United States of America v. Wesson
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mr. Michael J. Wesson and Michael J. Wesson
Case Number: 1:2018cv01228
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America as to Michael J. Wesson waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019 (Murnahan, Jennifer)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Michael J. Wesson (clw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff United States of America re complaint #1 and Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons and Waiver of the Service of Summons (Murnahan, Jennifer)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons in a Civil Action by plaintiff United States of America (Murnahan, Jennifer)
November 5, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Michael J. Wesson (none provided) (clw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael J. Wesson filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Murnahan, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Michael J. Wesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Wesson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer S. Murnahan
Represented By: Jennifer Smith Murnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?