Chaney #770493 v. Breedlove et al
Plaintiff: Rakeem A. Chaney #770493
Defendant: Unknown Breedlove, Unknown Mc Elfresh, Unknown Donahue, Unknown Hudson and Unknown McElfresh
Case Number: 1:2018cv01065
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Rakeem A. Chaney #770493 (ns)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by November 13, 2018; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, lep)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 (DISREGARD) ORDER (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, lep) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (lep).
October 22, 2018 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $41.03, receipt number GR063075; amount paid to date $64.61 (mkc)
October 3, 2018 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $23.58, receipt number GR062847; amount paid to date $23.58 (mkc)
September 13, 2018 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Rakeem A. Chaney #770493 (ns)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $23.53 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 10/11/2018); signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ns)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Unknown Breedlove, Unknown Donahue, Unknown Hudson, Unknown Mc Elfresh filed by Rakeem A. Chaney #770493 (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney #770493 v. Breedlove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mc Elfresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McElfresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakeem A. Chaney #770493
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?