Maioho v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James J. Maioho
Defendant: Hekhuis Motor Sports and Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01195
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to response to filed by James J. Maioho (ns)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to remand to the 78th District Court (as taken from #6 ) filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation (King, Stephen)
November 5, 2018 MOTION to remand to the 78th District Court (as taken from #6 ) by plaintiff James J. Maioho; (ns)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 named "Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Remand" by James J. Maioho (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ns)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction /compel arbitration with Memorandum in Support by defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation; (King, Stephen) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (ns).
October 29, 2018 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 sent via U.S. Mail to James J. Maioho (ns)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Acceptance Corporation (King, Stephen)
October 24, 2018 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #2 sent via U.S. Mail to James J. Maioho (ns)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
October 23, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4271164 (King, Stephen)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with state court documents from 78th District Court case number 18-36938-GC filed by Credit Acceptance Corporation (King, Stephen) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maioho v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Maioho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hekhuis Motor Sports
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Stephen W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?