Hutcheson v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al

Plaintiff: Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv01172
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in opposition to EMERGENCY MOTION for document access #10 Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction Ordering Defendants to Provide Records Improperly Withheld by Noon EST on 11/15/2018 filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Department of State response, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Customs and Border Protection response, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services response, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Service re: each agency's response) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #8 with affirmative defenses by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson re Order #16 (Asch, Marc)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER; Defendant response due by 12/5/2018; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, All Defendants (Asch, Marc)
November 10, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re EMERGENCY MOTION for document access #10 filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc)
November 10, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson re Brief in Support of a Motion, #11 , EMERGENCY MOTION for document access #10 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #12 (Asch, Marc)
November 10, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re EMERGENCY MOTION for document access #10 filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc)
November 10, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of EMERGENCY MOTION for document access #10 filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Asch, Marc)
November 10, 2018 Filing 10 EMERGENCY MOTION for document access by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson; (Asch, Marc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #6 (Asch, Marc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to amend/correct #4 summons by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson; (Asch, Marc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 (DISREGARD) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (mg).
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
October 16, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4265274 (Asch, Marc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of State filed by Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 10/17/2018 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutcheson v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Margaret Hutcheson
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?