Perez v. Sturgis Public Schools et al

Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Defendant: Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education and Sturgis Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2018cv01134
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss by defendants Sturgis Public Schools, Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1. Due Process Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2. Opinion and Order re Richards v Sturgis, #4 Exhibit 3. Christine v Espanola Public Schools) (Mullins, Timothy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by plaintiff Maria Perez; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Cody, Mark) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (clw).
November 6, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of defendants Sturgis Public Schools, Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education (Chapie, Kenneth)
November 6, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of defendants Sturgis Public Schools, Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education (Mullins, Timothy)
October 12, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Caroline Elaine Jackson on behalf of plaintiff Maria Perez (Jackson, Caroline)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Sturgis Public Schools served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 (Cody, Mark)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 (Cody, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Sturgis Public Schools, Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education (clw)
October 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mitchell David Sickon on behalf of plaintiff Maria Perez (Sickon, Mitchell) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (jlg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cody, Mark)
October 2, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Maria Perez in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4253380 (Cody, Mark) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (jlg)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Maria Perez (Cody, Mark) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Sturgis Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturgis Public Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Timothy J. Mullins
Represented By: Kenneth B. Chapie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturgis Public Schools
Represented By: Timothy J. Mullins
Represented By: Kenneth B. Chapie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Perez
Represented By: Mitchell David Sickon
Represented By: Mark A. Cody
Represented By: Caroline Elaine Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?