Morgan v. Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Devon Anthony Morgan
Defendant: Barry S. Yakim, Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC and Aadvanced Asset Recovery and Transport Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2018cv01251
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Barry S. Yakim served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/14/2019 (Valentine, Anthony)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Aadvanced Asset Recovery and Transport Incorporated served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/14/2019 (Valentine, Anthony)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Zeigler Holding Company II, Inc. for Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC (Cardelli, Thomas)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendant Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and reliance on jury demand by Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC (Cardelli, Thomas) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (ems).
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Aadvanced Asset Recovery and Transport Incorporated, Barry S. Yakim, Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC (ems)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
November 7, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Devon Anthony Morgan in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4285526 (Valentine, Anthony)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Devon Anthony Morgan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, DFIS Dealer Warning, #2 Exhibit B, MI-SOS Consumer Warning, #3 Exhibit C, Excerpt Secretary of State Dealer Manual, #4 Exhibit D, Morgan/Zeigler Retail Installment Sales Contract, #5 Exhibit E, MI-SOS Form Rd-108 Application for Title, #6 Exhibit F, Odometer Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit G, Certificate of Title, #8 Exhibit H, Invoice from Aadvanced Asset Recovery & Transport to Zeigler, #9 Exhibit I, Certification of Repossession from Zeigler to MI-SOS, #10 Exhibit J, Zeigler web advertisement for 2012 Charger, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons) (Valentine, Anthony) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Anthony Morgan
Represented By: Anthony J. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry S. Yakim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeigler Kalamazoo, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Cardelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aadvanced Asset Recovery and Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?