Foster v. Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC

Plaintiff: Leland Foster
Defendant: Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01118
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Ellen S Carmody
1 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting STIPULATION #7 ; Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice by defendant Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC (Wilhelm, Paul)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting STIPULATION #5 ; Defendant has until 11/15/2018 to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Additional Time to Respond to Complaint by defendant Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC (Wilhelm, Paul)
October 25, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul Anthony Wilhelm on behalf of defendant Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC (Wilhelm, Paul)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018 (Fatica, Valerie)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC (clw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
September 26, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Leland Foster in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4247388 (Fatica, Valerie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC filed by Leland Foster (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Fatica, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stritzinger-Babjack, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Foster
Represented By: Valerie J. Fatica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?