Schild v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Dale Schild
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01181
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall, not later than 12/20/2018, move for an entry of default against Defendant or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (ems)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 19, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Dale Schild in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4267739 (Reyna, Nicholas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Dale Schild (Reyna, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schild v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Schild
Represented By: Nicholas Allan Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?