by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe (Damico, Jennifer) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document number 34 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-922) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Janet RA Doe, John RA Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-922, document number 87 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-842) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)(422 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-842) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-851) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant(420 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-851) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting STIPULATION (388) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (345) in case 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (335) in case 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (345) in case 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (333) in case 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (333) in case 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (326) in case 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (263) in case 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (248) in case 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (163) in case 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (161) in case 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (137) in case 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (128) in case 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (135) in case 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (130) in case 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (88) in case 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (93) in case 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (96) in case 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (89) in case 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (31) in case 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (63) in case 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (63) in case 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (34) in case 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
October 5, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Anonymous Owners of Unidentified gym employed by Treva Aolfs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Aolfs; Unidentified Physical Therapists; Meridian Township PD; Paul Rambo #9543; Sgt. Alan Spencer; A. Tobias #738; Officer Andrew McCready; Anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on day he treated Breanne Randall; Dectective Bart Crane; Chrissy Scaccia, case Officer; Christopner Thompson, dispatcher; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator; Anonymous counselor identified by Jane MBA Doe; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU; Anonymous gymnastics coach, address unknown in connection with Chelsea Markham (now deceased); Anonymous school counselor, connection with Lindsay Schuett; Anonymous track coach, connection with Christine Achenbach; Anonymous trainer No. 1 in connection with Tiffany Thomas Lopez; Anonymous Trainer #2 in connection with Tiffany Thomas-Lopez; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk; Lianna Hadden c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel; Dr. Brooke Lemmen; Anonymous trainer in connection with Jennfer Rood-Bedford; Gary Stollak; Federal Bureau of Investigation; Unknown number anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEP of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU General Counsel in 2014; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan; Deborah Van Horn, trainer at Karolyi Ranch; Anonymous individuals 1-5 at Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG; Peter Vidmar, former board chairman of USAG; Paul Parilla, USAG' former bord member; Ron Galimore, USAG's COO; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG; Anonymous trainer of Lindey Schuett; Anonymous high school counselor of Lindsey Schuett; Anonymous medical professional in connection with Jane A2 Doe; Any and all persons were were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and failed to apporpriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, indentified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect or report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, indentified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; The MSU trainer who received complaints from Christie Achenbach; MSU coach who received complaints from Christie Achenbach; MSU trainer of Jane A51 Doe; Trainer and/or MSU medical student present when Anna Ludes was alleged abused and failed to report it; Anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; MSU trainer of Plaintiff Jane 89Doe; Physical Therapist of Alexis Alvarado; Medical student present when Taylor Cole; Rebecca Cass; Other medical professionals in connection with Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe; Coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe; Physical Therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe; Medical resident in connection with Plaintiff Cherukuri; Medical intern in connection with Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe; Diane Christie; Dean of Osteopathic Medicine by defendants John Geddert and Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS BY "SECOND WAVE" PLAINTIFFS TO PROPOSED AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 34 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 4, 2018 Filing 33 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert a Two Week Extension fo File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting (397) motion to seal document in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting STIPULATION (392) CLARIFYING ORDER (ECF No. 390) REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 3, 2018 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to Michigan State University and Michigan State University Board of Trustees filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document numbers 22, 23 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 3, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re CORRECTED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF Nos. 396 and 400 (Unopposed, Joint)(143 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 25 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 127 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 23 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 358 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 358 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 346 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 346 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 148 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 141 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 401 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 261 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 348 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 28 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 CORRECTED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF Nos. 396 and 400 (Unopposed, Joint) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 28 CORRECTED PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT Settlement Agreement by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees re Sealed Document, (136 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 353 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 122 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 169 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 10 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 13 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 171 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 20 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 353 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 256 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 14 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 138 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 271 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 145 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 14 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 396 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 143 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 343 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC) (Attachments: #1 Corrected Sealed Document Part - 2, #2 Corrected Sealed Document Part - 3); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 27 Corrected EXHIBIT 1 - Correcting ECF Nos. 394-1 and 394-2 by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part - 2 of 3 Corrected Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Part - 3 of 3 Corrected Settlement Agreement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 36 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-842, document number 21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF No. 396 (Joint)(16 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 397 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 344 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 137 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 123 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 13 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 13 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 144 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 272 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 16 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 170 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 139 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 14 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 257 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 146 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF No. 396 (Joint) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 24 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT Settlement Agreement by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Part-2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for order Finding Good Faith Settlement and Barring Contributions Claims (Joint)(10 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 133 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 253 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 268 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 166 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 140 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 7 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 119 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 142 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 135 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 168 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Order, (10 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 133 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 253 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 268 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 166 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 140 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 7 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 119 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 142 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 135 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 168 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part-1: Redacted Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part-2: Redacted Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Amy L. Van Gelder); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for order Finding Good Faith Settlement and Barring Contributions Claims (Joint) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Clarifying Order Regarding Voluntary Dismissals (ECF No. 390) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, John A.K. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to Brooke Lemmen waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, John A.K. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to Jeffrey R. Kovan waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
October 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Megan P. Norris on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Norris, Megan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk (pjw)
October 1, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Melissa Fry Hague on behalf of plaintiffs Jane M.M. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe (Hague, Melissa)
October 1, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Mark Schwartz on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Schwartz, Brian)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
September 28, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ashley Evaline Racette on behalf of defendants Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen (Racette, Ashley)
September 28, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Fred K. Herrmann on behalf of defendants Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen (Herrmann, Fred)
September 28, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel J. Ferris on behalf of defendants Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen (Ferris, Daniel)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, John A.K. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to John Geddert waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 24, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Maria Cesira Fracassa Dwyer on behalf of defendant William D. Strampel (Dwyer, Maria)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Eldridge, Scott)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marshall W. Grate on behalf of defendant William D. Strampel (Grate, Marshall)
September 18, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven F. Stapleton on behalf of defendant William D. Strampel (Stapleton, Steven)
September 18, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cameron R. Getto on behalf of defendant John Geddert (Getto, Cameron)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #12 (Weiner, Ronald)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane A.K. Doe, by Next Friend John A.K. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane A.K. Doe, by Next Friend John A.K. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to Twistars USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cameron R. Getto on behalf of defendant Twistars USA, Inc. (Getto, Cameron)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to Michigan State University waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe as to Michigan State University Board of Trustees waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018 (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Twistars USA, Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc., United States Olympic Committee (pjw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (pjw)
September 5, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kimberly A. Dougherty on behalf of plaintiffs Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe (Dougherty, Kimberly)
September 5, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Rebecca L. Strauss on behalf of defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Strauss, Rebecca)
September 5, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David J. Gass on behalf of defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Gass, David)
September 5, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is cognate to case 1:17-cv-29 (mkc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Weiner, Ronald)
September 4, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amy Lynn Van Gelder on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Related Case 17-00029 by plaintiffs Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe (Weiner, Ronald)
August 31, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4223998 (Weiner, Ronald)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe (Weiner, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Michigan State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Gerard Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Olympic Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University
Represented By: Megan P. Norris
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twistarsusa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Gymnastics, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Strauss
Represented By: D. Andrew Portinga
Represented By: David J. Gass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stollak
Represented By: Peter D. Cronk, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Marie Nighswander
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Represented By: Scott Louis Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Kovan
Represented By: Ashley Evaline Racette
Represented By: Daniel J. Ferris
Represented By: Fred K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathie Klages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Moore
Represented By: Bryan R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Lemmen
Represented By: Ashley Evaline Racette
Represented By: Daniel J. Ferris
Represented By: Fred K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destiny Teachnor-Hauk
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Dietzel
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University Board of Trustees
Represented By: Megan P. Norris
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Strampel
Represented By: Marshall W. Grate
Represented By: Maria Cesira Fracassa Dwyer
Represented By: Steven F. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twistars USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron R. Getto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Geddert
Represented By: Cameron R. Getto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Z.P. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.N. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane I.B. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.M. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Represented By: Melissa Fry Hague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.H. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane D.Z. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane T.O. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane N.H. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.H. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane T.J. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.C. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane M.D. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.D. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.W. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L.B. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane K.O. Doe
Represented By: Ronald K. Weiner
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A.K. Doe
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E.H. Doe
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Represented By: Melissa Fry Hague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane B.M. Doe
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A.B. Doe
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane S.B. Doe
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E.C. Doe
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?