Plough v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Justin Plough
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, Prosper Marketplace, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Capital One Bank USA, N.A., TD Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A. and Michigan State Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2018cv01233
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting STIPULATION #34 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 34 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Synchrony Bank to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Synchrony Bank (Taylor, Alan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michigan State Federal Credit Union (Chernich, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and reliance on jury demand by Michigan State Federal Credit Union (Chernich, Scott)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting STIPULATION #30 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 30 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for defendant to respond to complaint and resolving order to show cause by defendant Michigan State Federal Credit Union (Chernich, Scott) Modified text on 12/13/2018 (pjw).
December 12, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patricia J. Scott on behalf of defendant Michigan State Federal Credit Union (Scott, Patricia)
December 12, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott A. Chernich on behalf of defendant Michigan State Federal Credit Union (Chernich, Scott)
December 11, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Capital One Bank USA,, N.A. filed by plaintiff Justin Plough (Nitzkin, Gary)
December 10, 2018 (DISREGARD) Copy of Order to Show Cause #28 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Earl Pratt, Jr. #602402 (pjw) Modified text on 12/10/2018; entered incorrectly in this case (pjw)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall either request that default enter against Defendant Michigan State Federal Credit Union within 30 days of the date of this order or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case for lack of prosecution; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting STIPULATION #24 dismissing Defendant TD Bank, N.A., only with prejudice ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting STIPULATION #23 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Chase Bank USA, N.A. filed by plaintiff Justin Plough (Nitzkin, Gary)
December 4, 2018 Filing 24 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to dismiss defendant TD Bank, N.A. only with prejudice by defendant TD Bank, N.A. (Nafziger, Verlin) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (pjw).
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Synchrony Bank to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Synchrony Bank [Attorney Alan J. Taylor added to party Synchrony Bank(pty:dft)] (Taylor, Alan)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/17/2019 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 1/10/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting STIPULATION #20 dismissing Defendant Prosper Funding LLC only, with prejudice ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Prosper Funding, LLC by plaintiff Justin Plough (Nitzkin, Gary)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed; Synchrony Bank served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018 (Nitzkin, Gary)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed; Michigan State Federal Credit Union served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018 (Nitzkin, Gary)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting STIPULATION #12 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holding Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. (Gottlieb, Amy)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Bank of America, N.A. (Gottlieb, Amy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Hanson, Thomas)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting STIPULATION #10 for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One Bank USA, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank USA, N.A. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey Donald Pilgrim on behalf of defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to answer complaint by defendant TD Bank, N.A. (Nafziger, Verlin) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (pjw).
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Verlin R. Nafziger on behalf of defendant TD Bank, N.A. (Nafziger, Verlin)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC (Brady, Scott)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chase Bank USA, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co. for Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Weiss, Erika)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Coomplaint by defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. [Attorney Erika P. Weiss added to party Chase Bank USA, N.A.(pty:dft)] (Weiss, Erika)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (pjw)
November 5, 2018 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR063262; for filing fee (ns)
November 5, 2018 (DISREGARD) FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Trans Union, LLC in the amount of $400 (Brady, Scott) Modified text on 11/5/2018; CM-ECF processing error (ns).
November 2, 2018 (DISREGARD) FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Trans Union, LLC in the amount of $400 (Brady, Scott) Modified text on 11/5/2018; CM-ECF processing error (ns).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Trans Union, LLC re Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 (Brady, Scott)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Trans Union, LLC re Notice of Removal, #1 (Brady, Scott)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC (Brady, Scott)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 54B District Court case number 18-1063-GC filed by Trans Union, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint And Jury Demand To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit C - Trans Union LLC's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brady, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plough v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Alan J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Pilgrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Verlin R. Nafziger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Erika P. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Patricia J. Scott
Represented By: Scott A. Chernich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Plough
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?