Jones v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Nardelia Alison Jones
Defendant: Whirlpoool Corporation and Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01427
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 3/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 2/28/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Whirlpool Corporation (Gaur, Shanthi)
February 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dana S. Connell on behalf of defendant Whirlpool Corporation (Connell, Dana)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendant Whirlpool Corporation file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Whirlpool Corporation (Balke, William)
January 31, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Shanthi V. Gaur on behalf of defendant Whirlpool Corporation (Gaur, Shanthi)
January 31, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William B. Balke on behalf of defendant Whirlpool Corporation (Balke, William)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of All Defendants (Jennings, Alice)
January 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alice B. Jennings on behalf of plaintiff Nardelia Alison Jones (Jennings, Alice)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Whirlpool Corporation (pjw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Edwards, Carl)
December 26, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Nardelia Alison Jones in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4324461 (Edwards, Carl)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Nardelia Alison Jones (Edwards, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpoool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Dana S. Connell
Represented By: William B. Balke
Represented By: Shanthi V. Gaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nardelia Alison Jones
Represented By: Carl R. Edwards
Represented By: Alice B. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?