Cummings #853890 v. Rewerts
Petitioner: Sanqua Cummings #853890
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Case Number: 1:2018cv01415
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Copy of Order Denying IFP (Able to Pay - Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Sanqua Cummings #853890 (ns)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING IFP: petitioner to pay the entire fee of $5.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed (filing fee to be submitted by 3/13/2019); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity submitted by plaintiff Sanqua Cummings #853890 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ns)
December 27, 2018 Copy of Deficiency Order, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Sanqua Cummings #853890 (ns)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 1/23/2019 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Sanqua Cummings #853890 re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #3 , Brief (Related Document) #2 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 (ns)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 BRIEF by petitioner Sanqua Cummings #853890 re #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (ns)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Sanqua Cummings #853890 (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings #853890 v. Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sanqua Cummings #853890
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?