Frey v. GR Auto Gallery LLC

Plaintiff: Ben Alan Frey, Jr and Ben Alan Frey, Jr.
Defendant: GR Auto Gallery LLC and Dave Culver
Case Number: 1:2018cv01182
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GR Auto Gallery LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wheelz Sales & Leasing Inc., Corporate Parent Hoekstra Unlimited LLC for GR Auto Gallery LLC (Harrison, Allison)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Defendant GR Auto Gallery LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses, FIRST THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Dave Culver by GR Auto Gallery LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Harrison, Allison) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (mg).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving STIPULATION #8 ; deadline for defendant to file response to complaint extended to 12/10/2018; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by defendant GR Auto Gallery LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Harrison, Allison)
November 27, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allison L. Harrison on behalf of defendant GR Auto Gallery LLC (Harrison, Allison)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #6 Summons Returned Executed by plaintiff Ben Alan Frey, Jr (Lyngklip, Ian)
November 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; GR Auto Gallery LLC served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018 (Lyngklip, Ian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant GR Auto Gallery LLC (mg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Lyngklip, Ian)
October 23, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant GR Auto Gallery LLC (summons incomplete) (mg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Lyngklip, Ian)
October 19, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Ben Alan Frey, Jr in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4267903 (Lyngklip, Ian)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against GR Auto Gallery LLC filed by Ben Alan Frey, Jr (Lyngklip, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frey v. GR Auto Gallery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Alan Frey, Jr
Represented By: Ian B. Lyngklip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Alan Frey, Jr.
Represented By: Ian B. Lyngklip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GR Auto Gallery LLC
Represented By: Allison L. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?