Bryant v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Shahla Bryant
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mirash Dedvukaj, Michael Klinger, Kirstjen Nielsen, Department of Homeland Security and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv01285
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 motion to stay; government to move to lift stay no later than 2 weeks after funding restored; defendants' response to complaint due 28 days after stay is lifted; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 6, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO MOTION to stay Response Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations #6 filed by Shahla Bryant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Asch, Marc)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay Response Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations #6 filed by L. Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Department of Homeland Security, Michael Klinger, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Almassian, Carolyn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to stay Response Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by defendants L. Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Department of Homeland Security, Michael Klinger, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services; (Almassian, Carolyn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, All Defendants (Asch, Marc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants L. Francis Cissna, Mirash Dedvukaj, Department of Homeland Security, Michael Klinger, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ems)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
November 15, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ; none provided (ns)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
November 15, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Shahla Bryant in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4292310 (Asch, Marc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for relief under INA 336(b) against All Defendants filed by Shahla Bryant (Asch, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klinger
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahla Bryant
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?