Denhollander et al v. USA Gymnastics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: E.P., Melissa Vigogne, Stephanie Robinson, Jane A31 Doe, Chelsey Markham, A.B., Katherine Black, Jane A20 Doe, Lindsay Woolever, K.J., Jane A9 Doe, Jane A38 Doe, Amy Labadie, Ashley Erickson, M.P., Kara Johnson, Jane A53 Doe, Jane A33 Doe, Margaret Nichols, Jane A32 Doe, Jane A97 Doe, Amanda Barterian, Jane A10 Doe, Jane A100 Doe, L.B., A.S., Jane A66 Doe, Jane A55 Doe, Jane A52 Doe, Jane A50 Doe, Jane A7 Doe, Gwen Anderson, Jane A64 Doe, Hannah Morrow, Taryn Akemi Look, Jaime Doski, Jane A114 Doe, Jane A90 Doe, Jane A103 Doe, Jane A59 Doe, Brittney Schumann, Selena Brennan, Chandler Lynn, Olivia Cowan, Kathryn Middleton, Jane A104 Doe, Megan Halicek, Bethany Bauman, Jane A99 Doe, Alexis Moore, Jane A111 Doe, Samantha Ursch, Vanasia Bradley, Tiffany Dutton, Jane A98 Doe, Jane A96 Doe, Jane A21 Doe, Jenelle Moul, Jane A95 Doe, R.W., Alison Otten, Jessica Howard, Katelyn Skrabis, Jane A91 Doe, Jane A108 Doe, Kaylee Lorincz, Jane A116 Doe, Jane A71 Doe, Jane A107 Doe, Alexandra Romano, Jane A78 Doe, Jane A93 Doe, Megan Ginter, Jane A105 Doe, Jane A109 Doe, Chelsea Williams, Jane A115 Doe, Jane A112 Doe, Emily Goetz, Rachael Denhollander, Jane A65 Doe, Estate of Chelsey Markham, Kassie Powell, Jane 97 Doe, Jane A121 Doe, Steven A. Lee, Jane 105 Doe, Jane 95 Doe, Jane A120 Doe, Jane 91 Doe, Jane 93 Doe and Jane 90 Doe
Defendant: John Geddert, USA Gymnastics, Inc., United States Olympic Committee, Twistars USA, Inc. and Lawrence Gerard Nassar
Petitioner: Jane A94 Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01346
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 520 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Corrected Motion and Brief for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by plaintiff Hillary Rich ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 519 LETTER from attorney Rebecca Sposita for plaintiff Hillary Rich regarding Disregarding ECF No. 1295-2 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 518 CORRECTED MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 517 LETTER from attorney Rebecca Sposita for plaintiff Hillary Rich regarding Disregarding ECF No. 1291 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 516 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1289 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kreger, Kristen)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER AMENDING SECOND WAVE SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF No. 1152): Plaintiffs to file on or before 11/6/2019; MSU Defendants to file on or before 12/20/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 514 CORRECTED MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/22/2019; this entry replaces 1284 (mg).
October 22, 2019 Filing 513 LETTER from attorney Rebecca Sposita for plaintiff Hillary Rich regarding Disregarding ECF No. 1284. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 512 MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Jane B. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kreger, Kristen)
October 22, 2019 Filing 511 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Claims as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar(902 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 510 MINUTES of status conference and oral argument on Defendant MSU's motion to strike certain Plaintiffs' amended complaints; certain Plaintiffs' motions to amend held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 22, 2019 Filing 509 MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Claims as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 507 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/22/2019 (mg).
October 17, 2019 Filing 506 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of claims as to MSU Defendants(897 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
October 17, 2019 Filing 505 JOINT STATUS REPORT re JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints(1258 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 508 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Jeffrey R. Kovan waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed by Jane O. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:19-cv-579, document number 99 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 504 MOTION to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of claims as to MSU Defendants re [1:18-cv-1023] by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/21/2019 (mg).
October 15, 2019 Filing 502 RESPONSE TO AMENDED MOTION to amend/correct Complaint( 1262 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sportsmedicine, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Douglas Dietzel ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 10/22/2019 (mg).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting (1235) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting (1205) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 14, 2019 Filing 503 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Lawrence Gerard Nassar served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019 filed by Jane A. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:19-cv-579, document number 94 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 499 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re United States Olympic Committee without prejudice filed by plaintiff Jane MB45 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Marker, Caleb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 498 RESPONSE in opposition to JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints(1258 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) JOINT RESPONSE filed by A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ellis, Tiffany)
October 10, 2019 Filing 497 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University and The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University(1273 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Julie Hovinga; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 496 MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice of Claims (re 1:18-cv-1036) as to Defendants Michigan State University and The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University by plaintiff Julie Hovinga; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (mg).
October 10, 2019 Filing 495 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice as to Defendants Michigan State University and the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University(1271 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane M.P. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 494 MOTION to dismiss With Prejudice re 1:18-cv-734 as to Defendants Michigan State University and the Board of Trustees of Michigan State University by plaintiff Jane M.P. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Damico, Jennifer) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (mg).
October 8, 2019 Filing 493 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1268 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane R7 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 492 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R7 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1268 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
October 8, 2019 Filing 491 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-995) by plaintiff Jane R7 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (mg).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER RESCHEDULING 10/21/19 status conference to 10/22/19 at 10 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting (1199) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 488 SCHEDULING ORDER setting status conference and motion hearing: status conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:00 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; status report due by 10/17/2019; oral argument will be heard on 10/22/2019 at 10:00 AM on MSU Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints 1258 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
October 2, 2019 Filing 486 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1031) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Livingway, Elaine) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg). Modified text on 10/3/2019 (mg).
October 1, 2019 Filing 485 AMENDED MOTION to amend/correct Complaint (re 1:18-cv-982) by plaintiffs Dominique Corbin, Jane AC Doe, Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 487 RESPONSE in opposition titled as "MSU defendants' omnibus opposition to plaintiffs' motions for leave to file amended complaints" to MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint( 1226 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint( 1244 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint( 1221 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to amend/correct Complaint( 1246 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) (filed as entries #877 in 1:18-cv-831, #874 in 1:18-cv-982, #882 in 1:18-cv-913, and #887 in 1:18-cv-987) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Van Gelder, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 484 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints( 1258 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 483 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints 1258 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 482 CORRECTED EXHIBIT 1 Regarding motion for leave to file third amended complaint 1226 by plaintiffs Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hague, Melissa) Modified text on 10/2/2019 (mg).
September 30, 2019 Filing 481 JOINT MOTION to strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by defendants Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 480 JOINT STATUS REPORT in Response to Court Order issued on September 20, 2019 (ECF No. 1243) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting (1197) motion for order in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER granting (1191) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting (1190) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting (1186) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 26, 2019 Filing 475 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to William D. Strampel; waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed by Jane O. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:19-cv-579, document number 68 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 472 NOTICE of Withdrawal As Attorney (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiffs Kylie Chester, Jane C1 Doe, Jane C12 Doe, Jane C13 Doe, Jane C14 Doe, Jane C15 Doe, Jane C16 Doe, Jane C17 Doe, Jane C19 Doe, Jane C2 Doe, Jane C20 Doe, Jane C21 Doe, Jane C22 Doe, Jane C24 Doe, Jane C26 Doe, Jane C29 Doe, Jane C31 Doe, Jane C32 Doe, Jane C33 Doe, Jane C34 Doe, Jane C35 Doe, Jane C36 Doe, Jane C38 Doe, Jane C4 Doe, Jane C5 Doe, Jane C8 Doe, Lindsey Lemke, Amanda Smith ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (mg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 471 CORRECTED NOTICE of Withdrawal As Attorney (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 9/25/2019; this entry replaces 1247 (mg).
September 25, 2019 Filing 470 NOTICE of Withdrawal As Attorney by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 469 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint (re 1:18-cv-982) by plaintiffs Dominique Corbin, Jane AC Doe, Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 9/25/2019 (mg).
September 24, 2019 Filing 468 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint(1244 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Doe AA, Jane Doe BC, Jane Doe GK, Jane Doe JA, Jane Doe PJ, Jane Doe SM; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna)
September 24, 2019 Filing 467 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-831) by plaintiffs John Doe AA, Jane Doe BC, Jane Doe GK, Jane Doe JA, Jane Doe PJ, Jane Doe SM; (Attachments: #1 Attachment); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 9/24/2019 (mg).
September 23, 2019 Filing 474 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John N. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:18-cv-1258, document number 612 (this entry replaces 1214 in regards to 1:18-cv-1258 only) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 473 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe (Behm, Thomas) in case number 1:18-cv-1018, document number 865 (this entry replaces 1214 re 18-cv-1018 only) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT regarding mediation; Joint Status Report to be filed within 10 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 19, 2019 Filing 465 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe (Ellis, Tiffany) in case number 1:18-cv-1016, document number 871 this entry replaces 1238 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 462 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 1215 Certificate of Concurrence in Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jessica Brutlag, Sarah Face, Lisa Hutchins, Nathalie Trottier; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (mg).
September 18, 2019 Filing 459 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily 1235 Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (mg).
September 18, 2019 Filing 458 MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe (re 1:17-cv-254) ; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER regarding Motions For Leave To File 1208 , 1215 , 1225 and certificates of concurrence; the Motions are DENIED without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura Bernescu on behalf of defendants MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, MSU Sports-Medicine Clinic, MSU Sportsmedicine, ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bernescu, Laura) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 451 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint( 1226 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 450 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint 1226 filed by Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 449 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-987) by plaintiffs Jane T.J. Doe, Jane M.C. Doe, Jane L.B. Doe, Jane A.B. Doe, Jane Z.P. Doe, Jane E.C. Doe, Jane B.M. Doe, Jane I.B. Doe, Jane S.W. Doe, Jane D.Z. Doe, Jane M.M. Doe, Jane N.H. Doe, Jane A.D. Doe, Jane T.O. Doe, Jane S.B. Doe, Jane A.H. Doe, Jane K.O. Doe, Jane S.N. Doe, Jane M.D. Doe, Jane L.H. Doe, Jane E.H. Doe, John A.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Third Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Dougherty, Kimberly) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 448 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint (re 1:18-cv-982) by plaintiffs Dominique Corbin, Jane AC Doe, Hillary Rich; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 17, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: For future reference, amended complaints should be filed directly in member cases, all Motions in lead case 1:17-cv-29; counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 447 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint( 1221 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 841 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 1177 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 464 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kristin Nagle (Fraser, Joseph) in case number 1:18-cv-1057, document number 849 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 463 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jaclyn Bowe, Joseph Kuter (Vesprini, Dondi) in case number 1:18-cv-1006, document number 816 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 461 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by A.G. Doe, A.W. Doe (Ellis, Tiffany) in case number 1:18-cv-1016, document number 853 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 460 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Meaghan Williams (Fraser, Joseph) in case number 1:18-cv-1056, document number 846 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 456 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alyssa Zalenski (Fraser, Joseph) in case number 1:18-cv-1058, document number 850 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 455 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lauren Bancroft, Emily Jane Gwardzinski Justice, Rachel Gunther Campbell, Meghan Gunther (Vesprini, Dondi) in case number 1:18-cv-968, document number 818 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 454 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alexis Espinosa (Arndt, Stephanie) in case number 1:18-cv-828, document number 849 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 453 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe ME (MacKenzie, Donna) in case number 1:18-cv-944, document number 815 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 452 (DISREGARD) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane LAM Doe, Jane JJF Doe, Jane CAO Doe (Roumel, Nicholas) in case number 1:18-cv-829, document number 830 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg); duplicate entry of amended complaint filed as 1222 .
September 16, 2019 Filing 446 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1027) against Douglas Dietzel, John Geddert, Kathryn Geddert, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA, Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc. filed by Jane MB45 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Marker, Caleb) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 445 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-829) against Kathie Klages, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Nassar filed by Jane JJF Doe, Jane LAM Doe, Jane CAO Doe (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - OCR report, #3 Exhibit B - Ropes Gray report); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Roumel, Nicholas) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 444 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-913) with brief in support and certificate of service by plaintiff Jane Doe; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Second Amended Complaint & Jury Demand); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Salvatore, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 443 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1046) against All Defendants filed by Erika Davis; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 442 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:19-cv-440) against Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State Board of Trustees, Michigan State University, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Jane Doe 24, Jane Doe 25; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pitt, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 441 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:19-cv-178) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Jane Doe 22, Jane Doe 23; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pitt, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 440 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1038) against Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Steve Penny, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, USA Gymnastics, Inc., Debra Van Horn filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pitt, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 439 AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 1:18-cv-1047) against All Defendants filed by Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 438 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (re 1:18-cv-915) with certificate of service by plaintiffs Jessica Brutlag, Sarah Face, Lisa Hutchins, Nathalie Trottier; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 437 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1018 and 1:18-cv-1258) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA Inc., USA Gymnastics, Inc., Twistars USA, Inc. filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe, John N. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2019; this entry replaces 1210 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 436 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand(re 1:18-cv-1169) against All Defendants filed by Jane BR1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Jones, Jami) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 435 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:19-cv-579) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Twistars USA, Inc. filed by Jane O. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 434 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 1:18-cv-886) against Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar filed by Chloe Alysse Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Day, Devin) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 433 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (re 1:18-cv-1018 and 1:18-cv-1258) against Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk filed by Jane F. Doe, Jane L1. Doe, Jane E. Doe, Jane H. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane D. Doe, John N. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 432 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (re 1:18-cv-1025) against All Defendants filed by Jane A.A.K. Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Misch, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 431 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint(re 1:18-cv-831) with brief in support by plaintiffs John Doe AA, Jane Doe BC, Jane Doe GK, Jane Doe JA, Jane Doe PJ, Jane Doe SM; (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Second Amended Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (mg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 430 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane KRA Doe (Freid, Debra) in case number 1:18-cv-993, document number 822 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 429 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe RK (MacKenzie, Donna) in case number 1:18-cv-1042, document number 813 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 428 MOTION to dismiss Voluntarily re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Mathew Covey; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (mg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 427 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Jane Doe, (1:18-cv-984) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fairman, Melanie) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (mg).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting (1184) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting (1182) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting (1179) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting (1172) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 422 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-694) Defendants Michigan State University and Bd. of Trustees Michigan State University, only, by plaintiffs Jane C Doe (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Schwartz, Mark) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (mg).
August 27, 2019 Filing 421 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order granting Plaintiff Megan Holley's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants MSU, Board of Trustees of MSU, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Stra(1197 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Member case 18-cv-1012 filed by Megan Holley; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rosen, Mary)
August 27, 2019 Filing 420 MOTION for order (re 1:18-cv-1012) granting Plaintiff Megan Holley's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants MSU, Board of Trustees of MSU, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk Only by plaintiff Megan Holley; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Plaintiff Megan Holley's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal in 18-cv-1012); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rosen, Mary) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (mg).
August 26, 2019 Filing 419 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus)(60 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-ESC, 808 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 809 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 638 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 808 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 811 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 816 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 813 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 805 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 810 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 812 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 561 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Lianna Haden, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 418 MSU Defendants' EXHIBIT 5, Parts 1-5 to the Memorandum in Support of Joint Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Doc 1194) by defendants Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Brooke Lemmen, Lianna Haden, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 2, #2 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 3, #3 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 4, #4 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 5); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss, (808 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 11 in 1:19-cv-00579-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 638 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 808 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 811 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 813 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 810 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 60 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 822 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 800 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 809 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 814 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 1193 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 818 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 802 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 816 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 807 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 805 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 62 in 1:19-cv-00178-GJQ-ESC, 820 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 812 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 561 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 819 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 817 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC) (Omnibus) filed by Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Haden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Haden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Clinic, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathie Klages, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathy Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, William D. Strampel, Douglas Dietzel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, William D. Strampel, Brooke Lemmen, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State University, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, MSU Sports-Medicine Clinic, Brooke Lemmen, Kristine Moore, William D. Strampel, Lianna Haden, Lou Anna Simon, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sportsmedicine, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lou Anna Simon, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Douglas Dietzel, Lianna Hadden, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Gary Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Kathie Klages, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Jeffrey R. Kovan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pending Cases Against the MSU Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claims Asserted Against the MSU Defendants and Applicable Defenses (by Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 - Timeline of Key Events, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs with Deficient Notices, #5 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Who Failed to File Any Notice, #6 Exhibit 7 - Comparison of Allegations of Abuse, Actual Knowledge, Last Alleged Date of Tolling, and Filing of Notice, #7 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs Affirmatively Alleging Actual Knowledge of Claims, #8 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs Alleging Other Inappropriate Conduct by Nassar, #9 Exhibit 10 - Fraudulent Concealment Allegations, #10 Exhibit 11 - News Stories Related to Nassar and MSU (September 2016 January 2018), #11 Exhibit 12 - Implausible Allegations of Lack of Knowledge, #12 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiffs Alleging Title IX Standing, #13 Exhibit 14 - Plaintiffs Alleging Affordable Care Act Claims, #14 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiffs Alleging Trafficking Victims Protection Act Claims, #15 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiffs Alleging Elliott-Larsen Civil Rights Act Claims, #16 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiffs Alleging Assaults Exclusively at Non-MSU Locations, #17 Exhibit 18 - Plaintiffs Alleging That Parents/Guardians Were Present During Alleged Abuse, #18 Exhibit 19 - Plaintiffs Alleging Claims Barred by Statutes of Limitations, #19 Exhibit 20 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Douglas Dietzel, #20 Exhibit 21 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Lianna Hadden, #21 Exhibit 22 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Kathie Klages, #22 Exhibit 23 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Jeffrey Kovan, #23 Exhibit 24 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Brooke Lemmen, #24 Exhibit 25 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Kristine Moore, #25 Exhibit 26 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Lou Anna Simon, #26 Exhibit 27 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Gary Stollak, #27 Exhibit 28 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant William Strampel, #28 Exhibit 29 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Destiny Teachnor-Hauk); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 416 JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus) by defendants Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, Brooke Lemmen, Lianna Haden, Kristine Moore, Lou Anna Simon, MSU Sports Medicine Clinic, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Douglas Dietzel; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 415 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss ( 1191 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane J-1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kochenderfer, Adam) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (mg).
August 22, 2019 Filing 414 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-758) by plaintiff Jane J-1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kochenderfer, Adam) Modified on 8/23/2019 (mg).
August 22, 2019 Filing 413 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, William Strampel, Jeffrey Kovan, Douglas Dietzel, Gary Stollak, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk and Kathie Klages by plaintiff Jane J. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (mg).
August 14, 2019 Filing 412 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Tiffani Berra (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Service); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven)
August 13, 2019 Filing 411 NOTICE USAG's Written Notice re attorney Chad Antuma Pursuant to MRPC 1.10(b)(2) by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mg).
August 13, 2019 Filing 410 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims(1186 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 409 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) by plaintiff Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mg).
August 5, 2019 Filing 408 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Voluntary Dismissal MOTION to dismiss (1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 407 FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) by plaintiff Claire Brenton-Miller (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zoglio, David) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (mg).
August 2, 2019 Filing 406 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants(1182 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B57NF Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
August 2, 2019 Filing 405 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349, 1:18-cv-1029) by plaintiff Jane B57NF Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (mg).
July 30, 2019 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Kylie Dickman; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kylie Dickman re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 402 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1296) by plaintiff Kylie Dickman; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (mg).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting (1166) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting (1162) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting (1158) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting (1156) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting (1153) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1117 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 781 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane Doe MJ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios)
July 12, 2019 Filing 395 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-978) by plaintiff Jane Doe MJ; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (mg).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting (1149) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting (1148) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting (1141) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting (1139) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting (1134) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 389 MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe; (re 1:18-cv-1019) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg).
June 27, 2019 Filing 388 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-984) by plaintiff Jane Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fairman, Melanie) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 387 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to dismiss ( 1166 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane NLF -4 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (mg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to dismiss 1162 in 1:17-cv-29-GJQ-ESC filed by Jane NLF-2 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (mg).
June 26, 2019 Filing 385 FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-851) by plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (mg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 384 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1158 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Sara Peltier; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 383 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Sara Peltier re MOTION to dismiss (1158 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 382 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held 06/13/2019 before Judge Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 9/16/2019 ; redaction request due 7/8/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
June 17, 2019 Filing 381 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:19-cv-70) by plaintiff Sara Peltier; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 380 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al(14 in 1:19-cv-00440-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane BH Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca)
June 17, 2019 Filing 379 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-982) with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Jane BH Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 14, 2019 Filing 378 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1153 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 377 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1153 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 376 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiffs Jane R4 Doe, Jane R5 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 SECOND WAVE SCHEDULING ORDER: MSU Defendants to file motion by 8/26/2019; Plaintiffs to file response by 10/23/2019; MSU Defendants to file reply by 12/6/2019; MSU Defendants may file side briefs by 1/17/2020; Plaintiff may file responses by 2/28/2020; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 374 MINUTES of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 373 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al 1148 filed by Katelin Rehberger; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (mg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 372 MOTION for order reVoluntary Dismissal (re 1:18-cv-1018) , ( responses due 7/8/2019;) by plaintiff Jane B. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mg).
June 10, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 371 MOTION to dismiss re 1:18-cv-982 with Prejudice of Claims as to Defendants Michigan State University, et al by plaintiff Katelin Rehberger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Sposita, Rebecca) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (mg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 370 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re: 1:18-cv-806) 1144 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 369 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1045) 1143 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 368 JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 367 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pritchett, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 366 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Pritchett, Jessica)
May 30, 2019 Filing 365 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re CONSENT MOTION to dismiss (1141 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 364 CONSENT MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1008) by plaintiff Jane NLF-3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mg).
May 30, 2019 Filing 363 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss (1139 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane NLF-1 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 362 UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-842) by plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mg).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting (1131) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting (1129) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 359 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1134 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Ashley Hagaman; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 358 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ashley Hagaman re MOTION to dismiss (1134 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 357 MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Ashley Hagaman; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting (1112) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting (1105) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 22, 2019 Filing 354 MOTION to dismiss MSU and Board of Trustees (re 1:18-cv-779) by plaintiffs Jane D. Doe, Jane A. Doe, Jane C. Doe, Jane B. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing MSU and Board of Trustees); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lucas, Joseph) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (mg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 353 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1129 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane P.S. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 352 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1024) by plaintiff Jane P.S. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 351 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-999 1125 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 350 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Megan Marie LaDrigue re APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar(199 in 1:19-cv-00070-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 349 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Jane S.M. Doe (re 1:18-cv-1026) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 348 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-999) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of app for default, #2 Affidavit supp aff in support of app for default, #3 Proposed Document proposed default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mg).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re 1123 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/13/2019 at 11:00 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; joint status report due by 6/6/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting (1087) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting (1085) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting (1083) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting (1080) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting (1078) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting (1076) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting (1073) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting (1063) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
May 6, 2019 Filing 337 NOTICE from CCA regarding Petition for permission to appeal 963 , The unopposed motion for extension of time to file a response is GRANTED. The petition for permission to appeal is DENIED ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (mg).
May 2, 2019 Filing 336 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by all MSU defendants Regarding Effect of Bankruptcy Court Orders ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (mg).
April 26, 2019 Filing 335 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1014) by plaintiff Jane Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Little, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (mg).
April 25, 2019 Filing 334 NOTICE Notice of Order Entered by the United States Bankruptcy Court of the Southern District of Indiana by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER CANCELLING HEARING AND FOR STATUS REPORT: 5/1/2019 hearing is ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE; Counsel to file joint report within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 23, 2019 Filing 332 NOTICE Notice of Orders Entered by the US Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Indiana by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Portinga, D.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 331 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-743) filed by plaintiff Alaina Elizabeth Bamfield ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Banks, Darrell) Modified text on 4/23/2019 (mg).
April 22, 2019 Filing 330 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees Regarding Mediation and Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
April 22, 2019 Filing 329 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1105 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane K.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 328 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-732 as to MSU defendants) by plaintiff Jane K.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order ); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (mg).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS 1100 , 1101 , 1102 , 1103 in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (mg).
April 18, 2019 Filing 326 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1037)Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 325 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 324 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Filing 323 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (CORRECTED CAPTION) (re 1:18-cv-822) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS 1089 , 1090 , 1091 , 1092 , 1093 , 1094 , 1095 , 1096 , 1097 , 1098 staying deadline to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 321 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1022) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 320 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 319 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 318 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1123) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 317 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1:18-cv-1124) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 316 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 315 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (1;18-cv-1120) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 314 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 313 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 16, 2019 Filing 312 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016)Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committee's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Oostema, John) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Rachel K. Zabick re MOTION to dismiss (1087 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 310 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1133) by plaintiff Rachel K. Zabick; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 309 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R10 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1085 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 308 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1032) by plaintiff Jane R10 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 307 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R9 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1083 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 306 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv997) by plaintiff Jane R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 11, 2019 Filing 304 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R3 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1080 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 303 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiff Jane R3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mg).
April 11, 2019 Filing 302 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R2 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1078 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 301 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiff Jane R2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (mg).
April 10, 2019 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane R1 Doe re MOTION to dismiss (1076 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard)
April 10, 2019 Filing 299 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-822) by plaintiff Jane R1 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (mg).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1070), (1071), (1072) to stay deadline to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 8, 2019 Filing 297 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1073 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane RG Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grant, Paul)
April 8, 2019 Filing 296 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1007) by plaintiff Jane RG Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grant, Paul) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (mg).
April 8, 2019 Filing 295 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mg).
April 8, 2019 Filing 294 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mg).
April 8, 2019 Filing 293 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mg).
April 4, 2019 Filing 292 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Christine Hilliard Only (re 1:18-cv-1035) filed by plaintiff Christine Hilliard ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (mg).
April 3, 2019 Filing 291 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:19-cv-70 1066 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
April 3, 2019 Filing 290 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1063 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 289 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:19-cv-70) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 4/3/2019 (mg).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1064) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
April 1, 2019 Filing 287 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1038) Allowing defendant Stephen Penny an extension to file responsive pleadings by defendant Steve Penny (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Matthai, Edith) Modified text on 4/2/2019 (mg).
April 1, 2019 Filing 286 MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1018) by plaintiff Jane K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (mg).
March 28, 2019 Filing 285 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1011) filed by plaintiff Adanna Bustance Nelson ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Parsons, Grant) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (mg).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1059) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 26, 2019 Filing 283 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-173) filed by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (mg).
March 26, 2019 Filing 282 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1022) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1049), (1050), (1051), (1052), (1053), (1054), (1055), (1056) and (1057) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 25, 2019 Filing 280 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1124) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 279 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1123) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 278 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 277 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 276 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1120) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 275 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER re (1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 274 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 273 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 272 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 22, 2019 Filing 271 REPLY to response to motion 979 (Plaintiffs' omnibus response in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss); filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc., Kathryn Geddert (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Senate Bills 871-879, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Correspondence from Hon. Maura Corrigan to MI Legislature, #4 Exhibit EX C - Enacted Senate Bill 872, #5 Exhibit EX D- List of Plaintiffs who have sued Twistars/Geddert - Not Treated by Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (mg).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1046) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 269 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1037) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (mg).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting STIPULATION 1044 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; response time extended to 4/29/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified link on 3/19/2019 (jal).
March 18, 2019 Filing 267 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (mg).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting 1041 Plaintiff Jane R9 Doe's Motion to Remove Next Friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified link on 3/19/2019 (jal).
March 15, 2019 Filing 265 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John R9 Doe re 1041 re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend(1041 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 15, 2019 Filing 264 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friend (re 1:18-cv-997) by plaintiff John R9 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 13, 2019 Filing 263 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case (re 1:18-cv-1001) filed by plaintiff Samantha Schneider ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Spagnuolo, James) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mg).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1038) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 12, 2019 Filing 261 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1016) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (mg).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING MOTION (974) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER FOR JUDGE'S COPIES: Copies to be submitted within 7 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (1030), (1032), (1033) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS (910), (940) FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 256 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 255 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 254 MINUTES of motion hearing for approval of settlements for minor plaintiffs (910), (940), (974) held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 253 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (mg).
March 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Grant David Kelter on behalf of defendants Twistars USA Inc. and John Geddert ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kelter, Grant) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (mg).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1026) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1025) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Approval of Settlements held January 23, 2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/30/2019 ; redaction request due 3/22/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-3 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-1 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James R. Giddings on behalf of plaintiff Jane NLF-2 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Giddings, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 249 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) For Dismissal of Claims as to Defendants MSU, et al by plaintiffs Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 28, 2019 Filing 248 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887) For Dismissal of Claims as To Defendants MSU, et al by plaintiffs Sarah Allen, Jaclyn Charters, Suma Cherukuri, Jane S8 Doe, Jane S4 Doe, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S6 Doe, Jane S5 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S7 Doe, Jane S2 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting Second Motion (1017) To Extend Summons in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC: Defendant Van Horn's summons extended to 4/1/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 246 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1054) filed by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 245 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1013) For Dismissals of Claims Against MSU, et al by plaintiffs Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 244 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-887) For Dismissal of Claims Against MSU, et al by plaintiffs Sarah Allen, Jaclyn Charters, Suma Cherukuri, Jane S8 Doe, Jane S4 Doe, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S6 Doe, Jane S5 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S7 Doe, Jane S2 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 243 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #436 (re 1:18-cv-887) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)(436 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Sarah Allen, Jane S9 Doe, Jane S3 Doe, Jane S1 Doe, Jane S10 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 242 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re 1017 SECOND MOTION to Extend Summons filed by Jane Does 1-21; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (997),(998), (1001), (1002), (1003), (1004), (1006) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 240 SECOND MOTION to Extend Summons (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Notification); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting STIPULATION (1005) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 238 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 669 (re 1:17-cv-254) Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) filed by Amanda Thomashow et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 237 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss 729 (re 1:18-cv-1041) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Makayla Thrush et al; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 236 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONto Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1349 842 ) filed by Makayla Thrush ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 235 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1013 604 ) filed by Abby Champion, Jane S11 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Frazho, Antoinette) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 234 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) ( re 1:17-cv-29 667 , 1:18-cv-1055 738 , 1:18-cv-1346 833 ) filed by Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 233 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1047 689 ) Supplement to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response filed by Jane Doe, Brenda Dowell, Lauren Dowell, Julia Epple (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 232 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) (re 1:17-cv-29 667 , 1:18-cv-1059 694 , 1:18-cv-1352 848 ) filed by Victoria Carlson, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Nichol, Brittany) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 231 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:17-cv-257, 1:18-cv-1052, 1:18-cv-1348) filed by Lindsey Lemke et (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Affiliation with Twistars); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Nichol, Brittany) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 230 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1314 819 , 1:18-cv-01034 701 ) filed by Meaghan Ashcraft, Abigail Mealy, Amanda Mealy, Sydney Wais (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 229 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-01056) by plaintiff Meaghan Williams ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 228 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings (re 1:18-cv-01022) by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 227 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-01057) by plaintiff Kristin Nagle ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 226 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 1:18-cv-1060) by plaintiff Kelsey Morris ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 225 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal (re 18-cv-01058) by plaintiff Alyssa Zalenski ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, Joseph) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 224 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal of Counts XXXI and XXXIV (re 1:18-cv-1004) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 223 RESPONSE TO MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) (re 1:18-cv-640 608 , 1:18-cv-1018 615 , and 1:18-cv-1258 679 ) filed by Jane B. Doe, John A. Doe, Jane M1. Doe, John N. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw). Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Filing 222 PROPOSED ORDER regarding voluntary dismissal of all claims against Lawrence Nassar with prejudice (re 1:18-cv-01054) by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 221 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of Twistars and Geddert (re 1:18-cv-00944) by plaintiff Jane Doe ME ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 220 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of Twistars and Geddert (re 1:18-cv-00831) by plaintiff John Doe AA ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (MacKenzie, Donna) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (clw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 219 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTIONS to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (re 1:18-cv-1347 838 , 1:18-cv-222, 1:18-cv-288, 1:18-cv-349 755 ), 1:18-cv-491 708 , 1:18-cv-1029 757 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Larissa Boyce et al ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting STIPULATION (993) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 217 SEALED EXHIBIT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe re MOTION for settlement ( 974 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 982 dated 2/20/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 21, 2019 Filing 216 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS (984-991) extending time to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 20, 2019 Filing 214 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 213 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 212 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-822) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 211 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1124) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 210 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1123) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 209 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1122) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 208 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1121) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Filing 207 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER {re 1:18-cv-1120) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting STIPULATION 980 to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 976 motion for leave to file under seal in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 19, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE REGARDING HEARING ON MOTIONS 910 , 940 , 974 FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT: Motions shall be heard on 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Quist; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 203 PROPOSED ORDER regarding (re 1:18-cv-1054)Dismissal of all claims against Michigan State University, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey Kovan, Gary Stollak, William Strampel, and Destiny Teachnor-Hauk with prejuidice by plaintiff Amira Ali ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Margolis, Laurence) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 202 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) ( 667 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response in Opposition to Defendant Twistars USA, Inc.'s and Defendant John Geddert's Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule (12)(c) Motions to Dismiss (full list of applicable cases and Plaintiffs in Exhibit 1) filed by Rachael Denhollander et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting (972) motion to withdraw as attorney; in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 200 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT ( 976 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 199 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 198 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement ( 974 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 197 MOTION for settlement (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 196 SEALED DOCUMENT (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend (898 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 904 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (mg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 195 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019) by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting STIPULATION (969) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS OF ESTATE OF MEGAN SIMON AGAINST MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY WITH PREJUDICE (968) in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 192 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1034) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 14, 2019 Filing 191 PROPOSED ORDER regarding (1:18-cv-1002) Dismissal of all Claims Against Michigan State University with Prejudice by defendant Michigan State University ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting STIPULATION (966) TO STAY DEADLINE TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 189 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1038) Staying Defendant United States Olympic Committees Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (mg).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER DENYING THE NICHOLS LAW FIRM MOTION (942) TO STAY in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Disqualify Counsel held January 23, 2019 before Honorable Gordon Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/13/2019 ; redaction request due 3/5/2019 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
February 11, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Permission to Appeal re 938 with The Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe, interested parties The Nichols Law Firm (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, and 1:18-cv-1019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition to Appeal); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (mg).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT IRA ZALTZ'S MOTION (655) TO DISMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting STIPULATION (949) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting STIPULATION (948) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting STIPULATION (946) EXTENDING TIME TO FILE in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting STIPULATION (941) REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - MOTIONS TO DIMISS in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 180 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1031) 939 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 179 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1035) 936 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 178 REPLY to response to motion 655 in 1:17-cv-29 (273 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC) *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED* filed by Ira Zaltz ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Juip, Randall) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (mg).
February 6, 2019 Filing 177 THIRD NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re The anonymous owners of the unidentified gym that employed Treva Alofs; PA Shirley Sanders; Treva Alofs; Unidentified physical therapists, addresses unknown;Meridian Township Police Department; Paul Rambo, #9543, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Sgt. Alan Spencer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; A. Tobias #738, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Officer Andrew McCready, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; The anonymous medical student shadowing Nassar on the day he treated Breanne Randall; Detective Bart Crane, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Chrissy Scaccia, case officer, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Christopher Thompson, dispatcher, c/o Meridian Township Police Department; Dr. Julie Howenstine, forensic investigator, Michigan State Police Forensic Laboratory; Anonymous counselor, address unknown; Kristine Moore, c/o MSU; Anonymous gymnastics coach, address unknown; Anonymous school counselor; Anonymous track coach; Anonymous trainer no. 1, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer no. 2, c/o MSU; Destiny Teachnor-Hauk, c/o MSU; Lianna Hadden, c/o MSU; Dr. William Strampel, c/o MSU; Dr. Brooke Lemmen, c/o MSU; Anonymous trainer, c/o MSU; Gary Stollak, retired MSU psychologist; The Federal Bureau of Investigation; Unknown number of anonymous FBI agents and other employees; USOC, United States Olympic Committee; Scott Blackmun, CEO of USOC; Robert Noto, MSU general counsel; Dr. Jeffrey Kovan, c/o MSU; Deborah Van Horn; Anonymous individual nos. 1-5 at the Karolyi Ranch; Steve Penny, former CEO of USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; Peter Vidmar, USAGs former board chairman, c/o USA Gymnastics; Paul Parilla, USAGs former board member, c/o USA Gymnastics; Ron Galimore, USAGs COO, c/o USA Gymnastics; Unknown individuals 1-11 associated with USAG, c/o USA Gymnastics; The anonymous trainer of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; The anonymous high school counselor of Plaintiff, Lindsey Schuett; The anonymous medical professional, address unknown, who was present during at least one instance of alleged abuse committed on Jane A2 Doe in 2011; Any and all persons who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who were present for any instance of abuse and who failed to detect and report it to CPS and/or law enforcement; Any and all persons listed, identified or referred to in any pending federal or state claim against Nassar who received any report of abuse and who failed to appropriately follow up by reporting it to CPS and/or law enforcement; The MSU trainer, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach but failed to investigate, follow up or report them to superiors, CPS or law enforcement; The MSU coach, address unknown, who received complaints from Christie Achenbach but failed to investigate, follow up or report them to superiors, CPS or law enforcement; The MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A51 Doe; The trainer and or MSU medical student (address unknown) present when Plaintiff, Anna Ludes, was allegedly abused, but who failed to detect the abuse or report it; The anonymous college counselor of Jane A64 Doe; The MSU trainer of Plaintiff, Jane A89 Doe; The physical therapist of Plaintiff Alexis Alvarado; The medical student, address unknown, present when Plaintiff Taylor Cole was allegedly abused failed to detect the abuse or report it; Rebecca Cass; Catryina Brown; the other medical professionals present, addresses unknown, when Plaintiff Jane B42 Doe was allegedly abused failed to detect the abuse or report it; The coach of Plaintiff Jane C17 Doe, address unknown, was present for one or more instances of alleged abuse yet she failed to detect the abuse or report it; The physical therapist of Plaintiff Jane C25 Doe, address unknown, was present for one or more instances of alleged abuse yet she failed to detect the abuse or report it; The medical resident present at the time Plaintiff Cherukuri was allegedly abused by Nassar; The medical intern, address unknown, who was present when Plaintiff Jane S4 Doe, was allegedly abused; Diane Christie; The Dean of Osteopathic Medicine; Co-Defendant, USAGs, Notice of Non-Party Fault and Supplement are hereby incorporated by reference; The Notices of Non-Party Fault filed by any other co-Defendants; MSU and a number of Defendants associated with MSU have entered into a settlement; Alan Ashley, Chief of Sport Performance for the USOC; Larry Buendorf, USOCs Chief Security Officer, c/o USOC; Gary Warren, former director of the Women's Program and of the National Team Training Center for USAG, c/o USAG; Sarah Jantzi, coach for Twin City Twisters; Dr. Jay Binder, c/o USAG; Kathy Kelly, former Vice President of Womens Programs for USAG, c/o USAG; Fran Sepler, c/o USAG; Jay Abbott, Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Gregory Massa, Assistant Special Agent in Charge for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Michael Langeman, Supervisory Special Agent for the Federal Bureau of Investigation, c/o FBI; Scott Himsel, legal counsel to USAG, formerly of Faegre Baker Daniels; Daniel Connolly, legal counsel to USAG, Faegre Baker Daniels;Renee Jamison, c/o USAG; Helena Shah Trivedi, c/o MSU; Kelli Bert, c/o MSU; Athletic trainer, Tony Robles; Dr. Lionel Rosen, MSU Sports Medicine, c/o MSU; and David Jager, MSU Trainer, c/o MSU. by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. and Kathryn Geddert Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 176 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-732) 928 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 175 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT (re 1:17-cv-676) by plaintiff Jane F2 Doe (re 940 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Waun, Thomas) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-1347) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-1029) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 172 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 171 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:18-cv-491) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 169 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Conflict Wall to Tribunal (re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-cv-288, 1:17-cv-349) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 167 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay 942 February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 166 BRIEF in support of MOTION to stay 942 February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel 938 ) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court of Claims Transcript of Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 165 MOTION to stay (re 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019) February 1, 2019 Opinion and Order Granting MSU Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Opposing Counsel 938 by interested party The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 164 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1349) Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defs Twistars Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Makayla Thrush ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 163 MOTION for settlement (re 1:17-cv-676) by plaintiff Jane F2 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order Prop Order App Stlmnt); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Waun, Thomas) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 162 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1031) as to Lawrence Nassar, D.O. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Livingway, Elaine) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (mg).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting (454) motion to disqualify opposing counsel in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC affecting member case nos. 1:18-cv-842, 1:18-cv-851, 1:18-cv-1008, 1:18-cv-1019; granting motion for leave to supplement the record (919)in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; and granting Nichols's request for immediate appeal ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, pgh)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 926 Plaintiff Jane K.K. Doe's Motion to Remove Next Friends in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Filing 159 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default of Defendnt Lawrence Gerard Nassar); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Lee, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 158 Motion for Leave to file Supplement Record EXHIBIT B by plaintiffs Jane NLF -4 Doe, Jane NLF-2 Doe, Jane NLF-1 Doe, Jane NLF-3 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting STIPULATION 923 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/8/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting STIPULATION 918 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting STIPULATION 914 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting STIPULATION 913 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting STIPULATION 912 Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; responsive pleading due 3/4/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting STIPULATION 921 to Extend Stay of Litigation Proceedings Against MSU Defendants Pending Mediation in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 29, 2019 Filing 151 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends(541 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 530 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-ESC, 552 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 699 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 623 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 670 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 536 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 539 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 926 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 869 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 554 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 548 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 292 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 882 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 593 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 598 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 151 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 545 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 707 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 555 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 607 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 549 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 544 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 550 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 152 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-ESC, 696 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 532 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 648 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 783 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 540 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 862 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 799 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 871 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 536 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 624 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 881 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 293 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 710 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 493 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 708 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 534 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 869 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 567 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 546 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 535 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 639 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 633 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-ESC, 542 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 533 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 672 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 548 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 551 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 150 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 371 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 665 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 545 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 629 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 149 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-ESC, 541 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 707 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet M.K. Doe, John K.K. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 149 MOTION for order to Remove Next Friends by plaintiffs Janet M.K. Doe, John K.K. Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cook, Jackie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 148 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss oral argument requested (655 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane RG Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (mla)
January 28, 2019 Filing 147 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) re 18-cv-842, 18-cv-851, 18-cv-1008, and 18-cv-1019 filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Eldridge, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 146 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 144 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Stay of Litigation Proceedings Against MSU Defendants Pending Mediation by defendants Michigan State University Sports Medicine Clinic, Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Van Gelder, Amy)
January 25, 2019 Filing 143 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record(919 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 142 MOTION for leave to file Supplement Record by interested party The Nichols Law Firm, PLLC; (Attachments: #1 Index Of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - December 21, 2018 report from the independent special counsel, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lisa DeStefano, DO); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gaffin, Richard)
January 25, 2019 Filing 141 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE Withdrawal of Attorney by plaintiffs Larissa Boyce et al (1:17-cv-222), Jane B24 Doe et al (1:17-cv-349), Jane B20 Doe et al (1:17-cv-288) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Brown, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 25, 2019 Filing 139 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Great Lakes Gymnastics, Inc (re 1:18-cv-1019) 894 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 138 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1296) 909 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 137 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 136 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1049) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 135 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1029) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 134 SEALED DOCUMENT Confidential Exhibit 1 (re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Katherine Payne re MOTION for settlement Approval 910 ; filed under seal pursuant to order 907 dated 1/23/19 Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal (529 in member case 18-cv-1044) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 133 MOTION for settlement Approval (re 1:18-cv-1044) by plaintiff Katherine Payne; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Approve Settlement, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Approve Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 132 APPLICATION for entry of default as to (re 1:18-cv-1296) Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bender, Gary) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 24, 2019 Filing 131 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-999) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of app for default, #2 Proposed Document Default); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Rieffel, Jessica) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 824 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 879 Plaintiff's Motion to File Settlement Details Under Seal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting STIPULATION 893 Dismissing John Geddert as a Defendant (terming 675 Motion To Dismiss by Defendant John Geddert); signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 898 motion to appoint next friend; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting motions for settlement 827 , 860 , 862 , 871 , 885 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (jal).
January 23, 2019 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend ( 898 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 124 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend 898 (re 1:18-cv-173) filed by Janet Doe, John Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION to appoint next friend (re 1:18-cv-173) by plaintiffs Janet Doe, John Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Corey, Louis) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting STIPULATION 890 Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 889 Stipulated Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jal) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT in support of Request for Entry of Default 894 re 1:18-cv-1019) filed by plaintiff Jane NLF -4 Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 119 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1019) as to Great Lakes Gymnastics ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Heos, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 23, 2019 Filing 118 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissing John Geddert as a Defendant (re 1:18-cv-1024) by plaintiff Jane P.S. Doe ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Gordon, Deborah) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 22, 2019 Filing 116 CORRECTED MOTION for order (Second Corrected) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
January 22, 2019 Filing 115 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiffs Victoria Carlson, Jane H2 Doe, Jane H3 Doe, Nicole Hameister, Jennifer Millington Bott, Rebecca Whitehurst ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 22, 2019 Filing 114 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiffs Kylie Chester, Jane C1 Doe, Jane C12 Doe, Jane C13 Doe, Jane C14 Doe, Jane C15 Doe, Jane C16 Doe, Jane C17 Doe, Jane C19 Doe, Jane C2 Doe, Jane C20 Doe, Jane C21 Doe, Jane C22 Doe, Jane C24 Doe, Jane C26 Doe, Jane C29 Doe, Jane C31 Doe, Jane C32 Doe, Jane C33 Doe, Jane C34 Doe, Jane C35 Doe, Jane C36 Doe, Jane C38 Doe, Jane C4 Doe, Jane C5 Doe, Jane C8 Doe, Lindsey Lemke, Amanda Smith ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (mg).
January 21, 2019 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 112 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT by plaintiff Leslie Miller re MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (104 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 111 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement approval(110 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 21, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION for settlement approval by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting STIPULATION (881) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting STIPULATION (878) re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 107 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18cv-1059) 832 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 106 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 105 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (104 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 103 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiffs Meaghan Ashcraft, Abigail Mealy, Amanda Mealy, Sydney Wais ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Esser, Lisa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 102 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jane C38 Doe by plaintiff Jane C38 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe ( 813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 873 dated 1/17/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 101 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jane H3 Doe by plaintiff Jane H3 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe ( 811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 872 dated 1/17/19 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 100 PROPOSED PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiff Larissa Boyce re CORRECTED MOTION for settlement 871 (Approval of Settlement for Minors) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 99 CORRECTED BRIEF in support of CORRECTED MOTION for settlement 871 (Approval of Settlement for Minors) filed by Larissa Boyce (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 813 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 811 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 17, 2019 Filing 96 CORRECTED MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors) by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir)
January 16, 2019 Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed (re 1:18-cv-1122) as to United States Olympic Committee filed by Jane Doe 03 (Corey, Louis) in case number 1:18-cv-1122, document number 469 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe( 811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane H3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe( 813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) Certificate of Concurrence filed by Jane C38 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting STIPULATION 864 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement( 862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 91 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe re MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement(862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting STIPULATION 858 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 89 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1347) Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars/Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Larissa Boyce ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Fraser, John) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 88 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement Motion to Approve Settlement( 862 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane D6 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for settlement (re 1:17-cv-254) Motion to Approve Settlement by plaintiff Jane D6 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Graves, James) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 86 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors)( 860 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Larissa Boyce (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for settlement (Approval of Settlement for Minors)(re 1:17-cv-222, 1:17-288, 1:17-cv-349) by plaintiff Larissa Boyce; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (ECF No. 827): hearing set 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 83 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1345) Regarding briefing schedule for defendants Twistars/Gedderts motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Katherine Payne ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Hurbis, Steven) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting STIPULATION 856 re briefing schedule in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 81 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1346) regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants Twistars, USA Inc. and John Geddert's Motions to Dismiss by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (803) to voluntarily dismiss all defendants with prejudice in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion (802) to voluntarily dismiss all defendants in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jane NC Doe re MOTION for leave to file / Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice(802 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION for leave to file / Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice(803 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) / Motions are unopposed. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 835 motion to appoint next friend in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting (771) motion to extend time to serve summons in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 75 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending summons (re 1:18-cv-1038) by plaintiff Jane Does 1-21 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Bonanni, Megan) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1352(848 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1352) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [Corrected] - MEMBER CASE 1351(846 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1351) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #7 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case)(Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1350(844 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1350) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case)(Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1349(842 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1349) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1348(840 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1348) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) [Corrected] - MEMBER CASE 1347(285 in 1:18-cv-01169-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-01004-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-00998-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00984-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-00987-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01006-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01026-GJQ-ESC, 794 in 1:17-cv-00254-GJQ-ESC, 462 in 1:18-cv-01038-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-01001-GJQ-ESC, 712 in 1:17-cv-00676-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01024-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-01027-GJQ-ESC, 464 in 1:18-cv-01056-GJQ-ESC, 612 in 1:18-cv-00256-GJQ-ESC, 537 in 1:18-cv-00732-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01348-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-00828-GJQ-ESC, 466 in 1:18-cv-01047-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-00993-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01122-GJQ-ESC, 512 in 1:18-cv-00887-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-00999-GJQ-ESC, 538 in 1:18-cv-00779-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-01035-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01121-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01036-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01350-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-01031-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00433-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01014-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-01041-GJQ-ESC, 466 in 1:18-cv-01060-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00997-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01028-GJQ-ESC, 579 in 1:18-cv-00494-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01013-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01005-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-01058-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-00886-GJQ-ESC, 457 in 1:18-cv-00829-GJQ-ESC, 795 in 1:17-cv-00222-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01029-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01042-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00913-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01124-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00188-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01123-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00995-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-00968-GJQ-ESC, 444 in 1:18-cv-00965-GJQ-ESC, 407 in 1:18-cv-01133-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-01034-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01023-GJQ-ESC, 468 in 1:18-cv-00915-GJQ-ESC, 521 in 1:18-cv-00640-GJQ-ESC, 206 in 1:18-cv-01296-GJQ-ESC, 207 in 1:18-cv-01258-GJQ-ESC, 547 in 1:18-cv-00758-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-00842-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01120-GJQ-ESC, 622 in 1:18-cv-00397-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01025-GJQ-ESC, 553 in 1:18-cv-00694-GJQ-ESC, 458 in 1:18-cv-01007-GJQ-ESC, 460 in 1:18-cv-01018-GJQ-ESC, 469 in 1:18-cv-01016-GJQ-ESC, 838 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01346-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01045-GJQ-ESC, 446 in 1:18-cv-01039-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01059-GJQ-ESC, 543 in 1:18-cv-00734-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01314-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01012-GJQ-ESC, 775 in 1:17-cv-00349-GJQ-ESC, 66 in 1:18-cv-01347-GJQ-ESC, 782 in 1:17-cv-00257-GJQ-ESC, 584 in 1:18-cv-00491-GJQ-ESC, 459 in 1:18-cv-00851-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-00773-GJQ-ESC, 697 in 1:17-cv-00684-GJQ-ESC, 562 in 1:18-cv-00172-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01010-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00806-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00173-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01002-GJQ-ESC, 782 in 1:17-cv-00288-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01022-GJQ-ESC, 586 in 1:18-cv-00385-GJQ-ESC, 456 in 1:18-cv-01032-GJQ-ESC, 481 in 1:18-cv-00981-GJQ-ESC, 507 in 1:18-cv-00922-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01349-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-00743-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-00944-GJQ-ESC, 610 in 1:18-cv-00377-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-00971-GJQ-ESC, 621 in 1:18-cv-00174-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-01044-GJQ-ESC, 63 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01052-GJQ-ESC, 450 in 1:18-cv-01049-GJQ-ESC, 65 in 1:18-cv-01351-GJQ-ESC, 448 in 1:18-cv-01037-GJQ-ESC, 785 in 1:17-cv-00244-GJQ-ESC, 453 in 1:18-cv-01011-GJQ-ESC, 454 in 1:18-cv-01054-GJQ-ESC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01345-GJQ-ESC, 467 in 1:18-cv-01057-GJQ-ESC, 476 in 1:18-cv-00822-GJQ-ESC, 447 in 1:18-cv-01051-GJQ-ESC, 451 in 1:18-cv-01055-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-01008-GJQ-ESC, 455 in 1:18-cv-00831-GJQ-ESC, 465 in 1:18-cv-01046-GJQ-ESC, 449 in 1:18-cv-01019-GJQ-ESC, 452 in 1:18-cv-00982-GJQ-ESC, 461 in 1:18-cv-00978-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1347) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #7 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint next friend (60 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)(5 in 1:18-cv-01352-GJQ-ESC) filed by Leslie Miller; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 61 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend 835 (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) filed by Leslie Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit , #2 Exhibit 2- Proposed Order; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to appoint next friend (re 1:18-cv-256 and 1:18-cv-1049) by plaintiff Leslie Miller; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Abood, Andrew) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 15, 2019 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1346(833 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 15, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1346) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 57 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1059) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Blake Lertzman); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 56 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander re MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC), MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count of brief in support of MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 53 BRIEF in support of MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs(827 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for settlement Approval Regarding Minor Plaintiffs by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 50 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements(824 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Rachael Denhollander (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT regarding Approval of Minor Plaintiffs' Settlements by plaintiff Rachael Denhollander; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Drew, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuat to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1345(822 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1345) Pursuat to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #5 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 1314(819 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 45 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1052) 807 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-1314) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - by defendants John Geddert, Twistars, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #6 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 43 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence G. Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1007) 806 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 42 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Nassar (re 1:18-cv-993) 804 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 41 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of C24 Doe (re 1:18-cv-257) by plaintiff Jane C24 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend (318 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 323 dated 8/6/18 (re ( 318 , 319 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of C19 Doe (re 1:18-cv-257) by plaintiff Jane C19 Doe re MOTION to appoint next friend ( 318 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; filed under seal pursuant to order 323 dated 8/6/18 (re ( 318 , 319 ) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 39 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe for Jane C37 Doe ( 813 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane C38 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to appoint next friend Jane C38 Doe for Jane C37 Doe (re 1:18-cv-1052) by plaintiff Jane C38 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Appoint Next Friend); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe for John Doe( 811 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane H3 Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to appoint next friend Jane H3 Doe for John Doe (re 1:18-cv-1059) by plaintiff Jane H3 Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Appoint Next Friend); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting STIPULATION (805) extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) - MEMBER CASE 734(808 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Twistars USA, Inc.; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Getto, Cameron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for order to Dismiss (re 1:18-cv-734) Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendant Twistars USA, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statute); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (previously filed as entry #79 in member case- attorney instructed to refile in lead case) (Getto, Cameron) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 13, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1052) as to Defendant Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Blake Lertzman); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Mast, Megan) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1007) as to Lawrence Gerard Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Ferri, Matthew) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1041) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-993) as to Lawrence Nassar, DO (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default) filed by Jane KRA Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Freid, Debra) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-971) by plaintiff Jane Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss all Defendants with Prejudice (re 1:18-cv-1028) by plaintiff Jane NC Doe; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zellner, Kathleen) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (mg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1047) 792 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1046) 791 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting STIPULATIONS 795 , 796 , 797 extending time to file in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (mg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-978) 794 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1059) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1052) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (re 1:18-cv-1055) Allowing Defendant United States Olympic Committee an Extension to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant United States Olympic Committee ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (McCarthy, E.) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-978) as to Lawrence G. Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Kiousis, Efstathios) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 (DISREGARD) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2019; duplicate entry of 792 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1047) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (mg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for entry of default (re 1:18-cv-1046) as to Lawrence Nassar (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Merson, Jordan) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (mg).
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1058) 775 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1057) 773 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Lawrence Gerard Nassar (re 1:18-cv-1056) 774 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in support 775 (re 1:18-cv-1058) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Alyssa Zalenski ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in support 774 (re 1:18-cv-1056) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Meaghan Williams ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in support 773 (re 1:18-cv-1057) Application for Default as to Nassar filed by plaintiff Kristin Nagle ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Darling, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (mg).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting STIPULATION #8 to consolidate cases; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Consolidate by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. (Getto, Cameron)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING REMOVED MEMBER CASES: Motions to Consolidate to be filed within 10 days; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) #5 filed by John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. (Getto, Cameron)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc.; (Getto, Cameron)
December 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cameron R. Getto on behalf of defendants John Geddert, Twistars USA, Inc. (Getto, Cameron)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ems)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-1055 (jlb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to USA Gymnastics, Inc. by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Portinga, D.)
December 5, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant USA Gymnastics, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4308275 (Portinga, D.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ingham County Circuit Court case number 18-611-NO filed by USA Gymnastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Portinga, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denhollander et al v. USA Gymnastics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Vigogne
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Robinson
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A31 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsey Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Black
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A20 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Woolever
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.J.
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A9 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A38 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Labadie
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Erickson
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Johnson
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A53 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A33 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Nichols
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A32 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A97 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Barterian
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A10 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A100 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B.
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A66 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A55 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A52 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A50 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A7 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Anderson
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A64 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Morrow
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taryn Akemi Look
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Doski
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A114 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A90 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A103 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A59 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Schumann
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Brennan
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandler Lynn
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Cowan
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Middleton
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A104 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Halicek
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Bauman
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A99 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Moore
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A111 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Ursch
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanasia Bradley
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Dutton
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A98 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A96 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A21 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenelle Moul
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A95 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.W.
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Otten
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Howard
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Skrabis
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A91 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A108 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylee Lorincz
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A116 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A71 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A107 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Romano
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A78 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A93 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Ginter
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A105 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A109 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Williams
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A115 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A112 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Goetz
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Denhollander
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A65 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Chelsey Markham
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassie Powell
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 97 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A121 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 105 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 95 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane A120 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 91 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 93 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane 90 Doe
Represented By: Stephen R. Drew
Represented By: John C. Manly
Represented By: Adam Christopher Sturdivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Geddert
Represented By: Cameron R. Getto
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Represented By: Grant David Kelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Gymnastics, Inc.
Represented By: D. Andrew Portinga
Represented By: David J. Gass
Represented By: Rebecca L. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Olympic Committee
Represented By: John R. Oostema
Represented By: E. Thomas McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twistars USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron R. Getto
Represented By: Lauren M. Wawrzyniak
Represented By: Grant David Kelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Gerard Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jane A94 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?