Produce Pay, Inc. v. Spiech Farms, LLC
Interested Party: Gladstone Land Corporation, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Spiech Farms, LLC, Daniel M. LaVille, Donio Farms, CHS Inc., Chemical Bank, Farmland Partners Inc., Honor Credit Union, Office of the United States Trustee, Farm Credit Services of America, PCA, State of Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency and Michigan Department of Agriculture and Rural Development
Appellee: Spiech Farms, LLC
Appellant: Produce Pay, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01366
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF REQUIREMENT NOTICE: appellant brief due by 2/15/2019, appellee brief due within 30 days after service of the brief of the appellant (ems)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL and RECORD ON APPEAL from Clerk, Bankruptcy Court, Western District of Michigan re Bankruptcy Appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal, #2 Items 1 - 16, #3 Item 17, #4 Item 17 Con't, #5 Item 18, #6 Item 19, #7 Item 20, #8 Item 20 Con't, #9 Items 21 - 35, #10 Item 36, #11 Item 36 Con't, #12 Item 36 Con't, #13 Item 36 Con't, #14 Item 36 Con't, #15 Item 36 Con't, #16 Item 36 Con't, #17 Item 36 Con't, #18 Item 36 Con't, #19 Item 36 Con't, #20 Item 36 Con't, #21 Item 36 Con't, #22 Items 37 - 38, #23 Item 38 Con't, #24 Item 39, #25 Items 40 - 43, #26 Item 44, #27 Item 45, #28 Items 46 - 55, #29 Items 56 -61, #30 Items 62 - 81, #31 Items 82 - 89, #32 Item 90, #33 Item 90 Con't, #34 Item 90 Con't, #35 Items 91 - 104, #36 Item 105, #37 Item 105 Con't, #38 Items 106 - 132, #39 Items 133 - 145, #40 Items A & B) (U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk, lmj)
December 27, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Elisabeth M. Von Eitzen on behalf of interested party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Spiech Farms, LLC (Von Eitzen, Elisabeth)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spiech Farms, LLC (Knight, Cody)
December 27, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cody H. Knight on behalf of in re Spiech Farms, LLC (Knight, Cody)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from office of attorney Eric A. Browndorf indicating the firm of Cooper Levenson, P.A. has no intention of appearing in this appeal filed by Produce Pay (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Eric A. Browndorf; attorney admission deadline set for 1/7/2019; (ems)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to attorney Henry L. Knier, Jr. regarding mandatory electronic filing (ems)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL in Bankruptcy Court case number 17-05398; appeal received filed by Produce Pay, Inc. (U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk, lmj) Modified filed date on 12/10/2018 (kvt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Pay, Inc. v. Spiech Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gladstone Land Corporation
Represented By: Wesley Johnson Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Spiech Farms, LLC
Represented By: Elisabeth M. Von Eitzen
Represented By: Stephen B. Grow
Represented By: Robert F. Wardrop, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniel M. LaVille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donio Farms
Represented By: Eric A. Browndorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHS Inc.
Represented By: John C. Arndts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chemical Bank
Represented By: Henry L. Knier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Farmland Partners Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Honor Credit Union
Represented By: Lana Maria Escamilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the United States Trustee
Represented By: Dean E. Rietberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Farm Credit Services of America, PCA
Represented By: Steven T. Buquicchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michigan Department of Agriculture and Rural Development
Represented By: Danielle Allison-Yokom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Spiech Farms, LLC
Represented By: Cody H. Knight
Represented By: Steven L. Rayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Produce Pay, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Ryan Klinowski
Represented By: Katie Eliabeth Willoughby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?