Stawski v. Shermeta Law Group, PLLC
Plaintiff: Allison Stawski
Defendant: Shermeta Law Group, PLLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01256
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Allison Stawski (Reyna, Nicholas)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time to answer; terminating PROPOSED ORDER #7 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by plaintiff Allison Stawski (Reyna, Nicholas)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by plaintiff Allison Stawski; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reyna, Nicholas) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (ems).
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Shermeta Law Group, PLLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (ems)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 8, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Allison Stawski in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4286750 (Reyna, Nicholas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Shermeta Law Group, PLLC filed by Allison Stawski (Reyna, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stawski v. Shermeta Law Group, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shermeta Law Group, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Stawski
Represented By: Nicholas Allan Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?