Epple et al v. Michigan State University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Julia Epple, Lauren Dowell, Brenda Dowell and Angela Stewart
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, USA Gymnastics, Inc., Kathie Klages, Brooke Lemmen, D.O., William D Strampel, D.O., Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, D.O., Lawrence Gerard Nassar, John Geddert, Michgan State University, Jeffrey R Kovan, D.O., Twistars USA, Inc. d/b/a Gedderts' Twistars USA Gymnastics Club, Gary E Stollak, William D. Strampel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary E. Stollak, Twistars USA, Inc., Douglas Dietzel, Michigan State University Board of Trustees and Michigan State University
Case Number: 1:2018cv01047
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 668 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John R9 Doe re 1041 re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend(1041 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 15, 2019 Filing 667 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend (re 1:18-cv-997) by plaintiff John R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 13, 2019 Filing 666 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1001) filed by plaintiff Samantha Schneider ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1038) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 12, 2019 Filing 664 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (mg).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER GRANTING MOTION (974) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER FOR JUDGE'S COPIES: Copies to be submitted within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1030), (1032), (1033) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS (910), (940) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 659 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 658 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 657 MINUTES of motion hearing for approval of settlements for minor plaintiffs (910), (940), (974) held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 656 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Grant David Kelter on behalf of defendants Twistars USA Inc. and John Geddert ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kelter, Grant) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (mg).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1026) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1025) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 653 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Approval of Settlements held January 23, 2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/30/2019 ; redaction request due 3/22/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
February 28, 2019 Filing 652 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) For Dismissal of Claims as to Defendants MSU, et al by plaintiffs Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 28, 2019 Filing 651 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887) For Dismissal of Claims as To Defendants MSU, et al by plaintiffs Sarah Allen, Jaclyn Charters, Suma Cherukuri, Jane S8 Doe, Jane S4 Doe, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S6 Doe, Jane S5 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S7 Doe, Jane S2 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-3 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER granting Second Motion (1017) To Extend Summons in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC: Defendant Van Horn's summons extended to 4/1/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 649 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1054) filed by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 648 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) For Dismissals of Claims Against MSU, et al by plaintiffs Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 647 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887) For Dismissal of Claims Against MSU, et al by plaintiffs Sarah Allen, Jaclyn Charters, Suma Cherukuri, Jane S8 Doe, Jane S4 Doe, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S6 Doe, Jane S5 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S7 Doe, Jane S2 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 646 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #436 (re 1:18-cv-887) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(436 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Sarah Allen, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 645 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re 1017 SECOND MOTION to Extend Summons filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (997),(998), (1001), (1002), (1003), (1004), (1006) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 643 SECOND MOTION to Extend Summons (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Notification); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1005) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 641 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 669 (re 1:17-cv-254) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) filed by Amanda Thomashow et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 640 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 729 (re 1:18-cv-1041) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Makayla Thrush et al; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 639 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONto Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1349 842 ) filed by Makayla Thrush ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 638 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1013 #604 ) filed by Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 637 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) ( re 1:17-cv-29 #667 , 1:18-cv-1055 738 , 1:18-cv-1346 833 ) filed by Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 636 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1047 689 ) Supplement to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response filed by Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 635 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) (re 1:17-cv-29 #667 , 1:18-cv-1059 694 , 1:18-cv-1352 848 ) filed by Victoria Carlson, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Nichol, Brittany) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 634 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:17-cv-257, 1:18-cv-1052, 1:18-cv-1348) filed by Lindsey Lemke et (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Affiliation with Twistars); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Nichol, Brittany) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 633 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1314 819 , 1:18-cv-01034 701 ) filed by Meaghan Ashcraft, Abigail Mealy, Amanda Mealy, Sydney Wais (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 632 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-01056) by plaintiff Meaghan Williams ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 631 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings (re 1:18-cv-01022) by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 630 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-01057) by plaintiff Kristin Nagle ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 629 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-1060) by plaintiff Kelsey Morris ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 628 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 18-cv-01058) by plaintiff Alyssa Zalenski ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 627 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal of Counts XXXI and XXXIV (re 1:18-cv-1004) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 626 RESPONSE TO MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) (re 1:18-cv-640 #608 , 1:18-cv-1018 #615 , and 1:18-cv-1258 679 ) filed by Jane B. Doe, John A. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, John N. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw). Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 625 PROPOSED ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal of all claims against Lawrence Nassar with prejudice (re 1:18-cv-01054) by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 624 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of Twistars and Geddert (re 1:18-cv-00944) by plaintiff Jane Doe ME ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 623 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of Twistars and Geddert (re 1:18-cv-00831) by plaintiff John Doe AA ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 622 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1347 838 , 1:18-cv-222, 1:18-cv-288, 1:18-cv-349 755 ), 1:18-cv-491 708 , 1:18-cv-1029 757 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Larissa Boyce et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER granting STIPULATION (993) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 620 SEALED EXHIBIT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe re MOTION for settlement ( 974 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 982 dated 2/20/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 21, 2019 Filing 619 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (984-991) extending time to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 617 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 616 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 615 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 614 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1124) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 613 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1123) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 612 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 611 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 610 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER {re 1:18-cv-1120) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER granting STIPULATION 980 to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER granting 976 motion for leave to file under seal in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 19, 2019 Filing 607 NOTICE REGARDING HEARING ON MOTIONS 910 , 940 , 974 FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT: Motions shall be heard on 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Quist; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 606 PROPOSED ORDER regarding (re 1:18-cv-1054)Dismissal of all claims against Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk with prejuidice by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 605 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) ( #667 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendant Twistars USA, Inc.'s and Defendant John Geddert's Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule (12)(c) Motions to Dismiss (full list of applicable cases and Plaintiffs in Exhibit 1) filed by Rachael Denhollander et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting (972) motion to withdraw as attorney; in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 603 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ( 976 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 602 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 601 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement ( 974 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 600 MOTION for settlement (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 599 SEALED DOCUMENT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend (898 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 904 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 598 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019) by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting STIPULATION (969) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS OF ESTATE OF MEGAN SIMON AGAINST MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY WITH PREJUDICE (968) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 595 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 14, 2019 Filing 594 PROPOSED ORDER regarding (1:18-cv-1002) Dismissal of all Claims Against Michigan State University with Prejudice by defendant Michigan State University ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting STIPULATION (966) TO STAY DEADLINE TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 592 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1038) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER DENYING THE NICHOLS LAW FIRM MOTION (942) TO STAY in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 590 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Disqualify Counsel held January 23, 2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/13/2019 ; redaction request due 3/5/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
February 11, 2019 Filing 589 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Permission to Appeal re 938 with The Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe, interested parties The Nichols Law Firm (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition to Appeal); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (mg).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 588 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT IRA ZALTZ'S MOTION (655) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting STIPULATION (949) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting STIPULATION (948) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting STIPULATION (946) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting STIPULATION (941) REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - MOTIONS TO DIMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 583 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1031) 939 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 582 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1035) 936 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 581 REPLY to response to motion #655 in 1:17-cv-29 (273 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* filed by Ira Zaltz ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (mg).
February 6, 2019 Filing 580 THIRD NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re The anonymous owners of the unidentified gym that employed Treva Alofs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Alofs; Unidentified physical therapists, addresses unknown;Meridian Township Police Department; Paul Rambo, #9543, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Sgt. Alan Spencer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; A. Tobias #738, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Officer Andrew McCready, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; The anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on the day he treated Breanne Randall; Detective Bart Crane, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Chrissy Scaccia, case officer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Christopher Thompson, dispatcher, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator, Michigan State Police Forensic Laboratory; Anonymous counselor, address unknown; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU; Anonymous gymnastics coach, address unknown; Anonymous school counselor; Anonymous track coach; Anonymous trainer no. 1, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer no. 2, c/o MSU; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, c/o MSU; Lianna Hadden, c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel, c/o MSU; Dr. Brooke Lemmen, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer, c/o MSU; Gary Stollak, retired MSU psychologist; The Federal Bureau of Investigation; Unknown number of anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEO of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU general counsel; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan, c/o MSU; Deborah Van Horn; Anonymous individual nos. 1-5 at the Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; Peter Vidmar, USAGs former board chairman, c/o USA Gymnastics; Paul Parilla, USAGs former board member, c/o USA Gymnastics; Ron Galimore, USAGs COO, c/o USA Gymnastics; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; The anonymous trainer of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; The anonymous high school counselor of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; The anonymous medical professional, address unknown, who was present during at least one instance of alleged abuse committed on Jane A2 Doe in 2011; Any and all persons who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; The MSU trainer, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach but failed to investigate, follow up or report them to superiors, CPS or law enforcement; The MSU coach, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach but failed to investigate, follow up or report them to superiors, CPS or law enforcement; The MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A51 Doe; The trainer and or MSU medical student (address unknown) present when Plaintiff, Anna Ludes, was allegedly abused, but who failed to detect the abuse or report it; The anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; The MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A89 Doe; The physical therapist of Plaintiff Alexis Alvarado; The medical student, address unknown, present when Plaintiff Taylor Cole was allegedly abused failed to detect the abuse or report it; Rebecca Cass; Catryina Brown; the other medical professionals present, addresses unknown, when Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe was allegedly abused failed to detect the abuse or report it; The coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe, address unknown, was present for one or more instances of alleged abuse yet she failed to detect the abuse or report it; The physical therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe, address unknown, was present for one or more instances of alleged abuse yet she failed to detect the abuse or report it; The medical resident present at the time Plaintiff Cherukuri was allegedly abused by Nassar; The medical intern, address unknown, who was present when Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe, was allegedly abused; Diane Christie; The Dean of Osteopathic Medicine; Co-Defendant, USAGs, Notice of Non-Party Fault and Supplement are hereby incorporated by reference; The Notices of Non-Party Fault filed by any other co-Defendants; MSU and a number of Defendants associated with MSU have entered into a settlement; Alan Ashley, Chief of Sport Performance for the USOC; Larry Buendorf, USOCs Chief Security Officer, c/o USOC; Gary Warren, former director of the Women's Program and of the National Team Training Center for USAG, c/o USAG; Sarah Jantzi, coach for Twin City Twisters; Dr. Jay Binder, c/o USAG; Kathy Kelly, former Vice President of Womens Programs for USAG, c/o USAG; Fran Sepler, c/o USAG; Jay Abbott, Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Gregory Massa, Assistant Special Agent in Charge for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Michael Langeman, Supervisory Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Scott Himsel, legal counsel to USAG, formerly of Faegre Baker Daniels; Daniel Connolly, legal counsel to USAG, Faegre Baker Daniels;Renee Jamison, c/o USAG; Helena Shah Trivedi, c/o MSU; Kelli Bert, c/o MSU; Athletic trainer, Tony Robles; Dr. Lionel Rosen, MSU Sports Medicine, c/o MSU; and David Jager, MSU Trainer, c/o MSU. by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. and Kathryn Geddert Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 579 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-732) 928 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 578 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT (re 1:17-cv-676) by plaintiff Jane F2 Doe (re 940 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Waun, Thomas) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 577 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-1347) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 576 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-1029) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 575 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 574 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 573 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-491) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 572 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 571 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 570 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay 942 February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 569 BRIEF in support of MOTION to stay 942 February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel 938 ) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court of Claims Transcript of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 568 MOTION to stay (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019) February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel 938 by interested party The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 567 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1349) Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defs Twistars Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Makayla Thrush ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 566 MOTION for settlement (re 1:17-cv-676) by plaintiff Jane F2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order Prop Order App Stlmnt); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Waun, Thomas) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 565 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1031) as to Lawrence Nassar, D.O. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Livingway, Elaine) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting (454) motion to disqualify opposing counsel in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC affecting member case nos. 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019; granting motion for leave to supplement the record (919)in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; and granting Nichols's request for immediate appeal ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, pgh)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting 926 Plaintiff Jane K.K. Doe's Motion to Remove Next Friends in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Filing 562 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (re 1:18-cv-1035) Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default of Defendnt Lawrence Gerard Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
January 30, 2019 Filing 561 CORRECTED EXHIBIT B (re 919 by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (mg).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER granting STIPULATION 923 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/8/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting STIPULATION 918 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting STIPULATION 914 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER granting STIPULATION 913 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER granting STIPULATION 912 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting STIPULATION 921 to Extend Stay of Litigation Proceedings Against MSU Defendants Pending Mediation in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 29, 2019 Filing 554 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-732) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (mg).
January 29, 2019 Filing 553 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(541 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 530 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 699 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 536 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 539 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 926 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 869 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 554 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 548 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 292 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 882 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 593 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 598 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 151 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 545 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 707 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 555 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 607 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 549 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 152 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-ESC, 696 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 532 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 648 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 783 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 862 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 799 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 871 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 536 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 624 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 881 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 710 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 493 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 708 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 869 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 567 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 639 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 633 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 672 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 548 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 371 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 665 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 545 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 707 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet M.K. Doe, John K.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 552 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends (re 1:18-cv-732) by plaintiffs Janet M.K. Doe, John K.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 551 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss oral argument requested (655 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane RG Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (mla)
January 28, 2019 Filing 550 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) re 18-cv-842, 18-cv-851, 18-cv-1008, and 18-cv-1019 filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 549 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 548 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 547 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Stay of Litigation Proceedings Against MSU Defendants Pending Mediation by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
January 25, 2019 Filing 546 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 545 MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record by interested party The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; (Attachments: #1 Index Of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - December 21, 2018 report from the independent special counsel, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lisa DeStefano, DO); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 544 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 543 NOTICE Withdrawal of Attorney by plaintiffs Larissa Boyce et al (1:17-cv-222), Jane B24 Doe et al (1:17-cv-349), Jane B20 Doe et al (1:17-cv-288) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Brown, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 25, 2019 Filing 542 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Great Lakes Gymnastics, Inc (re 1:18-cv-1019) 894 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 541 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1296) 909 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 540 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 539 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 538 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 537 SEALED DOCUMENT Confidential Exhibit 1 (re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Katherine Payne re MOTION for settlement Approval 910 ; filed under seal pursuant to order 907 dated 1/23/19 Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal (529 in member case 18-cv-1044) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 536 MOTION for settlement Approval (re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Katherine Payne; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Approve Settlement, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Approve Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 535 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (re 1:18-cv-1296) Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bender, Gary) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 534 APPLICATION for entry of default (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED) (re 1:18-cv-999) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of app for default, #2 Proposed Document Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg). (Default not entered as attorney never submitted corrected affidavit) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting 824 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting 879 Plaintiff's Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER granting STIPULATION 893 Dismissing John Geddert as a Defendant (terming 675 Motion To Dismiss by Defendant John Geddert); signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting 898 motion to appoint next friend; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting motions for settlement 827 , 860 , 862 , 871 , 885 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Filing 528 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend ( 898 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 527 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend 898 (re 1:18-cv-173) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 526 MOTION to appoint next friend (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting STIPULATION 890 Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting 889 Stipulated Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 523 AFFIDAVIT in support of Request for Entry of Default 894 re 1:18-cv-1019) filed by plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 522 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to Great Lakes Gymnastics ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 521 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissing John Geddert as a Defendant (re 1:18-cv-1024) by plaintiff Jane P.S. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 22, 2019 Filing 519 CORRECTED MOTION for order (Second Corrected) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
January 22, 2019 Filing 518 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 22, 2019 Filing 517 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiffs Kylie Chester, Jane C1 Doe, Jane C12 Doe, Jane C13 Doe, Jane C14 Doe, Jane C15 Doe, Jane C16 Doe, Jane C17 Doe, Jane C19 Doe, Jane C2 Doe, Jane C20 Doe, Jane C21 Doe, Jane C22 Doe, Jane C24 Doe, Jane C26 Doe, Jane C29 Doe, Jane C31 Doe, Jane C32 Doe, Jane C33 Doe, Jane C34 Doe, Jane C35 Doe, Jane C36 Doe, Jane C38 Doe, Jane C4 Doe, Jane C5 Doe, Jane C8 Doe, Lindsey Lemke, Amanda Smith ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 21, 2019 Filing 516 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 515 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT by plaintiff Leslie Miller re MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (104 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 514 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 513 MOTION for settlement approval by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting STIPULATION (881) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting STIPULATION (878) re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 510 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18cv-1059) 832 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 509 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 508 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (104 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 507 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 506 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiffs Meaghan Ashcraft, Abigail Mealy, Amanda Mealy, Sydney Wais ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 505 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jane C38 Doe by plaintiff Jane C38 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe ( 813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 873 dated 1/17/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 504 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jane H3 Doe by plaintiff Jane H3 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe ( 811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 872 dated 1/17/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 503 PROPOSED PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiff Larissa Boyce re CORRECTED MOTION for settlement 871 (Approval of Settlement for Minors) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 502 CORRECTED BRIEF in support of CORRECTED MOTION for settlement 871 (Approval of Settlement for Minors) filed by Larissa Boyce (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting 813 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting 811 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 499 CORRECTED MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors) by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
January 16, 2019 Filing 520 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1122) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane Doe 03 (Corey, Louis) in case number 1:18-cv-1122, document number 469 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 498 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe( 811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane H3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 497 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe( 813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane C38 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting STIPULATION 864 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 495 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement( 862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 494 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe re MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement(862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting STIPULATION 858 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 492 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1347) Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Larissa Boyce ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 491 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement( 862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 490 MOTION for settlement (re 1:17-cv-254) Motion to Approve Settlement by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 489 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors)( 860 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Larissa Boyce (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 488 MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors)(re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-288, 1:17-cv-349) by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (ECF No. 827): hearing set 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 486 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1345) Regarding briefing schedule for defendants Twistars/Gedderts motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Katherine Payne ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting STIPULATION 856 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 484 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1346) regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars, USA Inc. and John Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (803) to voluntarily dismiss all defendants with prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (802) to voluntarily dismiss all defendants in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 481 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane NC Doe re MOTION for leave to file / Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice(802 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file / Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice(803 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) / Motions are unopposed. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting 835 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting (771) motion to extend time to serve summons in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 478 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending summons (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 477 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1352(848 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 476 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1352) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 475 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [Corrected] - MEMBER CASE 1351(846 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 474 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1351) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #7 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case)(Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 473 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1350(844 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 472 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1350) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case)(Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 471 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1349(842 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 470 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1349) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 469 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1348(840 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 468 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1348) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 467 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [Corrected] - MEMBER CASE 1347(285 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 794 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 712 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 464 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 612 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 466 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 512 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 466 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 579 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 795 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 444 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 407 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 521 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 206 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 207 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 622 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 469 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 838 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 446 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 775 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 66 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-ESC, 782 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 584 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 697 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 782 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 586 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 481 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 507 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 610 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 65 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 785 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 476 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 466 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1347) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #7 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 465 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend (60 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)(5 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 464 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend 835 (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit , #2 Exhibit 2- Proposed Order; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 463 MOTION to appoint next friend (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 462 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1346(833 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 461 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1346) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 460 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Blake Lertzman); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 459 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander re MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 458 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count of brief in support of MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 457 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 456 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 455 MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 454 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 453 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 452 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 451 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuat to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1345(822 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 450 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1345) Pursuat to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 449 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1314(819 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 448 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1052) 807 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 447 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1314) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #6 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 446 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1007) 806 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 445 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-993) 804 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 444 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of C24 Doe (re 1:18-cv-257) by plaintiff Jane C24 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend (318 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order #323 dated 8/6/18 (re ( #318 , #319 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 443 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of C19 Doe (re 1:18-cv-257) by plaintiff Jane C19 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend ( #318 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order #323 dated 8/6/18 (re ( #318 , #319 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 442 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe for Jane C37 Doe ( 813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane C38 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 441 MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe for Jane C37 Doe (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiff Jane C38 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Appoint Next Friend); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 440 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe for John Doe( 811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane H3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 439 MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe for John Doe (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiff Jane H3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Appoint Next Friend); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting STIPULATION (805) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 437 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 734(808 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 436 MOTION for order to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-734) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #79 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 13, 2019 Filing 435 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Blake Lertzman); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 434 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1007) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 433 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 432 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-993) as to Lawrence Nassar, DO (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default) filed by Jane KRA Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Freid, Debra) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 431 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-971) by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 430 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-1028) by plaintiff Jane NC Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 429 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1047) 792 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 428 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1046) 791 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS 795 , 796 , 797 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 426 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Michigan State University Board of Trustees served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018 (Merson, Jordan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 425 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Michigan State University served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018 (Merson, Jordan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 424 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Lawrence Gerard Nassar served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Merson, Jordan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 423 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-978) 794 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 422 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 421 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 420 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 419 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-978) as to Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 418 (DISREGARD) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2019; duplicate entry of 792 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 417 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1047) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 416 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1046) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (mg).
January 4, 2019 Filing 415 (DISREGARD) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/7/2019; filed incorrectly, attorney instructed to refile in lead case 17-cv-29 (mg).
January 3, 2019 Filing 414 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1058) 775 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 413 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1057) 773 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 412 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1056) 774 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 411 AFFIDAVIT in support 775 (re 1:18-cv-1058) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Alyssa Zalenski ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 410 AFFIDAVIT in support 774 (re 1:18-cv-1056) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Meaghan Williams ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 409 AFFIDAVIT in support 773 (re 1:18-cv-1057) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Kristin Nagle ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER MODIFYING PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF No. 526) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MSU DEFENDANTS' MOTION #454 TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL: oral argument will be heard on 1/23/2019 at 11:00 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting STIPULATION [ 770 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting STIPULATION 769 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting STIPULATION 767 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
December 26, 2018 Filing 400 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1001 751 ); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 22, 2018 Filing 399 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1058) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (ems). Modified text on 1/2/2019 (mg).
December 22, 2018 Filing 398 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1056) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (ems).
December 22, 2018 Filing 397 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1057) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 12/26/2018 (ems).
December 21, 2018 Filing 406 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1258) filed by plaintiff John N. Doe in case number 1:18-cv-1258, document number 140; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 405 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by All Plaintiffs in case number 1:18-cv-1052, document number 383; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 404 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by All Plaintiffs (Mast, Megan) in case number 1:18-cv-1059, document number 381; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (ems)
December 21, 2018 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to serve the complaint /TO EXTEND SUMMONS(139 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 395 MOTION to serve the complaint /TO EXTEND SUMMONS by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 394 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1022) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Filing 393 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Filing 392 CHART OF ASSERTED CLAIMS by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit EX A - Chart Summarizing Claims Asserted Against Twistars/Gedderts and Cases in which such Claims have been asserted, #3 Exhibit EX B - List of Plaintiffs who claim they were abused at Twistars' facility, #4 Exhibit EX C - List of Plaintiffs who have sued Twistars/Gedderts but who were not treated by Nassar at Twistars); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 20, 2018 Filing 391 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1007) for an extension of time to file a response to Defendant Zaltz by plaintiff Jane RG Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting STIPULATION (763) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 389 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-829) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Roumel, Nicholas) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE: Any party opposing USAG's Motion 735 to respond on or before 12/21/2018; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 387 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Comittee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 19, 2018 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Addendum to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 831(761 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 19, 2018 Filing 385 MOTION(Addendum) to Dismiss Pursuant (re 1:18-cv-831) #512 to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 18, 2018 Filing 384 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1056(759 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 383 MOTIONto Dismiss (1:18-cv-1056) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 18, 2018 Filing 382 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1029(757 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 381 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1029) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 18, 2018 Filing 380 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) - MEMBER CASES 222; 288; 349(755 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Filing 379 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting STIPULATION 747 to dismiss MSU Defendants with Prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER dismissing without prejudice USAG's Motions to Dismiss (153), (564) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 375 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-01001) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James)
December 17, 2018 Filing 374 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Anonymous owners of the unidentified gym that employed Treva Alofs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Alofs; Unidentified physical therapists; Meridian Township Police Department; Paul Rambo, #9543;, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Sgt. Alan Spencer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; A. Tobias #738, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Officer Andrew McCready, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on the day he treated Breanne Randall; Detective Bart Crane, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Chrissy Scaccia, case officer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Christopher Thompson, dispatcher, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator, Michigan State Police Forensic Laboratory; Anonymous counselor Jane M.B.A. Doe identified her Third Amended Complaint; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU, Hannah Administration Building; Anonymous gymnastics coach that Chelsea Markham (now deceased), told her mother, Donna Markham that she was sexually abused by Nassar at the age of 10; Anonymous school counselor told by Lindsay Schuett; Anonymous track coach told by Christine Achenbach; Anonymous trainer no. 1, c/o MSU, Hannah Administration Building told by Tiffany Thomas-Lopez in 2000Anonymous trainer no. 2, c/o MSU, Hannah Administration Building; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk;, c/o MSU; Lianna Hadden, c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel, c/o MSU; Dr. Brooke Lemmen, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer, c/o MSU, told by Jennifer Rood-Bedford in early 2000s; Gary Stollak, retired MSU psychologist, c/o MSU; The Federal Bureau of Investigation, 935 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D.C. 20535-0001; Unknown number of anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEO of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU general counsel in 2014; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan, c/o MSU; Deborah Van Horn; Anonymous individual nos. 1-5 at the Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG; Peter Vidmar, USAGs former board chairman, c/o USA Gymnastics; Paul Parilla, USAGs former board member, c/o USA Gymnastics; Ron Galimore, USAGs COO, c/o USA Gymnastics; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; Anonymous trainer of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett;, address unknown, for the reasons set forth in 1:17-cv-00029, ECF No. 202 PageID 9259-92; Anonymous high school counselor of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; Anonymous medical professional; Any and all persons who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; MSU trainer, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach; MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A51 Doe; Trainer and or MSU medical student present when Plaintiff, Anna Ludes, was allegedly abused; Anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A89 Doe; Physical therapist of Plaintiff Alexis Alvarado; Medical student, present when Plaintiff Taylor Cole was allegedly abused; Rebecca Cass; Other medical professionals present, when Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe was allegedly abused; Coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe; Physical therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe; Medical resident present at the time Plaintiff Cherukuri was allegedly abused; Medical intern, present when Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe, was allegedly abused; Diane Christie; Dean of Osteopathic Medicine in 1995, who received a report from Diane Christie; Co-Defendant, USAGs, Notice of Non-Party Fault and Supplement; Notices of Non-Party Fault filed by any other co-Defendants; MSU and a number of Defendants associated with MSU have entered into a settlement; Alan Ashley, Chief of Sport Performance for the USOC, c/o USOC; Larry Buendorf, USOCs Chief Security Officer, c/o USOC; Gary Warren, former director of the Women's Program and of the National Team Training Center for USAG, c/o USAG; Sarah Jantzi, coach for Twin City Twisters; Dr. Jay Binder, c/o USAG; Kathy Kelly, former Vice President of Womens Programs for USAG, c/o USAG; Fran Sepler, c/o USAG; Jay Abbott, Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI. Gregory Massa, Assistant Special Agent in Charge for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Michael Langeman, Supervisory Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Scott Himsel, legal counsel to USAG; Daniel Connolly, legal counsel to USAG; Renee Jamison, c/o USAG. Second Notice of Non-Party Fault by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/17/2018 (mg).
December 14, 2018 Filing 378 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1169) as to Jeffrey R. Kovan, USA Gymnastics, Inc., Kathie Klages, Douglas Dietzel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, and William D. Strampel filed by Jane BR1 Doe (Jones, Jami) in case number 1:18-cv-1169, document numbers 179, 180, 181, 183, 184, 185, 186, 187 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 371 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Michigan State University Defendants with Prejudice by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 370 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1060) 722 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 369 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1019) 687 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 368 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1008) 685 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 367 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (1:18-cv-984) #665 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 366 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1133) #661 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 365 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-968) #658 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 364 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1006) #657 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 363 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1055(738 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 14, 2018 Filing 362 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1055) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 361 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re USA Gymnastics, Inc.s Motion to Modify the Protective Order ***Expedited Consideration Requested*** filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 360 BRIEF in support Brief in Support of USA Gymnastics, Inc.s Motion to Modify the Protective Order ***Expedited Consideration Requested*** filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 359 MOTION for order USA Gymnastics, Inc.s Motion to Modify the Protective Order ***Expedited Consideration Requested*** by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 358 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1037(733 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 357 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1037) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 356 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1038(731 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 355 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1038) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 354 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1041(729 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 353 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1041) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 352 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order "Corrected" to Dismss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1039(727 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 351 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1039) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 13, 2018 Filing 350 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1039(725 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 349 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1039) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 721 is STRICKEN; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (714) to remove next friends in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 12, 2018 Filing 346 CORRECTED APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1060) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 12/12/2018; this entry replaces 720 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 345 (STRICKEN) STIPULATION of dismissal (re 1:17-cv-684) by plaintiff Katherine Payne ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 12/12/2018; stricken per 724 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 344 NOTICE Request for Entry of Default (re 1:18-cv-1060) Against Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar by plaintiff Kelsey Morris (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 12/12/2018; this entry replaced by 722 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 343 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL by Audrey Forbush only for defendant Gary E. Stollak ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Forbush, Audrey) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 342 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1004(717 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 341 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1004) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 340 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(342 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 344 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 345 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 154 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 343 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 486 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 488 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 397 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 429 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 83 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 573 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 588 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 419 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 661 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 82 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 438 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 671 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 329 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 357 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 498 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 320 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 714 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 413 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 651 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 352 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 414 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 388 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 423 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B47NF Doe, Jane B74NF Doe, John B51NF Doe, Taundra Faynor; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 339 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(342 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 344 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 345 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 154 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 343 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 486 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 488 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 397 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 429 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 83 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 573 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 588 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 419 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 326 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 333 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 661 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 82 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 438 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 671 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 329 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 357 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 498 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 320 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 714 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 413 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 651 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 497 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 658 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 327 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 352 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 332 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 414 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 388 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 337 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 423 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B47NF Doe, Jane B74NF Doe, John B51NF Doe, Taundra Faynor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 338 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends by plaintiffs Jane B47NF Doe, Jane B74NF Doe, John B51NF Doe, Taundra Faynor; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 337 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1016(712 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 12, 2018 Filing 336 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1016) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1016 by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1049(710 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 334 MOTION to Dismiss (1:18-cv-1049) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 333 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) -MEMBER CASE 491(708 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 332 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-491) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 331 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/20/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 330 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order "Corrected" to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER 998(705 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 329 MOTION for order "Corrected" to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER 998 by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 328 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1044(703 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 327 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1044) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 326 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1034(701 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Filing 325 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1034) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 11, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-452) filed by plaintiff Amanda Hancock ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Klakulak, Matthew) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 322 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1049) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane E-1 Doe, et al (Abood, Andrew) in case number 1:18-cv-1049, document number 308 (Attachments: #1 Attachment delivery confirmation) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 319 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1059(694 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 318 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1059) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THE CASE AS TO DEFENDANT USA GYMNASTICS, INC. ONLY PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (660) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 10, 2018 Filing 316 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1060(691 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 315 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1060) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1060 by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 314 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1047(689 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 10, 2018 Filing 313 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1047) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text bon 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 312 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default(297 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 643 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 633 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 411 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 318 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 631 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 314 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 314 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 433 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 470 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 256 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 470 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 325 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 392 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 561 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 631 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 370 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 356 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 313 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 386 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 643 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 402 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 396 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 471 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 361 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 426 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 387 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 127 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 435 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 470 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 317 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 624 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 311 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 316 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 428 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 687 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC) Lawrence Nassar filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 311 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (1:18-cv-1019) Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 10, 2018 Filing 310 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default(311 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 433 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 125 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 384 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 291 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 313 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 316 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 394 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 431 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 254 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 390 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 328 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 426 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 685 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 308 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 631 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 307 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 559 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 385 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 641 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 368 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 359 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 622 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 302 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 424 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 323 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 469 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 400 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 409 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 304 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 301 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 641 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 314 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC) Lawrence Nassar filed by Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 309 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1008) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 321 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1049) as to John Geddert and Twistars USA, Inc. filed by Jane E-1 Doe, et al (Abood, Andrew) in case number 1:18-cv-1049, document number 280 and 281 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 320 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1049) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane E-1 Doe, et al (Abood, Andrew) in case number 1:18-cv-1049, document number 278 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 308 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1058](683 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 307 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1058) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 306 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1057](681 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 305 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1057) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 304 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1258](679 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 303 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1258) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 302 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1052](677 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 301 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-1052) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [MEMBER CASE 1024](675 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 299 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1024) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant John Geddert; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 298 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [MEMBER CASE 256](673 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 297 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-256) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 296 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [MEMBER CASE 257](671 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 295 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-257) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 294 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [ MEMBER CASE 254](669 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 293 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-254) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 7, 2018 Filing 292 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) [MEMBER CASE 29](372 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 415 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 366 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 107 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 281 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 367 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 613 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 298 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 279 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 441 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 611 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 611 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 376 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 406 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 287 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 382 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 286 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 287 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 35 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 279 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 282 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 287 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 667 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 526 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 391 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 292 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 273 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 236 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 284 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 604 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 294 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 291 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 285 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 408 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 295 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 281 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 281 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 439 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 297 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 34 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 278 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 277 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 290 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 286 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 413 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 291 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:17-cv-29) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 12/9/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 324 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1122) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane Doe 03 (Corey, Louis) in case number 1:18-cv-1122, document number 272 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 289 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-984) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fairman, Melanie) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 288 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default #657 by plaintiff Joseph Kuter et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 287 AFFIDAVIT IN Support of Default re #658 by plaintiffs Lauren Bancroft, Rachel Gunther Campbell, Meghan Gunther, Emily Jane Gwardzinski Justice ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 286 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-922) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 285 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1133) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bender, Gary) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 6, 2018 Filing 284 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 290 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-822) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane R3 Doe, Jane R2 Doe, Jane R1 Doe, Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-822, document number 295 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 282 APPLICATION for entry of default ( re 1:18-cv-968) as to Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 5, 2018 Filing 281 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1006) as to Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lantzy, Robert) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg). Modified text on 12/10/2018 (mg).
December 5, 2018 Filing 280 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Douglas Dietzel served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 279 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Kathie Klages served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 278 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Destiny Teachnor-Hauk served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 283 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to Great Lakes Gymnastics, Inc filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 266 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
December 3, 2018 Filing 277 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* #655 filed by Ira Zaltz; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 3, 2018 Filing 276 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* by defendant Ira Zaltz; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
December 3, 2018 Filing 275 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Jeffrey R. Kovan served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 274 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Brooke Lemmen served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 273 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Gary E. Stollak served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 272 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-922) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (mg).
November 30, 2018 Filing 271 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-982) #652 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 270 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-982) as to Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default of Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (mg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 269 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-397) #650 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 268 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-397) as to Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (mg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 267 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-999) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Megan Marie LaDrigue (Rieffel, Jessica) in case number 1:18-cv-999, document number 258 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 266 NOTICE Regarding Proposed Stipulation Concerning Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings and Plaintiffs' Related Responses by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 265 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Angela Stewart, Julia Epple, Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. waiver sent on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting STIPULATION (619) to stay as to Defendant Shingles in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 263 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Reliance on Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1022) filed by Jane Doe AC (Houbeck, David) in case number 1:18-cv-1022, document number 255 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 262 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Gary E. Stollak served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 261 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-00822) by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.) Modified text on 11/27/2018 (mg).
November 21, 2018 Filing 260 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Rebecca Whitehurst (Nichol, Brittany) in case number 1:18-cv-1059, document number 253 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 259 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Lindsey Lemke et. al. (Nichol, Brittany) in case number 1:18-cv-1052, document number 255 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 258 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Angela Stewart, Julia Epple, Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 257 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1026 #640 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 256 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1024 #639 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 255 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of William D. Strampel served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 254 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of USA Gymnastics, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 253 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1026) as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 11/21/2018 (mg).
November 20, 2018 Filing 252 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1024) as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 11/21/2018 (mg).
November 20, 2018 Filing 251 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1008 #560 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 250 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1019 #561 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 249 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1025 #566 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 248 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1038 #567 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 247 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-995 #574 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 246 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-997 #575 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 245 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1027 #580 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 244 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-831 #581 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 243 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-944 #583 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 242 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1010 #582 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 241 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-779 #588 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 240 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1042 #584 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 239 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-913 #589 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 238 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1023 #590 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 237 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1032 #598 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 236 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1002 #595 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 235 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (1:18-cv-1012 #616 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 234 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:15-cv-851 #559 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 233 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-842 #558 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 232 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1007) by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (mg).
November 19, 2018 Filing 229 APPLICATION for entry of default (1:18-cv-1012) as to Defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Req for Default of Def Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rosen, Mary) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 228 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) w/corrected Exhibit A - by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/18/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting STIPULATION (599) concerning the applicability of amended confidentiality and protective order in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 16, 2018 Filing 226 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1027(612 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 225 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1027) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 224 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1025(610 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 223 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1025) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) - MEMBER CASE 640(608 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-640) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) - by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1018(219 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 235 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 352 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 378 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 606 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 306 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 311 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 347 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 234 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 244 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 235 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 380 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 321 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 249 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 345 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 289 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 231 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 280 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 330 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 233 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 480 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 231 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 212 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 389 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 275 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 233 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 234 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 46 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 224 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 219 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 226 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 219 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 218 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1013(604 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 217 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1013) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1007(602 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 215 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 16, 2018 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 998(206 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 556 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 168 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 214 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 210 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 208 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 372 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 207 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 324 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 210 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 556 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 269 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 207 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 225 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 225 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 374 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 238 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 348 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 227 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 212 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 215 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 346 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 212 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 210 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 600 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 216 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 208 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 208 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 223 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 474 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 210 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 243 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 299 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 228 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 40 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 274 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 218 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 210 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 217 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 300 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 315 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 309 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 283 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 222 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 229 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 221 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 213 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 15, 2018 Filing 212 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Concerning the Applicability of Amended Confidentiality and Protective Order in case 1:18-cv-00887 by defendants Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Michigan State University ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
November 15, 2018 Filing 211 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1032) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 14, 2018 Filing 231 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1022) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane Doe AC (Houbeck, David) in case number 1:18-cv-1022, document number 207 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER AMENDING NOVEMBER 8, 2018, ORDER REGARDING BRIEFS AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS TWISTARS AND GEDDERTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Defendants Twistars/Gedderts to file by 12/21/2018; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 14, 2018 Filing 209 AFFIDAVIT in support of Application for Entry of Default(595 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 206 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Estate of Megan Simon; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (O'Keefe, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 208 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:15-cv-1002) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (O'Keefe, Patrick) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 230 SUMMONS returned executed (1:18-cv-1029) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Larissa Boyce et al (Fraser, John) in case number 1:18-cv-1029, document number 195 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 13, 2018 Filing 207 PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand For Jury Trial (re 1:18-cv-822) filed by Jane R3 Doe, Jane R2 Doe, Jane R1 Doe, Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-822, document number 231 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS allowing plaintiff to proceed under pseudonymous status (585), (587) and STIPULATION allowing plaintiff to appoint next friend (586); signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting STIPULATION (577) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting (568) motion to amend complaint in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 203 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1023) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 202 APPLICATION for entry of default (1:18-cv-913) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of request for entry of default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 201 APPLICATION for entry of default (1:18-cv-779) as to Defendant Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Default of Defendant Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lucas, Joseph) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 200 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1023) Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonymous Status by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 199 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1023) Allowing Plaintiff to Appoint Next Friend by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 198 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-913) Allowing Plaintiff to Proceed Under Pseudonymous Status by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 197 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1042) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 196 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-944) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 13, 2018 Filing 195 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (1:18-cv-1010) Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 12, 2018 Filing 194 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-831) (MacKenzie, Donna) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 12, 2018 Filing 193 APPLICATION for entry of default (1:18-cv-1027) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Marker, Caleb) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (mg).
November 12, 2018 Filing 192 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to File Motions to Dismiss MOTION for extension of time to file (578 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 578 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA Inc., Kathryn Geddert, John Geddert, John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, John Geddert; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 12, 2018 Filing 191 MOTION for extension of time to File Motions to Dismiss, MOTION for extension of time to file by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc., John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
November 12, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel J. Ferris on behalf of defendants Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen (Ferris, Daniel)
November 12, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Fred K. Herrmann on behalf of defendants Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen (Herrmann, Fred)
November 12, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ashley Evaline Racette on behalf of defendants Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen (Racette, Ashley)
November 9, 2018 Filing 190 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-998) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlenghth Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFS AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Oral argument to be heard 5/1/2019 at 2:00 PM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 188 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-997) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 8, 2018 Filing 187 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-995) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (mg).
November 8, 2018 Filing 186 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 185 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default (re 1:18-cv-842) #558 by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 11/12/2018 (mg).
November 7, 2018 Filing 184 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to amend/correct Complaint(205 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane R3 Doe, Jane R2 Doe, Jane R1 Doe, Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 183 BRIEF in support of MOTION to amend/correct Complaint(205 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane R3 Doe, Jane R2 Doe, Jane R1 Doe, Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 182 RESPONSE TO Court's Order Regarding Other Briefing Issues (ECF 497) filed by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint by plaintiffs Jane R3 Doe, Jane R2 Doe, Jane R1 Doe, Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
November 7, 2018 Filing 180 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence G. Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 179 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1025) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Misch, Michael) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (mg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 178 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s Renewed Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Cases(173 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 310 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 182 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 520 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 288 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 564 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 184 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 191 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 273 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 347 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 171 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 187 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 175 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 207 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 182 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 508 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 179 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 237 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 175 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 336 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 182 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 186 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 192 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 182 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 182 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 183 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 423 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 279 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 305 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 508 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 175 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 189 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 312 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 184 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 233 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 263 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 347 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 184 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 247 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 263 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 510 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 303 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 193 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 132 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 182 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 170 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 269 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 347 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 179 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 187 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 201 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 191 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 347 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 193 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 438 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 175 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 175 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 171 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 179 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 501 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 192 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 187 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 175 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 179 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 189 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 520 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 177 MOTION for order USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s Renewed Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Cases by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 176 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-981) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 175 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1036) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 174 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (mg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 173 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1008) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (mg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 172 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-851) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (mg).
November 5, 2018 Filing 171 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-842) as to Lawrence Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (mg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 170 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Whitehurst et al (Nichol, Brittany) in case number 1:18-cv-1059, document number 161 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 169 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Lemke et al (Nichol, Brittany) in case number 1:18-cv-1052, document number 163 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 168 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1039) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane B. Doe (Kreger, Kristen) in case number 1:18-cv-1039, document number 160 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 167 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (553 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (mg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 166 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (mg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 165 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-987) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (551 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (mg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-987) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (mg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 163 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Angela Stewart, Julia Epple, Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell as to John Geddert waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 162 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Angela Stewart, Julia Epple, Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell as to Twistars USA, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 (Ponish, Jaclyn)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (532), (533) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 144 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887)for extension of time by plaintiff Sarah Allen ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, Anthony) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 143 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) regarding extension of time by plaintiff Abby Champion ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, Anthony) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 142 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-981) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 141 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1036) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 30, 2018 Filing 145 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to USA Gymnastics filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document number 139 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting STIPULATION (527) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting STIPULATION (525) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 30, 2018 Filing 138 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-915) Extending Deadline for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants, John Geddert and Twistars USA, Inc d/b/a Gedderts' Twistars Gymnastics Club USA's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by plaintiff Jessica Brutlag ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 11/1/2018 (mg).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (522) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 30, 2018 Filing 136 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (mg).
October 30, 2018 Filing 135 RESPONSE TO MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel 454 re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019 filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (mg).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (518), (519), (520), (521) for leave to file over-length briefs in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 30, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019) of Richard A. Gaffin on behalf of interested parties The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (mg).
October 30, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John R. Oostema on behalf of defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John)
October 30, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of E. Thomas McCarthy on behalf of defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 133 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Resolving Objections to the Proposed Amended Confidentiality and Protective Order (Dkt. No. 366 and 407) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 29, 2018 Filing 132 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1024) Allowing Defendant John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendant John Geddert ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 29, 2018 Filing 131 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1025) Allowing Defendant Twistars to File an Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 29, 2018 Filing 130 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-987) Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 29, 2018 Filing 129 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-982) Allowing Defendant Twistars to File Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 29, 2018 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-886) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (516 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 29, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-886) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (514 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:19-cv-944) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (512 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION (re 1:18-cv-831) to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 122 ANSWER to affirmative defenses (re 1:18-cv-851) by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 121 ANSWER to affirmative defenses (re 1:18-cv-842) by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 26, 2018 Filing 120 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-886) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 119 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-758) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (499), (500), (501), (504) to file over-length briefs in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (457); signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 115 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars, John Geddert and Kathryn Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (495), (496) for leave to file over-length briefs; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 25, 2018 Filing 113 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-886) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Day, Devin) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 112 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1007) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 111 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-1018) Allowing Defendant Twistars to File Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 110 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:17-cv-640) Allowing Twistars to File Overlength Brief by defendant Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 118 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1002) as to Michigan State University and USA Gymnastics filed by The Estate of Megan Simon (O'Keefe, Patrick) in case number 1:18-cv-1002, document number 103 and 104 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (495), (496) for leave to file over-length briefs in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (451); granting STIPULATION (452) in case 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (441); granting STIPULATION (442) in case 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (451); granting STIPULATION (452) in case 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (439); granting STIPULATION (440) in case 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (439); granting STIPULATION (440) in case 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (432); granting STIPULATION (433) in case 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (369); granting STIPULATION (370) in case 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (354); granting STIPULATION (355) in case 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (219); granting STIPULATION (220) in case 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (269); granting STIPULATION (270) in case 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (267); granting STIPULATION (268) in case 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (243); granting STIPULATION (244) in case 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (278); granting STIPULATION (279) in case 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (112); granting STIPULATION (113) in case 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (234); granting STIPULATION (235) in case 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (241); granting STIPULATION (242) in case 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (236); granting STIPULATION (237) in case 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (178); granting STIPULATION (179) in case 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (210); granting STIPULATION (211) in case 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (194); granting STIPULATION (195) in case 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (200); granting STIPULATION (201) in case 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (204); granting STIPULATION (205) in case 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (194); granting STIPULATION (195) in case 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (132); granting STIPULATION (133) in case 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (122); granting STIPULATION (123) in case 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (111); granting STIPULATION (112) in case 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (117); granting STIPULATION (118) in case 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (117); granting STIPULATION (118) in case 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (123); granting STIPULATION (124) in case 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (168); granting STIPULATION (169) in case 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (124); granting STIPULATION (125) in case 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (164); granting STIPULATION (165) in case 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (101); granting STIPULATION (102) in case 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (118); granting STIPULATION (119) in case 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (138); granting STIPULATION (139) in case 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (112); granting STIPULATION (113) in case 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (116); granting STIPULATION (117) in case 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (118); granting STIPULATION (119) in case 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (102); granting STIPULATION (103) in case 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (102); granting STIPULATION (103) in case 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (110); granting STIPULATION (111) in case 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (111); granting STIPULATION (112) in case 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (114); granting STIPULATION (115) in case 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (109); granting STIPULATION (110) in case 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (111); granting STIPULATION (112) in case 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (118); granting STIPULATION (119) in case 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (108); granting STIPULATION (109) in case 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (113); granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (109); granting STIPULATION (110) in case 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (116); granting STIPULATION (117) in case 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (110); granting STIPULATION (111) in case 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (109); granting STIPULATION (110) in case 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (106); granting STIPULATION (107) in case 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (107); granting STIPULATION (108) in case 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (110); granting STIPULATION (111) in case 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (120); granting STIPULATION (121) in case 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (122); granting STIPULATION (123) in case 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (105); granting STIPULATION (106) in case 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104); granting STIPULATION (105) in case 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (103); granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (115); granting STIPULATION (116) in case 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (63); granting STIPULATION (64) in case 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT USAG'S MOTION (471) FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVER-LENGTH BRIEF AND ADDRESSING OTHER BRIEFING ISSUES in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC: Plaintiffs' counsel in lead case to file within 14 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 107 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-397) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 106 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:17-cv-256) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1008) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(493 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Member Case 1008 filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mg).
October 24, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1008) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (1:18-cv-999) as to Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Megan Marie LaDrigue (Rieffel, Jessica) in case number 1:18-cv-999, documents number 87, 88, 89 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting STIPULATION (478) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 91 CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT (re 1:18-cv-758) in Support of Request for Entry of Default 467 468 by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (476), (477) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 22, 2018 Filing 98 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019); as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 89 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 89 PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:18-cv-734) for Extension of time to Respond to Defendant Gedderts' Twistar Gymnastics Club USA's Motion to Dismiss by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 88 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-851) by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 22, 2018 Filing 87 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-842) by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (mg).
October 19, 2018 Filing 94 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1002); as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by The Estate of Megan Simon (O'Keefe, Patrick) in case number 1:18-cv-1002, document number 84 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 92 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses (re 1:18-cv-922) by USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-922, document number 145 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE TO JOINT MOTION for discovery (156 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 173 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 77 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 213 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 163 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 90 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief(38 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC) filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 84 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief(38 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC) Brief in Support of USAG Motion for Leave to File an Over-length Brief filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to file excess pages USAG Motion for leave to file an Over-length brief by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (463), (464) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER FINDING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BARRING CONTRIBUTION CLAIMS (393) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 18, 2018 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Request for Entry of Default by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle)
October 18, 2018 Filing 79 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 18-cv-758) as to Defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bass, Michelle) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (mg).
October 18, 2018 Filing 78 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-822) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mla)
October 17, 2018 Filing 77 CORRECTED AMENDED BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019(454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (mg).
October 17, 2018 Filing 76 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 17, 2018 Filing 75 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 17, 2018 Filing 74 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE to attorney Scott Robert Eldridge regarding recent filing ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 99 SUMMONS returned executed (1:18-cv-1022) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Jane Doe AC (Houbeck, David) in case number 1:18-cv-1022, document number 62 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 93 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-982); as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane AC Doe et al (Sposita, Rebecca) in case number 1:18-cv-982, document number 62 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 72 AMENDED BRIEF in support of MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019(454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019(454 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Filing 68 BRIEF by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees in Support of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel re 842, 851, 1008, and 1019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for order to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019 by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (mg).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss (445) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Twistars USA without prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting STIPULATION (443) dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant USAG with prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting STIPULATION (440) to withdraw and refile in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting STIPULATION (439) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting STIPULATION (438) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 60 STIPULATION of dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendants Twistars USA and John John Geddert by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 15, 2018 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to Gary Stollak filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document number 65 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 59 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint with affirmative defenses filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-915, document number 74 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 58 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal in Member Case Number 1:18-cv-01046 by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 57 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Nassar (re 18-cv-829) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1032) as to William D. Strampel filed by Jane R10 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-1032, document number 63 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 56 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing USA Gymnastics, Inc. to Withdraw Its Pending Omnibus Motion To Dismiss 223 and to Refile the Motion by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 55 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-886) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert a Two Week Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 54 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-866) Allowing Defendants Twistars and John Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(64 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 81 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 47 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 56 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 121 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 57 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 311 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 61 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 178 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 161 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 436 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 58 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 61 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 60 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 381 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 111 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 60 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 152 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 143 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 211 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 54 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 58 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 383 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 111 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 381 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 374 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 56 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 145 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 68 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 220 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 68 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 296 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 209 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 183 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 55 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 136 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 48 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 52 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 50 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 51 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 59 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 53 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 49 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 76 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 136 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 61 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 11, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-887) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 160 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1006) as to Lianna Hadden and Lou Anna Simon filed by Joseph Kuter (Lantzy, Robert) in case number 1:18-cv-1006, document number 42 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1032) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Jane R10 Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-1032, document number 43 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting (428) motion to withdraw as attorney in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting (427) motion to withdraw as attorney; in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting STIPULATION (424) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting STIPULATION (416) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting STIPULATION (415) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting STIPULATION (414) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting (401) motion for leave to seal document in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 18-cv-1046) by plaintiff Erika Davis; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hearing); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg). Modified text on 10/17/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 18-cv-1047) by plaintiff Julia Epple; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hearing); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg). Modified text on 10/17/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to Dismiss (re 18-cv-915) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ( 425 in 17-cv-29) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss (re 18-cv-915) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting STIPULATION (406) to file excess pages in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting STIPULATION (405) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION of dismissal (re 18-cv-1046) without prejudice as to Defendants Twistars and Geddert by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 161 SUMMONS returned executed (1:18-cv-1036) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Julie Hovinga (Damico, Jennifer) in case number 1:18-cv-1036, document number 34 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1029) as to Twistars USA, Inc, USA Gymnastics, Inc, and John Geddert filed by Larissa Boyce et al (Fraser, John) in case number 1:18-cv-1029, document numbers 29, 30, 31 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 31 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 32 (DISREGARD) MOTION to withdraw as attorney with Brief in Support by plaintiff Julia Epple (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hearing) (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (pjw). Modified text on 10/10/2018; will refile in 17-cv-29 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 31 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-915) Allowing Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 30 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-887) Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 9, 2018 Filing 29 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 18-cv-944) Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to file Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 8, 2018 Filing 159 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER (re 1:18-cv-887) to Plaintiffs' Amended Corrected Complaint filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-887, document number 88 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 8, 2018 Filing 96 SUMMONS returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1019); as to Michigan State University and Michigan State University Board of Trustees filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe (Schiller-Nichols, Wendy) in case number 1:18-cv-1019, document number 30 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 8, 2018 Filing 40 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Gedderts' Twistars Gymnastics Club USA's Motion to Dismiss by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe (Damico, Jennifer) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 158 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-981) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Ashley Hagaman (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-981, document number 57 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 155 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1036) as to Michigan State University and MSU Board of Trustees filed by Julie Hovinga (Damico, Jennifer) in case number 1:18-cv-1036, document number 27, 28 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document number 34 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-922) as to Lawrence G. Nassar filed by Janet RA Doe, John RA Doe (Cascarilla, Richard) in case number 1:18-cv-922, document number 87 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-842) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)(422 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-842) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 5, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-851) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant(420 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to dismiss (regarding 18-cv-851) for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting STIPULATION #4 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting STIPULATION (388) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (345) in case 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (335) in case 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (345) in case 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (333) in case 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (333) in case 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (326) in case 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (263) in case 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (248) in case 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (114) in case 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (163) in case 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (161) in case 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (137) in case 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (172) in case 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (128) in case 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (135) in case 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (130) in case 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (104) in case 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (88) in case 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (93) in case 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (96) in case 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (89) in case 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (31) in case 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (63) in case 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (63) in case 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC; granting STIPULATION (34) in case 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
October 5, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re Anonymous Owners of Unidentified gym employed by Treva Aolfs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Aolfs; Unidentified Physical Therapists; Meridian Township PD; Paul Rambo #9543; Sgt. Alan Spencer; A. Tobias #738; Officer Andrew McCready; Anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on day he treated Breanne Randall; Dectective Bart Crane; Chrissy Scaccia, case Officer; Christopner Thompson, dispatcher; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator; Anonymous counselor identified by Jane MBA Doe; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU; Anonymous gymnastics coach, address unknown in connection with Chelsea Markham (now deceased); Anonymous school counselor, connection with Lindsay Schuett; Anonymous track coach, connection with Christine Achenbach; Anonymous trainer No. 1 in connection with Tiffany Thomas Lopez; Anonymous Trainer #2 in connection with Tiffany Thomas-Lopez; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk; Lianna Hadden c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel; Dr. Brooke Lemmen; Anonymous trainer in connection with Jennfer Rood-Bedford; Gary Stollak; Federal Bureau of Investigation; Unknown number anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEP of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU General Counsel in 2014; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan; Deborah Van Horn, trainer at Karolyi Ranch; Anonymous individuals 1-5 at Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG; Peter Vidmar, former board chairman of USAG; Paul Parilla, USAG' former bord member; Ron Galimore, USAG's COO; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG; Anonymous trainer of Lindey Schuett; Anonymous high school counselor of Lindsey Schuett; Anonymous medical professional in connection with Jane A2 Doe; Any and all persons were were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and failed to apporpriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, indentified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect or report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, indentified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; The MSU trainer who received complaints from Christie Achenbach; MSU coach who received complaints from Christie Achenbach; MSU trainer of Jane A51 Doe; Trainer and/or MSU medical student present when Anna Ludes was alleged abused and failed to report it; Anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; MSU trainer of Plaintiff Jane 89Doe; Physical Therapist of Alexis Alvarado; Medical student present when Taylor Cole; Rebecca Cass; Other medical professionals in connection with Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe; Coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe; Physical Therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe; Medical resident in connection with Plaintiff Cherukuri; Medical intern in connection with Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe; Diane Christie; Dean of Osteopathic Medicine by defendants John Geddert and Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (mg).
October 4, 2018 Filing 157 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-831) as to Douglas Dietzel, John Geddert, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars, Inc., and USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by John Doe AA (MacKenzie, Donna) in case number 1:18-cv-831, document number 28 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 4, 2018 Filing 156 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-944) as to Douglas Dietzel, John Geddert, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars, Inc., and USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Jane Doe ME (MacKenzie, Donna) in case number 1:18-cv-944, document number 23 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 4, 2018 Filing 154 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1036) as to USA Gymnastics filed by Julie Hovinga (Damico, Jennifer) in case number 1:18-cv-1036, document number 21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS BY "SECOND WAVE" PLAINTIFFS TO PROPOSED AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 23 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert a Two Week Extension fo File Responsive Pleadings by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting (397) motion to seal document in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting STIPULATION (392) CLARIFYING ORDER (ECF No. 390) REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 10/26/2018 (krv)
October 3, 2018 Filing 153 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1045) as to Gary Stollak, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Jeffrey Kovan, Michigan State University, and MSU Board of Trustees filed by Jane MKG Doe (Pritchett, Jessica) in case number 1:18-cv-1045, document number 16, 17, 18, 19, 20 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 3, 2018 Filing 151 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-806) as to Kathie Klages, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Jeffrey R. Kovan, and USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Jane KJTM Doe (Pritchett, Jessica) in case number 1:18-cv-806, document number 21, 22, 23, 24 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 3, 2018 Filing 148 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1006) as to MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, and Gary Stollak filed by Joseph Kuter (Lantzy, Robert) in case number 1:18-cv-1006, document number 16 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 3, 2018 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1012) as to Michigan State University and Michigan State University Board of Trustees filed by Rachel Schultz, Megan Holley, Kelly L. Buchanan (Rosen, Mary) in case number 1:18-cv-1012, document numbers 22, 23 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 3, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re CORRECTED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF Nos. 396 and 400 (Unopposed, Joint)(143 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 25 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 127 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 276 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 174 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 23 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 358 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 339 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 358 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 346 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 346 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 148 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 176 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 141 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 185 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 401 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 261 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 348 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 28 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 CORRECTED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF Nos. 396 and 400 (Unopposed, Joint) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 CORRECTED PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT Settlement Agreement by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees re Sealed Document, (136 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 18 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 353 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 122 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 169 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 10 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 13 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 171 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 20 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 334 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 353 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 256 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 14 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 138 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 271 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 145 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 14 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 396 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 143 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 343 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 341 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 180 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC) (Attachments: #1 Corrected Sealed Document Part - 2, #2 Corrected Sealed Document Part - 3); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 Corrected EXHIBIT 1 - Correcting ECF Nos. 394-1 and 394-2 by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part - 2 of 3 Corrected Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Part - 3 of 3 Corrected Settlement Agreement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 150 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-968) as to Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports-Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, and USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Rachel Gunther Campbell (Lantzy, Robert) in case number 1:18-cv-968, document number 8 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 149 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (re 1:18-cv-1025) with affirmative defenses filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-1025, document number 9 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 147 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1006) as to Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Joseph Kuter (Lantzy, Robert) in case number 1:18-cv-1006, document number 8 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 146 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (re 1:18-cv-851) with affirmative defenses filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-851, document number 19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 25 USA Gymnastics, Inc.'s ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.) in case number 1:18-cv-842, document number 21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF No. 396 (Joint)(16 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 397 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 344 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 137 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 123 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 13 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 354 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 13 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 144 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 272 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 16 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 170 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 335 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 21 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 139 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 172 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 14 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 257 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 181 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 342 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 146 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ECF No. 396 (Joint) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT Settlement Agreement by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Part-2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for order Finding Good Faith Settlement and Barring Contributions Claims (Joint)(10 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 133 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 253 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 268 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 166 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 140 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 7 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 119 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 142 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 135 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 168 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Order, (10 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 393 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 133 in 1:18-cv-00452-GJQ-ESC, 253 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 331 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 268 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 166 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 140 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 9 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 7 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 15 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 340 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 17 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 338 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 12 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 119 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 142 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 135 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 168 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 177 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 350 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC) filed by Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part-1: Redacted Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part-2: Redacted Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Amy L. Van Gelder); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for order Finding Good Faith Settlement and Barring Contributions Claims (Joint) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Clarifying Order Regarding Voluntary Dismissals (ECF No. 390) by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Douglas Dietzel, John Geddert, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michgan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA, Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc., plaintiff Lauren Dowell (mg)
October 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Megan P. Norris on behalf of defendants Michgan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Norris, Megan)
October 1, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Mark Schwartz on behalf of defendants Michgan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Schwartz, Brian)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, kvt)
September 27, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew M. Gonyea on behalf of defendants Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk (Gonyea, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
September 26, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cameron R. Getto on behalf of defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. (Getto, Cameron)
September 26, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple, Angela Stewart in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4247355 (Merson, Jordan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendants Twistars and Geddert to File Overlength Brief by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. [Attorney Cameron R. Getto added to party John Geddert(pty:dft), Attorney Cameron R. Getto added to party Twistars USA, Inc.(pty:dft)] (Getto, Cameron)
September 24, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Maria Cesira Fracassa Dwyer on behalf of defendant William D. Strampel (Dwyer, Maria)
September 24, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of defendants Michgan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Eldridge, Scott)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of plaintiffs Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple (Merson, Jordan)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven F. Stapleton on behalf of defendant William D. Strampel (Stapleton, Steven)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of plaintiff Angela Stewart (Merson, Jordan)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marshall W. Grate on behalf of defendant William D. Strampel (Grate, Marshall)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jaclyn Monique Ponish on behalf of plaintiffs Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple (Ponish, Jaclyn)
September 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jaclyn Monique Ponish on behalf of plaintiff Angela Stewart (Ponish, Jaclyn)
September 14, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David J. Gass on behalf of defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Gass, David)
September 14, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Rebecca L. Strauss on behalf of defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Strauss, Rebecca)
September 13, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is cognate to 1:17-cv-29 and 1:17-cv-684 (jlb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hurbis, Steven)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Julia Epple, Angela Stewart, Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell and Lauren Dowell (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epple et al v. Michigan State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Michigan State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Gymnastics, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Strauss
Represented By: D. Andrew Portinga
Represented By: David J. Gass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathie Klages
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew M. Gonyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Lemmen, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Strampel, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destiny Teachnor-Hauk
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew M. Gonyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Dietzel, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Gerard Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Geddert
Represented By: Cameron R. Getto
Represented By: Grant David Kelter
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michgan State University
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Megan P. Norris
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R Kovan, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twistars USA, Inc. d/b/a Gedderts' Twistars USA Gymnastics Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E Stollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Strampel
Represented By: Marshall W. Grate
Represented By: Maria Cesira Fracassa Dwyer
Represented By: Steven F. Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Kovan
Represented By: Ashley Evaline Racette
Represented By: Daniel J. Ferris
Represented By: Fred K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Lemmen
Represented By: Ashley Evaline Racette
Represented By: Daniel J. Ferris
Represented By: Fred K. Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Stollak
Represented By: Peter D. Cronk, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Marie Nighswander
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Represented By: Scott Louis Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twistars USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron R. Getto
Represented By: Grant David Kelter
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Dietzel
Represented By: Patrick F. Hickey
Represented By: Andrew M. Gonyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University Board of Trustees
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Megan P. Norris
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University
Represented By: Patrick J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Megan P. Norris
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Albert L. Hogan, III
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jaclyn Monique Ponish
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Epple
Represented By: Steven C. Hurbis
Represented By: Jaclyn Monique Ponish
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Dowell
Represented By: Jaclyn Monique Ponish
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Dowell
Represented By: Jaclyn Monique Ponish
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Stewart
Represented By: Jaclyn Monique Ponish
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?